Webner v. Centene Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Neil Webner
Defendant: Centene Corporation, Michael F. Neidorff, William N. Scheffel and Jeffrey A. Schwaneke
Case Number: 4:2012cv01173
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: ORDERED Pursuant to plaintiff's notice [#17], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/24/12. (CDP)
September 21, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Neil Webner (Rosemergy, James)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than Friday, September 21, 2012, plaintiff Webner shall file a motion for appointment of lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead counsel. (Response to Court due by 9/21/2012.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on September 13, 2012. (BRP)
August 28, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiff Neil Webner of Compliance with Notice Requirement (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Lester R. Hooker, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hooker Declaration)(Rosemergy, James)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than August 30, 2012, plaintiff shall file with the Court verification that he has complied with the notice publication requirement, stating the date and name of the publication. (Response to Court due by 8/30/2012.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 08/20/2012. (CBL)
August 2, 2012 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel C. Nelson for Defendants Centene Corporation, Michael F. Neidorff, William N. Scheffel, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Nelson, Daniel)
August 2, 2012 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, REGARDING SCHEDULING by Defendants Centene Corporation, Michael F. Neidorff, William N. Scheffel, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Harlan, David)
August 2, 2012 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by David W. Harlan for Defendants Centene Corporation, Michael F. Neidorff, William N. Scheffel, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Harlan, David)
July 13, 2012 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Neil Webner. Jeffrey A. Schwaneke served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. (Rosemergy, James)
July 13, 2012 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Neil Webner. William N. Scheffel served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. (Rosemergy, James)
July 13, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Neil Webner. Michael F. Neidorff served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. (Rosemergy, James)
July 13, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Neil Webner. Centene Corporation served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. (Rosemergy, James)
July 12, 2012 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant - All Defendants. The summonses were emailed to jrosemergy@careydanis.com. (DLT)
July 11, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Neil Webner Process Server: Chrissy Miller (Rosemergy, James)
July 11, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Neil Webner Process Server: Chrissy Miller (Rosemergy, James)
July 11, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Neil Webner Process Server: Chrissy Miller (Rosemergy, James)
July 11, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Neil Webner Process Server: Chrissy Miller (Rosemergy, James)
July 3, 2012 Case Opening Notification,no summonses issued at this time, attorney shall file notice of process server so court may issue summonses. Disclosure of Corporate Interest to to be filed by all corporations.. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (DLT)
June 29, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-3351789, in the amount of $350 Jury Demand,, filed by Neil Webner. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Neil Webner, #2 Summons Centene, #3 Summons Neidorff, #4 Summons Scheffel, #5 Summons Schwaneke)(Rosemergy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webner v. Centene Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Webner
Represented By: James J. Rosemergy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Daniel C. Nelson
Represented By: David W. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Neidorff
Represented By: Daniel C. Nelson
Represented By: David W. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William N. Scheffel
Represented By: Daniel C. Nelson
Represented By: David W. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Schwaneke
Represented By: Daniel C. Nelson
Represented By: David W. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?