Favazza v. Path Media Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Favazza
Defendant: Casa Aramara "Fideicomiso" (Mexican Bank Trust), GGW Direct, LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, J.F., LLC, Sands Media, Inc., Aero Falcons, LLC, Turtlecreek Properties, Inc., Rothwell, LTD., Pepe Bus, LLC, Mantra Entertainment, LLC, MRA Holdings, GGW Brands, Inc., Mantra Films, Inc., GGW Direct, GGW-Online.com and Pablo Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv01561
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Thomas C Mummert
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER. (see order for details) The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Registration of the Judgment Under 28 U.S.C. 1963 [Doc. #158 . It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall certify seven (7) copies of the Final Judgment [Doc. 149] and of this Order and provide same to Plaintiff's counsel at Plaintiff's cost. If no appeal has been filed on or before July 10, 2014 the Clerk of Court shall complete Form AO-451, titled "Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District," leaving the cause number on the form blank, which will be filled in by the clerks in California and any other jurisdictions, with new Miscellaneous Case Numbers. Plaintiff's counsel shall be provided with seven (7) certified copies of said Form at her cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 06/24/2014. (CBL)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: Plaintiff moves this Court to enter a specific order enabling her to register its judgment in the United States District Court for the Central District of California and to direct the Clerk of Court to take certain actions. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a proposed order consistent with her request. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on June 20, 2014. (BRP)
June 20, 2014 Filing 159 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #158 MOTION for Leave to Register Judgment in Another District filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2014 Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to Register Judgment in Another District by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Medler, Jeffrey)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER - By Order of June 2, 2014, Plaintiff was directed to advise the Court of how she intends to proceed against the only two remaining defendants in the case: J.F., LLC, and Pepe Bus, LLC. She has now filed a motion to dismiss these two defendants without prejudice. This motion is GRANTED. [Doc. 153] Plaintiff's claims against all defendants having been disposed of, the case is now closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on June 9, 2014. (MCB)
June 3, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE Status of Bankruptcy Cases, as Required by the Court in its 5/08/2014 Order: by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza re #148 Memorandum & Order,, (Medler, John)
June 3, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE Certificate of Service re Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendants Mantra Films, Inc., MRA HOlding, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, and GGW Marketing, LLC: by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza re #151 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Medler, John)
June 3, 2014 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Party Pepe Bus, LLC and J.F., LLC filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
June 3, 2014 Filing 153 MOTION to Dismiss Party Pepe Bus, LLC and J.F., LLC by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to dismiss without prejudice her claims against the Defendants who have filed for bankruptcy protection [Doc. #150 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Mantra Films, Inc.; MRA Holding, LLC a/k/a MRA Holdings, LLC; GGW Brands, LLC; GGW Direct, LLC; GGW Events, LLC; GGW Magazine, LLC; and GGW Marketing, LLC, are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff is to advise the Court on or before June 9, 2014, of how she intends to proceed against J.F., LLC, and Pepe Bus, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 06/02/2014. (CBL)
May 22, 2014 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #150 MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice Defendants Mantra Films, Inc., MRA Holding, LLC, GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC and GGW Marketing, LLC filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
