Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Shepard et al
Plaintiff: |
Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Stephen Shepard and Steve & Colleen's Sports Bar, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv01728 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Washington |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Cable/Satellite TV |
Cause of Action: |
47 U.S.C. ยง 0553 Unauthorized Reception of Cable Service |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 30, 2015 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF #42) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Affidavits and Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Additional Uncontroverted Material Facts (ECF #43) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summa ry Judgment (ECF #48) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Stephen Shepard's motion for summary judgment (ECF #34) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Steve & Colleen's Sports Bar, Inc. d/b/a Zachs Sports & Grill' s motion for summary judgment (ECF #37) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on the § 605 claims (ECF #40) is GRANTED as to defendant Steve & Colleen's Sports Bar, Inc. d/b/a Zach's Sports & Grill and DENIED as to defendant Stephen Shepard. On the § 605 claim (count I) against defendant Steve & Colleen's Sports Bar, Inc. d/b/a Zach's Sports & Grill, summary judgment is GRANTED as set forth herein and counts II and III of the complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that on the § 605 claim against defendant Steve & Colleen's Sports Bar, Inc. d/b/a Zach's Sports & Grill plaintiff is awarded $5,000 in statutory damages under § ; 605(e)(3)(C)(i)(II) and $10,000 in enhanced statutory damages under § 605(e)(3)(C)(ii). The issue of the amount of attorneys' fees and costs to be awarded remains. Plaintiff is granted seven days to submit verified documentation in s upport of its request for attorneys' fees and costs as a prevailing party on the § 605 claim against defendant Sports Bar. Defendant Sports Bar shall have seven days thereafter to file a response. ( Response to Court due by 5/7/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/30/2015. (JMC)
|
February 6, 2014 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Steve & Colleen's Sports Bar, Inc., d/b/a Zach's Sports Bar & Grill's motion to dismiss (#24) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/6/2014. (JMC)
|
August 12, 2013 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 10 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Serve Process by Substitute Service filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for order of substituted service (#10) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this Order in which to effectuate service. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/12/2013. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?