Bodway v. Mumford et al
Plaintiff: |
Louis Sean Bodway |
Defendant: |
Unknown Mumford, John Doe, Unknown Siler, Carrie Unknown, Diana Keaton (Potts) and Kate Doe |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00276 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 8, 2015 |
Filing
78
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of Defendant Brenda Mallard, M.D., for summary judgment is DENIED. (Doc. No. 67 .). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/8/2015. (NEB)
|
June 4, 2013 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to this Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (prisoner actions-standard). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Brenda Mallard, M.D ., shall reply to the second amended complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this case as Louis Sean Bodway v. Brenda Mallard, M.D. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/4/2013. (NCL)
|
March 18, 2013 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on or before April 5, 2013, that complies with this Memorandum and Order. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 4/5/2013. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/18/2013. (NCL)
|
February 28, 2013 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $2.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an orig inal proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions set forth in this Memorandum and Order, within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/28/2013. (KSM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?