May 22, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice Defendants Mantra Films, Inc., MRA Holding, LLC, GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC and GGW Marketing, LLC by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 PARTIAL JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment is entered in Count I of the complaint in favor of Plaintiff, Tamara Favazza, and against Joseph Francis; Path Media Holdings, LLC; GGW Brands, Inc.; Aero Falcons, LLC; and Blue Horse Trading, LLC. Joseph Francis; Path Media Holdings, LLC; GGW Brands, Inc.; Aero Falcons, LLC; and Blue Horse Trading, LLC, are jointly and severally liable for the $5,772,558.00 judgment entered by the Missouri Circuit Court in Plaintiff's favor. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment is entered in Count II of the complaint in favor of Plaintiff, Tamara Favazza, and against Joseph Francis; Path Media Holdings, LLC; GGW Brands, Inc.; Aero Falcons, LLC; and Blue Horse Trading, LLC. Joseph Francis; Path Media Holdings, LLC; GGW Brands, Inc.; Aero Falcons, LLC; and Blue Horse Trading, LLC, are alter egos of each other and are jointly and severally liable for the $5,772,558.00 judgment entered by the Missouri Circuit Court in Plaintiff's favor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on May 8, 2014. (BRP)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part as set forth above as to Counts I and II and DENIED as to Count III. [Doc. #139 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is to advise the Court in writing on or before July 31, 2014, of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings of GGW Brands, LLC; GGW Direct LLC; GGW Events, LLC; GGW Magazine, LLC; GGW Marketing, LLC; Mantra Films, Inc.; and MRA Holdings, LLC. An appropriate partial Judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. (Status Report due by 7/31/2014.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on May 8, 2014. (BRP)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER. Pending in this case is an unopposed motion for summary judgment, the disposition of which will potentially resolve all the case. Consequently, the case is removed from the trial docket of the week beginning June 23, 2014, to be reset if necessary after the motion is ruled. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 04/30/2014. (CBL)
March 5, 2014 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Medler, John)
January 23, 2014 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Ronald D. Tym, Esq. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56(d). (Attachments: #1 envelopes)(MCB)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #143 Motion to Dismiss Count IV of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on January 14, 2014. (MCB)
January 13, 2014 Filing 143 MOTION to Dismiss :Count IV of the First Amended Complaint (Civil Conspiracy) Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
January 13, 2014 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
January 13, 2014 Filing 141 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
January 13, 2014 Filing 140 SUPPLEMENTAL re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 64 to 74, #2 Exhibit 75 to 87, #3 Exhibit 88 to 90, #4 Exhibit 91 to 94, #5 Exhibit 95 to 98 (these EXS are in further support of the previously filed Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment))(Medler, John)
January 13, 2014 Filing 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit 1 to 7, #3 Exhibit 8 to 19, #4 Exhibit 20 to 28, #5 Exhibit 29 to 49, #6 Exhibit 50 to 63 (rest of EXS filed with Supplemental))(Medler, John)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER. The Court having ordered Plaintiff to show cause why her claims against Rothwell, Ltd., should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to obtain proper service within the period prescribed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and Plaintiff having failed to do so, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Rothwell, Ltd, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 07/02/2013. (CBL)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order of May 3, 2013, quashing service on Path Media Holdings, LLC, is GRANTED. [Doc. #122 ] The Order is vacated as to Path Media Holdings, LLC. Plaintiff's alternative motion for issuance of pluries summons to Path Media Holdings, LLC, [Doc. #124 ] and her amended motion [Doc. 127] are each DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order quashing service on Pepe Bus, LLC, and Aero Falcons, LLC, is GRANTED. [Doc. #130 ] The Order is vacated as to Pepe Bus, LLC, and Aero Falcons, LLC. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Court shall not entertain any further motions seeking a reconsideration of its earlier ruling based on documents newly discovered but generated prior to the Order of May 3, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 07/02/2013. (CBL)
July 2, 2013 ***REMARK: Orders #137 and #138 sent Ronald D. Tym, Esq., The Tym Firm, 7120 Carlson Circle, #263, Canoga Park, CA 91303 for Defendants Joseph Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., Blue Horse Trading, LLC and J.F. LLC. (CBL)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 6/26/2013. (BRP)
June 25, 2013 Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw her Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
June 19, 2013 Filing 134 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
June 19, 2013 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
June 19, 2013 Filing 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A to G, #3 Exhibit H to R, #4 Exhibit S to Z, #5 Exhibit AA to GG, #6 Exhibit HH to RR, #7 Exhibit SS to ZZ, #8 Exhibit AAA to GGG, #9 Exhibit HHH to RRR, #10 Exhibit SSS to VVV)(Medler, John)
