Cement Masons Local 527 et al v. J T Concrete, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Dirk G. Elsperman, Leonard Ehlmann, Brett Vuagniaux, Bob Hawkins, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation, Cement Masons Local 527, Sidney Goehri, C. Keith Thompson, Dennis Frenzel, Sr. and Kurt Dierkes |
Defendant: |
J T Concrete, LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv02043 |
Filed: |
November 22, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry I. Adelman |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 18, 2012 |
Filing
29
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant JT Concrete, LLC and Ms. Janet Terrill are ordered to show cause in writing why they should not be held in contempt of court for failure to appear for a deposition and produce records as ordered by the Court on August 31, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing is set for Tuesday, November 27, 2012, at2:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 14-S of the Thomas F. Eagleton United States Courthouse, at which defendant JT Concrete, LLC and Ms. Janet Terrill may show cause why civil contempt sanctions should not be imposed against them for failure to comply with the Courts Order of August 31, 2012. Because incarceration is a possible civil contempt sanction, Ms. Terrill has the right to representation by counsel. Failure to appear for the hearing as ordered may subject Ms. Terrill to arrest by the United States Marshals Service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order by first clas s mail and by certified mail, return receipt requested, to Ms. Janet Terrill at 17851 State Route BB, St. James, Missouri 65559, and to JT Concrete, LLC, c/o Ms. Janet Terrill, at the same address. (In Court Hearing set for 11/27/2012 02:00 PM before District Judge Charles A. Shaw.) Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/18/2012. (KSM)
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to compel discovery is GRANTED. [Doc. 24] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a representative of JT Concrete, LLC shall appear for a post-judgment deposition and produce the records requested i n the Notice of Rule 69 Deposition and Request for Production of Documents, at the offices of plaintiffs counsel on Tuesday,September 18, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to defendant JT Concrete, LLC, at 17851 State Route BB, St. James, Missouri 65559.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/31/12. (JWJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?