September 23, 2013 |
Filing
601
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Based upon the parties' filings and the arguments made at the final pretrial conference in this case held on the record on September 17 and 18, 2013, and for the reasons stated at the pretrial conference, the Court sets forth the following rulings on the parties' motions in limine: (see order for further details). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/23/13. (KXS)
|
September 18, 2013 |
Filing
574
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of the United States for an order that communications with Kelly Phelps-Adam are not protected by attorney-client privilege is DENIED. (Doc. No. 409.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/18/13. (KXS)
|
August 30, 2013 |
Filing
433
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for partial summary judgment filed by the Government is DENIED with respect to liability on Count I, and DENIED as moot as it relates to Defendants affirmative defenses, and DENIED without pre judice with respect to the question of the appropriate measure of damages. (Doc. No. 306.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants RehabCare Group East, Inc., and RehabCare Group, Inc., is DENIED. (Doc. No. 310) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants Health Systems, Inc., and Rehab Systems of Missouri is DENIED. (Doc. No. 313.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/30/13. (JWJ)
|
August 14, 2013 |
Filing
418
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of the United States to compel is DENIED as moot in part and GRANTED in part as set forth above. (Doc. No. 339.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/14/13. (KXS)
|
June 5, 2013 |
Filing
342
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for fees filed by Defendants RehabCare Group East, Inc., and RehabCare Group, Inc., is GRANTED in part, in the amount of $2,500. (Doc. No. 277.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for fees filed by Defendants Rehab Systems Of Missouri And Health Systems, Inc., is GRANTED in part, in the amount of $2,500. (Doc. No. 280.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/5/2013. (NCL)
|
May 20, 2013 |
Filing
291
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment against Relator filed by Defendants RehabCare Group East, Inc., and RehabCare Group, Inc., is DENIED. (Doc. No. 191 as supplemented.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/20/13. (JWJ)
|
April 4, 2013 |
Filing
231
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, in light of the agreements reached in the conference call, that Defendant RehabCares motion to quash or for a protective order regarding the April 8, 2013 deposition of Patricia M. Henry is denied as moot. (Doc. No. 219.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/4/2013. (NCL)
|
March 13, 2013 |
Filing
205
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants RehabCare Group East, Inc., and RehabCare Group, Inc. is DENIED. (Doc. No. 119.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Health Systems, Inc., and Rehab Systems of Missouri is DENIED. (Doc. No. 121.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/13/2013. (NCL)
|
March 4, 2013 |
Filing
198
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that RSM and HSIs Motion (Doc. No. 161) to Compel Adequate Responses to Interrogatory Requests 3 and 5 is GRANTED. The Government shall fully respond to these Interrogatories within ten days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. (Response to Court due by 3/14/2013.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/4/2013. (KSM)
|
November 29, 2012 |
Filing
160
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' cross motions for a protective order are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Doc. Nos. 139, 142, and 143.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the RehabCare Defendants shall draft a new proposed protective order encompassing the above rulings, and, on or before December 14, 2012, shall provide said draft to the other parties for review. On or before December 21, 2012, the RehabCare Defendants shall submit a new proposed prote ctive order to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion (Doc. No. 150) to compel more complete responses to nine Requests for Admissions is GRANTED. Defendants are ordered to provide, within ten days of the date of this Order, responses to the nine Requests for Admissions at issue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time to designate experts in this case shall be extended by one week. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/29/2012. (NCL)
|