June 2, 2013 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #130 MOTION to Vacate #120 Order, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,,,,,,, #114 Memorandum & Order,,,, with respect to Defendants PEPE BUS LLC and AERO FALCONS LLCS Based Upon Newly Discovered Evidence filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
June 2, 2013 Filing 130 MOTION to Vacate #120 Order, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,,,,,,, #114 Memorandum & Order,,,, with respect to Defendants PEPE BUS LLC and AERO FALCONS LLCS Based Upon Newly Discovered Evidence by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Medler, John)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (see order for details and deadlines) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Discovery Completion due by 12/31/2013. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 1/12/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2014. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13N before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert III. Pretrial Compliance due by 6/3/2014. Motion in Limine due by 6/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 05/30/2013. (CBL)
May 30, 2013 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III: Status Conference held on 5/30/2013. Defendants fail to appear. (FTR Gold: No.) (CBL)
May 30, 2013 Filing 127 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #114 Memorandum & Order,,,, by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Medler, John)
May 23, 2013 Filing 126 SUGGESTION OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by GGW Marketing, LLC by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
May 23, 2013 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #124 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Pluries Summons (Alternative Motion to Motion for Reconsideration of Motion to Quash Service on Path Media) filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
May 23, 2013 Filing 124 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Pluries Summons (Alternative Motion to Motion for Reconsideration of Motion to Quash Service on Path Media) by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Medler, John)
May 23, 2013 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #122 MOTION for Reconsideration re #114 Memorandum & Order,,,, filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
May 23, 2013 Filing 122 MOTION for Reconsideration re #114 Memorandum & Order,,,, by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Medler, John)
May 21, 2013 Filing 121 Plaintiff's Proposed SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. . (Medler, John) Modified on 5/22/2013 (CBL).
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted an extension of time up to and including June 28, 2013, within which to serve Path Media Holdings, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Pablo Holdings, LLC; Sands Media, Inc.; Pepe Bus, LLC; Aero Falcons, LLC; and Turtlecreek Properties, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration [Doc. 117] is GRANTED. The Court's prior ruling granting the motion of GGW Marketing, LLC, to quash service is vacated. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that a scheduling conference shall be held on Thursday, May 30, 2103, at 9 o'clock in the morning. On or before May 23, 2013, Plaintiff is to file a proposed scheduling plan with (i) suggested deadlines for the close of discovery and the filing of dispositive motions and (ii) a suggested trial date. Plaintiff's counsel, having failed to appear for the three prior conferences, are cautioned that failure to appear in person for this conference will result in the dismissal of her case without prejudice and without further notice. ( In Chambers Conference set for 5/30/2013 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert III.), Pepe Bus, LLC, Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc., Aero Falcons, LLC and Pablo Holdings, LLC terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on May 16, 2013. (MCB)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss of Rothwell, Ltd., based on improper service is GRANTED. [Doc. 64] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause on or before May 31, 2013, why her claims against Rothwell, Ltd., should not be dismissed for failure to properly serve Rothwell, Ltd., within the period prescribed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). (Response to Court due by 5/31/2013.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on May 16, 2013. (MCB)
May 16, 2013 ***REMARK - Documents #119 and #120 sent this date to: Ronald D. Tym, Esq., The Tym Firm, 7120 Carlson Circle, #263, Canoga Park, CA 91303 for Defendants Joseph Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., Blue Horse Trading, LLC and J.F. LLC. (MCB)
May 13, 2013 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #117 MOTION for Reconsideration re #114 Memorandum & Order,,,, Based Upon Newly Discovered Evidence filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
May 13, 2013 Filing 117 MOTION for Reconsideration re #114 Memorandum & Order,,,, Based Upon Newly Discovered Evidence by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Medler, John)
May 6, 2013 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Memorandum and Order re #114 filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John) Modified on 5/7/2013 (MCB).
