Knowlton et al v. Ansheuser-Busch Companies, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brian Knowlton, Douglas Minerd, Gary Lensenmayer and Charles R. Wetesnik
Defendant: Ansheuser-Busch Companies, LLC, Ansheuser-Busch Companies Pension Plan, Ansheuser-Busch Companies Pension Plans Appeals Committee and Ansheuser-Busch Companies Pension Plans Administrative Committee
Case Number: 4:2013cv00210
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 123 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) filed by Plaintiff Gary Lensenmayer, Plaintiff Brian Knowlton, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Joe Mullins, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Donald W. Mills, Jr., Co nsolidated Filer Plaintiff Andy Fichthorn, Plaintiff Charles R. Wetesnik, Plaintiff Douglas Minerd, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Nancy J Anderson, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Richard F. Angevine motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/7/15. (MRS)
October 9, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for a final order and for stay of judgment pending appeal (#108) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a final judgment will issue separately. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that final judgment will be stayed pending appeal with no bond required. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/9/2015. (JMC)
July 8, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING re: 89 PARTIAL MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Gary Lensenmayer, Plaintiff Brian Knowlton, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Joe Mullins, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Donald W. Mills, Jr. , Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Andy Fichthorn, Plaintiff Charles R. Wetesnik, Plaintiff Douglas Minerd, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Nancy J Anderson, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Richard F. Angevine. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/8/15. (MRS)
November 18, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 81 MOTION to Compel Certain Discover Responses from Defendants filed by Plaintiff Gary Lensenmayer, Plaintiff Brian Knowlton, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Joe Mullins, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Donald W. Mil ls, Jr., Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Andy Fichthorn, Plaintiff Charles R. Wetesnik, Plaintiff Douglas Minerd, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Nancy J Anderson, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Richard F. Angevine motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/18/14. (MRS)
July 28, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to revise class definition (#73) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/28/2014. (JMC)
May 16, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to certify class for Count I of their amended complaint, #58, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Nancy J. Anderson, Richard F. Angevine, and Brian Knowlton are app ointed class representatives for the plaintiffs class. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that attorney Joseph R. Dulle (Bar No. 38416MO) and the law firm of Stone, Leyton & Gershman, A Professional Corporation, and attorney Joe D. Jacobson (Bar No. 33715MO) and the law firm of Green Jacobson, P.C., and attorney Scott J. Stitt (admitted pro hac vice) and the law firm of James E. Arnold & Associates, LPA, are appointed class counsel for the plaintiffs' class. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/16/14. (MRS)
May 9, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendantss motion to dismiss, # 45 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/9/14. (KJS)
October 30, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendantss motion to dismiss, #32, is GRANTED, and Counts II and III plaintiffs consolidated complaint are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall have 21 days in which to file an amended Count III. Response to Court due by 11/20/2013.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/30/13. (MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowlton et al v. Ansheuser-Busch Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Knowlton
Represented By: Charles R Grebing
Represented By: Andrew Servais
Represented By: Scott J. Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Minerd
Represented By: Charles R Grebing
Represented By: Andrew Servais
Represented By: Scott J. Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lensenmayer
Represented By: Charles R Grebing
Represented By: Andrew Servais
Represented By: Scott J. Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Wetesnik
Represented By: Charles R Grebing
Represented By: Andrew Servais
Represented By: Scott J. Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansheuser-Busch Companies, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Aspinall
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: David R. Pehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansheuser-Busch Companies Pension Plan
Represented By: Jennifer L. Aspinall
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: David R. Pehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansheuser-Busch Companies Pension Plans Appeals Committee
Represented By: Jennifer L. Aspinall
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: David R. Pehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansheuser-Busch Companies Pension Plans Administrative Committee
Represented By: Jennifer L. Aspinall
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Peter B. Morrison
Represented By: David R. Pehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?