American Contractors Indemnity Company v. One Source Builders, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
American Contractors Indemnity Company |
Defendant: |
Toni Elmore, One Source Builders, Inc. and Jeffrey Nations |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv02128 |
Filed: |
December 8, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry I. Adelman |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 9, 2014 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that American Contractors Indemnity Companys Motion for Attorneys Fees (ECF No. 47 ) is GRANTED and attorneys fees are awarded in the amount of Ten Thousand Three Hundred Sixty-Eight Dollars and Sixty-One Cents ($10,368.61). Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 4/9/14. (KJS)
|
October 24, 2013 |
Filing
45
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 40 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of American Contractors Indemnity Company and against Defendants One Sourc e Builders, Inc. and Jeffrey Nations in the amount of $101,640.00. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit the appropriate documentation containing its request for and itemization of the additional amounts requested for interest, attorneys fees, and costs no later than October 21, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 10/24/13. (KJS)
|
July 2, 2013 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants One Source Builders, Inc. and Jeffrey Nations shall show cause, in writing and not later than July 12, 2013, why they failed to file timely responses to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgm ent. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the bench trial set for August 19, 2013 shall be continued and that the Court will reset the trial pending disposition of the Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Motion for Reconsideration of Order Referring Case to Alternate Dispute Resolution (Doc. No. 42) is GRANTED, and the Orde Referring Case to ADR is set aside. ( Show Cause Response due by 7/12/2013.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 7/2/2013. (KMS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?