Ingrassia v. Schafer et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Ingrassia
Defendant: Keith Schafer, Felix Vincenz, Julie Inman, Alan Blake, Jay Englehart, Davinder Hayreh, Unknown Kim, Perry Bramhall, Keith Wilkey, Bob Wills, Gabriel Crawford, Joe Easter, Marybeth Rowe, Tamra Archambo, Susan Kraemer, Ron Moore, Penny Portel, Kaylynn Reed, Ron Scharer, David L. Easter, Sr., Eric Miller, Evan Miller, Kristina Bender, Mike Basler, Gary Bennett, Mark Brown, Chris Chamberlain, Andrew Cole, Wayne E. Cook, Tony Crabtree, Robert Dolan, Eric Edgar, Brian Gillespie, Jacob Hays, John Hooker, Brian Jones, Kaleb Juliette, Linda Knox, Neil Koenig, Larry Major, Jeff Miller, Chuck Parmley, Rodney Rangel, Chris Robert, Darrin Sheets, Bryan Smith, Connie Smith, Micah Stewart, Ben Thurman, Jason Vinson, Bruce Weeks, Brenda Swift and John Does
Case Number: 4:2011cv02062
Filed: November 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for a new trial is DENIED as untimely. (Doc. No. 262 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's motion for a new trial is DENIED as moot. (Doc. No. 266 .). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/9/2016. (NEB)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED with respect to the incidents of December 29, 2009, April 20, 2010, and October 8, 2010. Summary judgement is also granted in favor of Defendants Portel and Englehart. The motion is DENIED with respect to all remaining incidents and Defendants in accordance with the above discussion. (Doc. No. 83 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a trial date will be set by separate order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel will be appointed for Plaintiff for the purposes of conducting trial. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/30/14. (KXS)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. (Doc. No. 80.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Doc. No. 80.) Plaintiff is reminded that pursuant to this Courts Order dated October 31, 2013, he has 30 days from the date of the present Memorandum and Order to respond to Defendants motion for summary judgment. re: 80 MOTION for Leave to MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Thomas J. Ingrassia Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/14/13. (JWJ)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of a medical expert witness is DENIED. (Doc. No. 72.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/3/2013. (KSH)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for permissive joinder of parties under Rule 20(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [ECF No. 65] is DENIED. re: 65 PRO SE MOTION filed by Plaintiff Thomas J. Ingrassia Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/20/13. (JWJ)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Rodney Rangel, Susan Zoenthoefer, Ron Scharer, and Bryan Smith are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed with this Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/18/2013. (KSM)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall show cause why defendants Rodney Rangel, Susan Zoenthoefer, Ron Scharer, and Bryan Smith should not be dismissed from this action without prejudice for lack of timely service. Response to Court due by 1/11/2013. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/28/12. (JWJ)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 54] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/26/2012. (NCL)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss [Doc. 20] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs state law assault and battery claims predating November 25, 2009, are DISMISSED. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for clarification [Doc. 23] is MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve process or cause process to issue on Defendants Englehart, Crawford, Eckhert, Scharer, Zenthoefer, Cham berlain, Gillespie, Hooker, Koenig, Rangel, and Bryan Smith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Hayreh, Wilkey, Rowe, Knox, Sheets, and Stump are DISMISSED from the complaint without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that counsel for the Defendants in this matter shall inform the Court in writing, and in camera, within ten (10) days of the date of this order of any known addresses for Defendants Eric Miller, Bruce Weeks, Linda Knox, Unknown Kim, and Susan K raemer, who are no longer employed by the Department. The response shouldbe mailed directly to chambers at the Thomas F. Eagleton Federal Courthouse, 111 S. 10th St., Suite 12.182, St. Louis, MO 63102. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed with this Memorandum and Order. ( Response to Court due by 10/3/2012.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/24/12. (JWJ)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint [Doc. 16] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss [Doc. 14] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Court with addresses where Defendants Eric Miller, Bruce Weeks, Linda Knox, Unknown Kim, and Susan Kraemer can be served with process no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of these Defendants. (Response to Court due by 7/6/2012.) Signed by Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/6/2012. (KSM)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel [Doc. 3] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs official capacity claims against all defendants are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process toissue upon the complaint as to Defendants Mike Basler, Eri c Miller, Ben Thurman, Bruce Weeks, Robert Dolan, Jason Vinson, Eric Edgar, Penny Portel, Linda Knox, David Easter, Sr., Gary Bennett, Micah Stewart, Jacob Hays, Chris Robert, Ron Moore, Andrew Cole, Kaleb Juliette, Mark Brown, Tony Crabtree, TamraAr chambo,UnknownKim(Psychiatrist), Susan Kraemer, Larry Major, Kaylynn Reed, Brian Jones, Chuck Parmley, Kristina Bender, and Connie Smith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to Defendants Keith Schafer, Felix Vincenz, Julie Inman, Alan Blake, Jay Englehart, Davinder Hayreh, Perry Bramhall, Keith Wilkey, Bob Wills, Gabriel Crawford, Joe Easter, Marybeth Rowe, Ron Scharer, Evan Miller, Chris Chamberlain, Wayne Cook, Br ian Gillespie, John Hooker, Neil Koenig, Jeff Miller, Rodney Rangel, Darrin Sheets, Bryan Smith, Brenda Swift, or the John Doe Defendants because, as to these Defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/8/2012. (KSM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingrassia v. Schafer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Ingrassia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Vincenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Englehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davinder Hayreh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Bramhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wilkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marybeth Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamra Archambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Portel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaylynn Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Scharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Easter, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Basler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne E. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleb Juliette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Parmley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?