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides that a defendant must be served within 120 days after the complaint is filed. This time may be extended if the plaintiff shows good cause for her failure to serve the defendant within the prescribed period. Plaintiff's motion for issuance of pluries summons does not show such cause. The motion [Doc. #112 ] is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 05/03/2013. (CBL)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to quash [Doc. #93 ] is DENIED as to Joseph Francis; GGW Brands, Inc.; Blue Horse Trading, LLC; and J.F., LLC, and is GRANTED as to Path Media Holdings, LLC; GGW Marketing, LLC; Pepe Bus, LLC; Aero Falcon, LLC; Sands Media, Inc.; Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.; and Pablo Holdings, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to submit additional documentation in support of her response to the motion to quash [Doc. #113 ] is DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause on or before May 13, 2013, why her claims against Path Media Holdings, LLC;GGW Marketing, LLC; Pepe Bus, LLC; Aero Falcon, LLC; Sands Media, Inc.; Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.; and Pablo Holdings, LLC, should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely serve them within the period prescribed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). ( Show Cause Response due by 5/13/2013.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 05/03/2013. (CBL)
May 3, 2013 ***REMARK Orders #114 and #115 sent via US Mail to Defendants Joseph Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., Blue Horse Trading, LLC and J.F. LLC as directed by chambers. (CBL)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order ***REMARK *** Docketing error - The Order filed May 2, 2013 in this case by Judge Fleissig was filed in error and was deleted. Therefore, no docket entry was filed in this case on May 2, 2013. (MCB)
April 30, 2013 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Documentation in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Medler, John)
April 30, 2013 Filing 112 MOTION for Issuance of Pluries Summons for Defendant Path Media Holdings LLC by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Medler, John)
April 19, 2013 Filing 111 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #106 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by David Allen Dalton II, as to Defendants MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter and Envelope)(CBL)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. (see order for details) Plaintiff moves for a stay of the ruling in order to conduct discovery. Plaintiff does not explain what information could be discovered now that could not have been earlier discovered or that is not contained in the almost ninety pages of exhibits filed in support of her response to the motion. The motion is denied. [Doc. #108 ] Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 04/15/2013. (CBL)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 110. Order sent to non-electronic parties this date. Mon Apr 15 14:34:56 CDT 2013 (Long, Carol)
April 9, 2013 Filing 109 SUGGESTION OF FILING BANKRUPTCY as to defendant:Mantra Films Inc. and MRA Holding LLC by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
April 5, 2013 Filing 108 MOTION to Stay re #93 MOTION to Quash Until Discovery can be Completed on the Issue by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
April 5, 2013 Filing 107 SUGGESTION OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by Defendants GGW Brands LLC, GGWDirect LLC, GGW Events LLC, and GGW Magazine LLC by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. David A. Dalton, II, requests leave to withdraw as the attorney of record for Mantra Films, Inc., and MRA Holding, LLC. [Doc. #104 ] This motion is granted. Mr. Dalton is directed to file with the Court the last address and telephone number at which he was able to reach his former clients and the name of the person with whom he last had contact during the course of his representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 03/25/2013. (CBL)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 106. Order sent to non-electronic parties this date. Mon Mar 25 10:57:30 CDT 2013 (Long, Carol)
February 22, 2013 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM re #103 Order by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farrell, Kelley)
February 12, 2013 Filing 104 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm David A. Dalton, II by Defendants MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc. (MCB)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to withdraw as counsel of record is GRANTED subject to Movants complying with the Court's above-described directions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on February 7, 2013. (BRP)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 103. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Thu Feb 7 15:15:40 CST 2013 (Porter, Brittany)
February 4, 2013 Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion re #101 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Berry & Maxson LLC filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2013 Filing 101 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Berry & Maxson LLC by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Berry, Robert)
January 14, 2013 ***REMARK. Attorneys are reminded that the use of an attorneys electronic filing login and password to file a pleading, motion, memorandum or other document constitutes the signature of that attorney on that document for allpurposes, including Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. Signing attorney must file with his/her own login and password. (See Local Rule 2.11) (CBL)
January 14, 2013 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION to Quash Service filed by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Berry, Robert)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 99. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Fri Jan 4 10:34:01 CST 2013 (Porter, Brittany)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Defendants' Motions to Quash Service. ;Extension date: 01/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 01/03/2013. (CBL)
December 28, 2012 Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of: TIME TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THEIR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Farrell, Kelley)
December 21, 2012 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit)(Medler, John)
December 19, 2012 Filing 96 FULL CONSENT has been received by by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Casa Aramara "Fideicomiso" (Mexican Bank Trust), Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Entertainment, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc., Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (BRP)
