Hunter v. Salem, Missouri, City of et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Anaka Hunter
Defendant: Salem, Missouri, City of, Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library and Glenda Woffard
Case Number: 4:2012cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2012
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Dent
Presiding Judge: Nannette A. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 68 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER AND JUDGMENT - The Court hereby orders as follows: 1. Defendant Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, its officers, agents, and employees are prohibited from reactivating - locally, through MOREnet staff, or otherwise - Newsweeper content filtering categories "occult" or "criminal skills" or any filtering category other than "adult image," "pornagraphy," "phishing," "proxy anonymizer," "viruses," or "web chat" except as specifically required and necessary to comply with federal or state law. 2. The parties agree that they will bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. 3. This Judgment fully and finally resolves the claims assert in Plaintiff's Complaint, and Judgment is hereby entered. 4. This Court retains jurisdiction to enforce this Judgment. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on March 5, 2013. (MCB)
March 5, 2013 67 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: The Court has been advised that this action has settled in relation to all remaining claims and parties. All pending motions are DENIED and the June, 2013 trial date is VACATED. A signed version of the Consent Judgment shall issue forthwith. So Ordered this 5th day of March, 2013. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
March 1, 2013 66 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard, Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothert, Anthony)
February 27, 2013 65 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (MCB)
February 27, 2013 64 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion to Extend Summary Judgment Response Deadline 62 will also be addressed at the March 5, 2013, 1:30 p.m. Hearing. Response to said Motion shall be filed no later than March 1, 2013. Any Reply shall be filed no later than 3:00 p.m. on March 4, 2013. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
February 27, 2013 63 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 58 MOTION for Extension of: Defendants to Disclose Experts and Reports, and to file a Dispositive Motion filed by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit)(Cologna, Matt)
February 27, 2013 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Cologna, Matt)
February 27, 2013 61 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: An In-Court Hearing on pending Motion to Vacate ADR 56 and pending Motion for Extension of Deadlines 58 will be held on March 5, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 10 South. Response to Motion to Vacate ADR shall be filed no later than March 1, 2013. Any Reply shall be filed no later than 3:00 p.m. on March 4, 2013. Any Reply to Motion for Extension of Deadlines shall also be filed no later than 3:00 p.m. on March 4, 2013. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
February 27, 2013 60 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation 57 is GRANTED. Memoranum in Support of pending Motion for Summary Judgment 54 is accepted for filing by this Court. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
February 26, 2013 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 58 MOTION for Extension of: Defendants to Disclose Experts and Reports, and to file a Dispositive Motion filed by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Rothert, Anthony)
February 25, 2013 58 MOTION for Extension of: Defendants to Disclose Experts and Reports, and to file a Dispositive Motion by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cologna, Matt)
February 25, 2013 57 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed memorandum in support)(Rothert, Anthony)
February 25, 2013 56 MOTION to Vacate ADR by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Rothert, Anthony)
February 25, 2013 55 STATEMENT of Material Facts re 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. P-1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. P-2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. P-3, # 4 Exhibit Ex. P-4, # 5 Exhibit Ex. P-4A, # 6 Exhibit Ex. P-5, # 7 Exhibit Ex. P-6, # 8 Exhibit Ex. P-7, # 9 Exhibit Ex. P-8, # 10 Exhibit Ex. P-9, # 11 Exhibit Ex. P-10, # 12 Exhibit Ex. P-11, # 13 Exhibit Ex. P-12, # 14 Exhibit Ex. P-13, # 15 Exhibit Ex. P-14, # 16 Exhibit Ex. P-15, # 17 Exhibit Ex. P-16, # 18 Exhibit Ex. P-17, # 19 Exhibit Ex. P-18, # 20 Exhibit Ex. P-19, # 21 Exhibit Ex. P-20, # 22 Exhibit Ex. P-21, # 23 Exhibit Ex. P-22 - Part 1 of 4, # 24 Exhibit Ex. P-22 - Part 2 of 4, # 25 Exhibit Ex. P-22 - Part 3 of 4, # 26 Exhibit Ex. P-22 - Part 4 of 4, # 27 Exhibit Ex. P-23, # 28 Exhibit Ex. P-24, # 29 Exhibit Ex. P-25, # 30 Exhibit Ex. P-26, # 31 Exhibit Ex. P-27, # 32 Exhibit Ex. P-28, # 33 Exhibit Ex. P-29, # 34 Exhibit Ex. P-30, # 35 Exhibit Ex. P-31)(Rothert, Anthony)
February 25, 2013 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Rothert, Anthony)
February 25, 2013 53 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter Neutral: Sher, Richard P. Date of Conference: 4/30/2013 time: 9 a.m. Location: 190 Carondelet, Suite 1100, St. Louis, Missouri(Rothert, Anthony)
January 4, 2013 52 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 50 is GRANTED. Mediation completion deadline is extended up to and including March 29, 2013. An Amended Designation of Neutral Form shall be filed no later than February 28, 2013. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
January 3, 2013 51 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Sher, Richard P. Neutral selected by parties(KXS)
December 21, 2012 50 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Rothert, Anthony)
December 21, 2012 49 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter Neutral: Sher, Richard P. Date of Conference: TBD time: TBD Location: 190 Carondelet, Suite 1100, St. Louis, Missouri(Rothert, Anthony)
December 10, 2012 48 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion to Withdraw 47 is GRANTED. Matthew D. Wilson shall be termed as counsel of record for Defendants in this matter. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
