Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. v. Lambert et al
Plaintiff: |
Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Lisa Lambert, Jennifer Rios, Teresa Roths and Ruth Cornett |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv01253 |
Filed: |
July 12, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Nannette A. Baker |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 3, 2013 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Second Motion for Summary Judgment of defendants/ crossclaim defendants Jennifer Rios, Teresa Roths and Ruth Cornett is DENIED. Doc. 86 . Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/3/2013. (RAK)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing
95
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ( SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant/crossclaim plaintiff Lisa Lamberts SecondMotion to Compel Production from defendant/crossclaim defendant Jennifer Rios is GRANTEDas follows: [Doc. 77]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/7/13. (JWJ)
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing
71
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment of defendants/ crossclaim defendants Jennifer Rios, Teresa Roths and Ruth Cornett is DENIED. re: 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Teresa Roths, Jennifer Rios, Ruth Cornett. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/28/13. (JWJ)
|
January 29, 2013 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff and Discharge Liability on Fund is GRANTED. [Doc. 33] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Transameric a Life Insurance Company, Inc. shall prepare and file a proposed disbursement order for the payout of Seventeen Thousand Thirty-Seven Dollars ($17,037) for its attorneys fees and costs, see E.D. Mo. Local Rule 13.04(D)(2), and shall send a copy of the proposed order to the Court's proposed orders e-mail box, see Administrative Procedures for Case Management/Electronic Case Filing, § II.J, with the case name and number (including judges initials) in the subject line. A preliminary order in interpleader and for dismissal and discharge will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/29/2013. (NCL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?