B.F. et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B. F., Beth Forbes and Thomas Forbes
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and Integrity Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv01760
Filed: September 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc.'s motion to exclude or limit the testimony of Jack Land, M.D. is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. [Doc. 57] The motion is GRANTED to the extent tha t Dr. Land will not be permitted to: (1) give any testimony regarding whether B.F. will need another surgery for a tethered cord; will need a derotational osteotomy; or will develop scoliosis; (2) testify that B.F. has strabismus and that it resulted from his spina bifida; or (3) testify that B.F. has hearing loss and that it resulted from his spina bifida. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc.'s motion to exclude c ertain opinion testimony of Godfrey P. Oakley, Jr., M.D. is GRANTED. [Doc. 59] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc.'s motion for oral argument is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 66] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/6/2016. (MRC)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment as to plaintiffs' claim of punitive damages is DENIED. [Doc. 64 ] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/8/16. (JWD)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is DENIED. [Doc. 61 ] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 3/31/16. (JWD)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc.'s motion to limit value of medical treatment rendered to minor plaintiff B.F. pursuant to Missouri Revised Statute § 490.715.5 is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 49] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the parties cannot reach an agreement as to the amount of past medical expenses plaintiffs will claim at trial, defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc. shall file thirty (30) days prior to the date set for trial its motion to limit evidence of the value of medical treatment rendered to plaintiff pursuant to § 490.715.5.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/18/2015. (MRC)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/30/2014. (RAK)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc.s motion to dismiss plaintiffs seventh cause of action for failure to state a claim is DENIED. [Doc. 11]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/22/13. (JWJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.F. et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. F.
Represented By: James M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Forbes
Represented By: James M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Forbes
Represented By: James M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre C. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Inc.
Represented By: Weldon N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?