Carter v. Martin
Petitioner: William Billy Gene Carter
Respondent: Martha Martin
Case Number: 4:2012cv02159
Filed: November 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Callaway
Presiding Judge: Nannette A. Baker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to file an amended petition [ECF No. 28 ] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 07/15/2013. (CLK)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -- HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's combined motion for appointment of counsel and to amend his petition [ECF No. 22 ] is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner wishes to file an amended petition, he must file a motion to amend along with a proposed amended petition within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order.( Response to Court due by 7/16/2013.). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 06/25/2013. (CLK)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : ORDERED that petitioner's petition for writ of habeascorpus is DISMISSED.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 1/15/13. (CEL)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: HEREBYORDERED that petitioner shall, within thirty days of the date of this Order, submit a petition for writ of habeas corpus that complies with this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plainti ff a copy of the Courts petition for writ of habeas corpus under § 2254 form. FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to complywith this Order, the Court will dismiss this action. Response to Court due by 1/5/2013. (forms mailed to petitioner) Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 12/05/12. (CLK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Billy Gene Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martha Martin
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?