December 10, 2012 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Matthew D. Wilson by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Salem, Missouri, City of, Glenda Woffard. (Wilson, Matthew)
December 10, 2012 46 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 45 is GRANTED. Designation of Neutral form shall be submitted to the Court no later than December 21, 2012. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber.(BABS)
December 8, 2012 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: designation of neutral ;Proposed extension date December 21, 2012 by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Rothert, Anthony)
November 7, 2012 44 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 43 is GRANTED. The following deadlines shall apply: Plaintiff's deposition shall be completed no later than November 30, 2012. Defendant shall disclose all expert witnesses and shall provide the reports required by Rule 26(a)(2), Fed.R.Civ.P., no later than December 7, 2012, shall make rebuttal expert witnesses available for depositions, and have depositions completed, no later than January 4, 2013. All Discovery shall be completed no later than January 25, 2013. Any motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment or motions for judgment onthe pleadings must be filed no later than February 25, 2013. Briefs in opposition shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days and any reply briefs shall be filed within seven (7) days. Non-Jury Trial remains set for June 24, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
November 7, 2012 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Disclose Experts and Complete Discovery by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cologna, Matt)
November 5, 2012 42 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion to Quash 39 is DENIED, as moot. Motion for Extension of Time 41 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall serve Responses to Defendants' written Discovery Requests no later than November 19, 2012. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
November 5, 2012 41 MOTION for Extension of: time for Plaintiff to serve responses to Defendants' written discovery by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Rothert, Anthony)
November 2, 2012 40 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Anthony E. Rothert ADR Completion Deadline due by 1/4/2013. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 1/18/2013. Designation of Neutral due by 12/7/2012. ADR Conference Schedule due by 12/7/2012. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on November 2, 2012. (BRP)
October 31, 2012 39 MOTION to quash notices of videotaped deposition by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rothert, Anthony) Modified on 11/1/2012 (BRP).
October 5, 2012 38 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 37 is GRANTED. Defendant shall disclose all expert witnesses and shall provide the reports required by Rule 26(a)(2), Fed.R.Civ.P., no later than November 7, 2012, shall make rebuttal expert witnesses available for depositions, and have depositions completed, no later than November 21, 2012. All Discovery shall be completed no later than December 7, 2012. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
October 5, 2012 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Disclose Experts by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard. (Cologna, Matt)
August 22, 2012 36 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 35 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall disclose all expert witnesses and shall provide the reports required by Rule 26(a)(2), Fed.R.Civ.P., no later than September 28, 2012, and shall make expert witnesses available for depositions, and have depositions completed, no later than October 19, 2012. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
August 21, 2012 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time for Plaintiff to Make Expert Disclosures by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Doty, Grant)
June 1, 2012 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Matt J Cologna for Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard. (Cologna, Matt)
May 15, 2012 33 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 32 is GRANTED. The parties shall make all disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P., no later than May 18, 2012. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
May 14, 2012 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Make Initial Disclosures by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Doty, Grant)
May 2, 2012 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable E. Richard Webber: Rule 16 Conference held on 5/2/2012. Conference held by phone. CMO issued. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (Court Reporter:none.)(FTR Gold Operator initials:none.) (FTR Gold: No.) (DLB)
May 2, 2012 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Motion to Join Parties due by 7/6/2012. Discovery Completion due by 11/16/2012. ADR Future Reference 11/1/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2013. Bench Trial set for 6/24/2013 08:30 AM before Honorable E. Richard Webber. Pretrial Compliance due by 6/3/2013. Motion in Limine due by 6/10/2013. (See Order for Further Details) Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on May 2, 2012. (BRP)
April 24, 2012 29 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard, Plaintiff Anaka Hunter.. (Doty, Grant)
April 11, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. (see order for details) This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/25/2012. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/2/2012 09:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable E. Richard Webber. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 04/11/2012. (CBL)
April 11, 2012 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant the City of Salem's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 18 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against Defendant the City of Salem shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 04/11/2012. (CBL)
March 28, 2012 26 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Jury Demand in this matter has been withdrawn by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library and Glenda Woffard. Motion to Strike 20 is termed as moot. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