December 18, 2012 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Rothwell's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Rothwell, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss for Alleged Lack of In Personam Jurisdiction, Alleged Improper Venue and an Alleged Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Rothwell, LTD.. (Cohan, William)
December 14, 2012 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #93 MOTION to Quash filed by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Farrell, Kelley)
December 14, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION to Quash by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Farrell, Kelley)
December 12, 2012 Filing 91 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tamara Favazza. GGW Brands, LLC served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; GGW Direct, LLC served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Medler, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER. (see order for details) A question has now arisen about who is representing Rothwell, Ltd. Accordingly, the new attorneys for Rothwell, Ltd., are hereby directed to file, within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order, either a consent to the undersigned's jurisdiction or an election to have the case transferred to a district court judge. ( Response to Court due by 12/26/2012.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 12/11/2012. (CBL)
December 11, 2012 Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Medler, John)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 90. Order sent to non-electronic parties this date. Tue Dec 11 16:33:34 CST 2012 (Long, Carol)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Leave to file answer out of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on December 10, 2012. (MCB)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to to file answer out of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on December 10, 2012. (MCB)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William A. Cohan Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on December 10, 2012. (MCB)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 86, 87, 88. sent to non-electronic parties this date Mon Dec 10 15:30:30 CST 2012 (Berg, Melanie)
December 7, 2012 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint by Mantra Films, Inc.(CBL)
December 7, 2012 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Defendant Mantra Films, Inc. (CBL)
December 7, 2012 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint by MRA Holding, LLC.(CBL)
December 7, 2012 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Defendant MRA Holding, LLC. (CBL)
December 6, 2012 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William A Cohan (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Rothwell, LTD. (receipt # 4644032355) (CBL)
December 6, 2012 Receipt 4644032355 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of WILLIAM A. COHAN (CCAM)
December 6, 2012 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint by Turtlecreek Properties, Inc..(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint by Sands Media, Inc..(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint by Pepe Bus, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint by Path Media Holdings, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint by Pablo Holdings, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint by J.F., LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint by GGW Marketing, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint by GGW Magazine, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint by GGW Events, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint by GGW Direct, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint by GGW Brands, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint by GGW Brands, Inc..(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph R. Francis.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Horse Trading, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 6, 2012 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint by Aero Falcons, LLC.(Berry, Robert)
December 5, 2012 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Rothwell, LTD.. (Kehlenbrink, Scott)
December 5, 2012 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Rothwell, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Colin Chaffe, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Colin Chaffe, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Colin Chaffe, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Colin Chaffe)(Kehlenbrink, Scott)
December 5, 2012 Filing 63 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott Kehlenbrink for Defendant Rothwell, LTD.. (Kehlenbrink, Scott)
December 5, 2012 Filing 61 Pluries Summons Issued as to defendant GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, Pablo Holdings, LLC. The summons were emailed to Attorney Jeffrey Medler. (CBL)
December 4, 2012 Filing 62 FULL CONSENT has been received by by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc., Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (CBL)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension time to file answer by December 6, 2012 and file motion to dismiss by December 14, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on December 4, 2012. (see document #59 for further details plus Judge Mummert's endorsement.)(MCB)
December 4, 2012 Filing 59 MOTION for extension of time up to and including December 6, 2012, to file answer and for extension of time up to and including December 14, 2012, to file motions to dismiss by Defendants. (KXS)
December 4, 2012 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III: Rule 16 Conference held on 12/4/2012. Conference held in person. CMO to issue. (FTR Gold: No.) (KXS)
December 4, 2012 Filing 57 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tamara Favazza as to GGW Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request for Alias Summons)(Medler, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 60. sent to non-electronic party this date Tue Dec 4 15:30:58 CST 2012 (Berg, Melanie)
November 27, 2012 Filing 56 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. . (Medler, John)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of time to answer, otherwise respond, or contest service ;Extension date: December 4, 2012 Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on November 21, 2012. (MCB)
November 21, 2012 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. . (Berry, Robert) Modified on 11/26/2012 (BRP).
