Emerson Electric Co. v. Yeo
Plaintiff: |
Emerson Electric Co. |
Defendant: |
Peter Ramos Yeo |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv01578 |
Filed: |
September 4, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Ross |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 5, 2013 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B) 64 is GRANTED. This Court's December 28, 2012 Order is amended to certify the following que stions as modified for immediate interlocutory appeal: 1. Does the 2011 Stock Option Agreement between Emerson Electric Company and Peter Ramos Yeo fail due to lack of adequate consideration under Missouri law barring Emerson from enforcing the restr ictive covenants and forum selection clause contained in that Agreement? 2. Does the District Court lack personal jurisdiction over Ramos Yeo where the only basis for the Court's jurisdiction is the forum selection clause contained in the 2011 S tock Option Agreement between Emerson Electric Co. and Ramos Yeo? IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal 65 is GRANTED in part. The current action is stayed, pending the outcome of Defend ant's application to the Court of Appeals for interlocutory review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file, within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, his answer to Emerson's Verified Petition for Injunctive and Other Relief and Defendant's consent to extension of the existing Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/5/13. (LAH)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendants Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal ECF No. 64 and Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal ECF No. 65 no later than January 10, 2013. Defendant shall file any reply no later than January 15, 2013. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/3/2013. (RAK)
|
December 28, 2012 |
Filing
63
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 37 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone conference with the parties is set for Thursday, January 3, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss Defendant's Motion to Dissolve or Modify The Temporary Restraining Order. [ECF No. 39] as well as a scheduling order. The parties shall initiate the call with the Court at (314) 244-7560.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/28/12. (LGK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?