City-County Taxi, Inc. v. Metropolitan Taxicab Commission et al
Plaintiff: |
City-County Taxi, Inc. |
Defendant: |
St. Louis, Missouri, City of and Metropolitan Taxicab Commission |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv00408 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Ross |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Metropolitan Taxicab Commission motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/25/13. (LGK)
|
May 3, 2013 |
Filing
63
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel and Motion for Protective Order to Suspend Discovery Until Ruling on Motion to Disqualify 55 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument 58 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/3/13. (LAH)
|
February 20, 2013 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Metropolitan Taxicab Commission's Motion to Dismiss Count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 28 and Defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri's Motion to Dismiss as to Coun t I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 31 are GRANTED, and Count I is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri's Motion to Dismiss as to Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 31 is GRANTED. Defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri is dismissed without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/20/13. (LGK)
|
June 15, 2012 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Metropolitan Taxicab Commission's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 6 is GRANTED as to Counts I, II and III and Counts I, II and III are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that Defendant Metropolitan Taxicab Commission's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 6 is DENIED as to Count IV. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 12 is GRANTED as to Counts I, II and III and Counts I, II and III are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 12 is DENIED as to Count IV. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty (20) days of the date of this order Plaintiff shall file and serve his amended complaint as set forth herein. Plaintiff's failure to comply timely with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint without prejudice.. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 6/15/12. (LGK)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument [ECF No. 21] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Metropolitan Taxicab Commission's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint [ECF No. 6] and Def endant City of St. Louis, Missouri's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. 12] are set for hearing on June 7, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Parties are given thirty (30) minutes for argument. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 5/30/12. (LAH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?