March 28, 2012 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss :City of Salem Defendant City of Salem's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Salem, Missouri, City of. (Wilson, Matthew)
March 27, 2012 24 RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION to Strike 16 Answer to Complaint, 17 Answer to Complaint (to strike jury demands) filed by Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Glenda Woffard. (Wilson, Matthew)
March 26, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 20 MOTION to Strike 16 Answer to Complaint, 17 Answer to Complaint (to strike jury demands) filed by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library and Glenda Woffard shall show cause, no later than April 5, 2012, why Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Jury Demands should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 4/5/2012. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on March 26, 2012. (MCB)
March 12, 2012 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 20 MOTION to Strike 16 Answer to Complaint, 17 Answer to Complaint (to strike jury demands) filed by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Rothert, Anthony)
March 12, 2012 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss :City of Salem filed by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Doty, Grant)
March 12, 2012 20 MOTION to Strike 16 Answer to Complaint, 17 Answer to Complaint (to strike jury demands) by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Rothert, Anthony)
March 5, 2012 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss :City of Salem filed by Defendant Salem, Missouri, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opinion)(Wilson, Matthew)
March 5, 2012 18 MOTION to Dismiss :City of Salem by Defendant Salem, Missouri, City of. (Wilson, Matthew)
March 5, 2012 17 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Glenda Woffard.(Wilson, Matthew)
March 5, 2012 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library.(Wilson, Matthew)
February 9, 2012 15 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Pursuant to the reassignment of this case from Magistrate Judge Baker to District Judge E. Richard Webber, the Rule 16 Order 13 previously issued is vacated. Defendants shall Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than March 5, 2012. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS)
February 9, 2012 14 CJRA ORDER (jgw). Judge Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to Judge Honorable E. Richard Webber for all further proceedings. (TRC)
January 23, 2012 13 Featured Case RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/17/2012. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/23/2012 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Magistrate Consent due by 2/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 1/23/12. (Attachments: # 1 consent form)(CLA)
January 20, 2012 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anaka Hunter Glenda Woffard waiver signed on 1/3/2012, answer due 3/5/2012. (Rothert, Anthony)
January 20, 2012 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anaka Hunter Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library waiver signed on 1/3/2012, answer due 3/5/2012. (Rothert, Anthony)
January 20, 2012 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anaka Hunter Salem, Missouri, City of waiver signed on 1/3/2012, answer due 3/5/2012. (Rothert, Anthony)
January 16, 2012 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Grant R. Doty for Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (Doty, Grant)
January 16, 2012 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew D. Wilson for Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Salem, Missouri, City of, Glenda Woffard. (Wilson, Matthew)
January 16, 2012 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Douglas Harpool for Defendants Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Salem, Missouri, City of, Glenda Woffard. (Harpool, Mark)
January 5, 2012 6 WAIVER of Service issued defendantGlenda Woffard. sent to Glenda Wooford on 1/3/2012 filed by Anaka Hunter. Waiver of Service due by 2/2/2012. (Rothert, Anthony)
January 5, 2012 5 WAIVER of Service issued defendantBoard of Trustees, Salem Public Library. sent to Board of Trustees for Salem, Missouri, Public Library on 1/3/2012 filed by Anaka Hunter. Waiver of Service due by 2/2/2012. (Rothert, Anthony)
January 5, 2012 4 WAIVER of Service issued defendantSalem, Missouri, City of. sent to City of Salem, Missouri c/o Mary Happel, City Clerk on 1/3/2012 filed by Anaka Hunter. Waiver of Service due by 2/2/2012. (Rothert, Anthony)
January 5, 2012 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Copy of docket text order mailed to non-ecf attorney Thu Jan 5 07:57:09 CST 2012 (Christopher, Timothy)
January 4, 2012 3 Featured Case DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel Mach.Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 1/04/2012. (SCF)
January 3, 2012 Receipt 4644025748 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Daniel Mach (CCAM)
January 3, 2012 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
January 3, 2012 2 Verified MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Mach (Filing fee $100) by Plaintiff Anaka Hunter. (TRC)
January 3, 2012 Case Opening Notification - Waivers issued: 3, Consents issued: 1, Judge Assigned: Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
January 3, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library, Salem, Missouri, City of, Glenda Woffard with receipt number 0865-3081211, in the amount of $350 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Anaka Hunter. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Original Filing Form, # 3 Waiver of Service City of Salem, Missouri, # 4 Waiver of Service Board of Trustees, # 5 Waiver of Service Wofford)(Rothert, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Salem, Missouri, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anaka Hunter
Represented By: Grant R. Doty
Represented By: Daniel I. Mach
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem, Missouri, City of
Represented By: Mark Douglas Harpool
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees, Salem Public Library
Represented By: Mark Douglas Harpool
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Woffard
Represented By: Mark Douglas Harpool
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?