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 55. sent to non-electronic party this date Wed Nov 21 15:30:01 CST 2012 (Berg, Melanie)
November 20, 2012 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Answer, Otherwise Respond, or Contest Service by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Berry, Robert)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. (see order for details) This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/27/2012. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/4/2012 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert III. Magistrate Consent due by 11/27/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 11/15/2012. (CBL)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 52. Order sent to non-electronic parties this date. Thu Nov 15 10:43:29 CST 2012 (Long, Carol)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Answer due by November 20, 2012.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 11/13/2012. (CBL)
November 9, 2012 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #32 Amended Complaint (Removal/Transfer),,, by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Berry, Robert)
November 9, 2012 Filing 49 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Pablo Holdings, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
November 9, 2012 Filing 48 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert P. Berry for Defendant Pablo Holdings, LLC. (Berry, Robert)
November 9, 2012 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica W. Kennedy for Defendant Pablo Holdings, LLC. (Kennedy, Jessica)
November 9, 2012 Filing 46 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelley Field Farrell for Defendant Pablo Holdings, LLC. (Farrell, Kelley)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Allen Dalton, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 11/5/2012. (BRP)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 44. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Mon Nov 5 10:27:54 CST 2012 (Porter, Brittany)
November 1, 2012 Filing 43 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #42 Order,, by Defendants Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berry, Robert)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. (see order for details) RE: #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Allen Dalton, II. Absent the certificate of good standing, Mr. Dalton's will not be granted. Because the law does not allow a corporation to proceed pro se," Ackra Direct Mktg. Corp. v. Fingerhut Corp., 86 F.3d 852, 857 (8th Cir. 1996), however, the Court will delay ruling on his motion until Wednesday, November 7, 2012, to allow either (a) Mr. Dalton to file a certificate of good standing or (b) his two corporate clients to retain new counsel. Response to Court due by 11/7/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 10/30/2012. (CBL)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 42. Order sent to non-electronic parties this date. Tue Oct 30 16:37:15 CDT 2012 (Long, Carol)
October 23, 2012 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tamara Favazza. All Defendants. Answers due 11/13/2012 (Medler, John) Modified on 10/24/2012 to add answer date (CBL).
October 19, 2012 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III: Status Conference held on 10/19/2012. (No Clerk was present) (FTR Gold: No.) (BRP)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER On the Court's own motion the status conference is reset from October 5, 2012, at 2:30 p.m. to October 19, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. Status Conference set for 10/19/2012 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on October 4, 2012. (MCB)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 39. sent to non-electronic party this date Thu Oct 4 14:13:57 CDT 2012 (Berg, Melanie)
October 2, 2012 Filing 38 Alias Summons Issued as to defendants J.F., LLC, MRA Holding, LLC, Turtlecreek Properties, Inc. The summons were emailed to Attorney John Medler. (CBL)
October 2, 2012 Filing 37 Second Request for Issuance of Alias Summonses by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Medler, John) Modified on 10/3/2012 to request event (CBL).
September 26, 2012 Filing 36 CONSENT by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Medler, John) Modified on 9/27/2012- document removed and attorney was left a message that this document should be filed in paper, not electronically (MCB).
September 25, 2012 Filing 35 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Pablo Holdings, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc. The summons were emailed to Attorney John Medler. (CBL)
September 25, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza Process Server: Steve Williams/Master File (MO) and John DeMarr & Agents (CA) (Medler, John)
September 25, 2012 Filing 33 REQUEST for Issuance of Alias Summonses by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Medler, John) Modified on 9/25/2012 to change to request event (CBL).
September 25, 2012 Filing 32 Amended Complaint (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Plaintiff, AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs,Terminating Casa Aramara Fideicomiso (Mexican Bank Trust) yes Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued yes, Non-Jury demand, < i<, filed by Tamara Favazza.(Medler, John)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference shall be held in chambers on Friday, October 5, 2012, at 2:30 p.m. (Status Conference set for 10/5/2012 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert III.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on September 19, 2012. (BRP)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 31. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Wed Sep 19 11:55:34 CDT 2012 (Porter, Brittany)
September 18, 2012 Receipt 4644030852 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of David Allen Dalton (CCAM)
September 18, 2012 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant MRA Holding, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: no publicly held compnay owns ten percent or more of MRA Holding, LLC. (MCB)
September 18, 2012 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mantra Films, Inc. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: no publicly held company owns ten percent or more of Mantra Films, Inc. (MCB)
September 18, 2012 Filing 28 Consent to Removal by Defendant MRA Holding, LLC. (MCB)
September 18, 2012 Filing 27 Consent to Removal by Defendant Mantra Films, Inc. (MCB)
September 18, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Allen Dalton, II (Filing fee $100) by Defendants MRA Holding, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc. (MCB)
September 18, 2012 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III: Status Conference held on 9/18/2012. (FTR Gold: No.)(No Clerk Present) (BRP)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Now pending is a motion on behalf of the fifteen defendants for a scheduling conference to discuss service-related issues. The Court agrees that such a conference would be beneficial the progress of this litigation. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for hearing [Doc. #23 ] is GRANTED. A status conference shall be held in chambers on Tuesday, September 18, 2012, at 9 o'clock in the morning. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 09/07/2012. (CBL)
September 6, 2012 Filing 23 MOTION for Hearing for Request for Scheduling Conference by Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Berry, Robert)
August 30, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC Sent To: Clerk, Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis Executed by State Court Clerk (Berry, Robert)
August 30, 2012 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
August 30, 2012 Case Opening Notification: Consents issued to all parties. Disclosure of Corporate Interest issued to Mantra Films, Inc.. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert. (DLB)
August 29, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Tamara Favazza. Mantra Entertainment, LLC terminated. (DLB)
August 29, 2012 Filing 20 Complaint (Removal) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Tamara Favazza.(DLB)
August 29, 2012 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Blue Horse Trading, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Pepe Bus, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GGW Events, LLC. Parent companies: GGW Brands, LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Rothwell, LTD.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sands Media, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GGW Marketing, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GGW Magazine, LLC. Parent companies: GGW Brands, LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Path Media Holdings, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GGW Brands, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant J.F., LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GGW Direct, LLC. Parent companies: GGW Brands, LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GGW Brands, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Aero Falcons, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica W. Kennedy for Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jessica)
August 29, 2012 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelley Field Farrell for Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Farrell, Kelley)
August 29, 2012 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert P. Berry for Defendants Aero Falcons, LLC, Blue Horse Trading, LLC, Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, Inc., GGW Brands, LLC, GGW Direct, LLC, GGW Events, LLC, GGW Magazine, LLC, GGW Marketing, LLC, J.F., LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Pepe Bus, LLC, Rothwell, LTD., Sands Media, Inc., Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.. (Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Joseph R. Francis, GGW Brands, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC Sent To: The Medler Law Firm, LLC; Medler & Roither, LLC; Dalton Law Firm, P.C. Unexecuted by State Court Clerk (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Berry, Robert)
August 29, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CIRCUIT COURT OF THE CITY OF ST. LOUIS, case number 1222-CC09045, with receipt number 0865-3440423, in the amount of $350 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by GGW Brands, LLC, Path Media Holdings, LLC, Joseph R. Francis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favazza v. Path Media Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Aramara "Fideicomiso" (Mexican Bank Trust)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGW Direct, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRA Holding, LLC
Represented By: David A. Dalton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Francis
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Horse Trading, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGW Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGW Events, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Path Media Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGW Brands, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGW Magazine, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.F., LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sands Media, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Falcons, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtlecreek Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothwell, LTD.
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Scott Kehlenbrink
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Represented By: William A. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepe Bus, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mantra Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRA Holdings
Represented By: David A. Dalton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGW Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mantra Films, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Dalton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGW Direct
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGW-Online.com
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Berry
Represented By: Jessica W. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Favazza
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Medler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?