Koenig et al v. Bourdeau Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Ryan Koenig, James Koenig, II and Vincent J. Nack |
Defendant: |
Bourdeau Construction, LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00477 |
Filed: |
March 14, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Adair |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Fair Standards |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 21, 2016 |
Filing
74
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 62 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion for a Creditor's Bill filed by Plaintiff Ryan Koenig, Plaintiff Vincent J. Nack, Plaintiff James Craig Larkin, Plaintiff James Koenig, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for a Creditor's Bill in Equity and to Pierce the Corporate Veil of Bourdeau Construction (#62) is GRANTED in part. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/21/16. (CSG)
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to quash the subpoena duces tecum served on 1st Advantage Bank (ECF #58) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's alternative request for a protective order to limit the use and disclosure of records obtained in response to the subpoena is GRANTED. Any documents obtained in response to the subpoena duces tecum may only be used for the purposes of discovering assets held by defendant and executing upon the Judgment, the disclosure of those records is limited to the parties and their attorneys, and social security numbers shall be redacted from the disclosed records. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/30/2015. (JMC)
|
April 10, 2015 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' verified request for attorneys' fees and costs (ECF #50) is GRANTED and plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,290.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that def endant shall pay the sum of$3,290.00 within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Defendant shall make the check payable to plaintiffs and their counsel of record and mail it to plaintiffs' counsel of record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall promptly notify the Court that it has complied with this Order. Failure to comply may result in sanctions. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/10/2015. (JMC)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel (ECF #45) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant, through deponent James M. Bourdeau, shall fully respond to the 142 unanswered deposition questions, in writi ng and under oath, without a blanket invocation of the Fifth Amendment within seven days. As there were no other objections made at the time of the deposition, all other objections have been waived. For each question, a substantive answer shall be ma de, unless a real danger of incrimination is specifically established with respect to each question. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall notify the Court within seven days that it has complied with this order. Failure to comply may result in s anctions.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that plaintiffs are granted seven days to submit verified documentation in support of their request for attorney's fees and costs. Defendants shall have seven days thereafter to file a response. ( Response to Court due by 4/2/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/26/2015. (JMC)
|
November 26, 2014 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 33 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Ryan Koenig, Plaintiff Vincent J. Nack, Plaintiff James Craig Larkin, Plaintiff James Koenig, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for attorneys 039; fees and costs (ECF #33) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $25,054.10 and costs in the amount of $563.55. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/26/14. (CSG)
|
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to conditionally certify the class and authorization to send notice of suit to potential opt-in plaintiffs (#8) is GRANTED. The Court conditionally certifies a class of all cur rent and former hourly employees of defendant Bourdeau Construction LLC who performed work as laborers in commercial and residential roofing and construction during the three years prior to the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall provide plaintiffs' attorneys with a computer readable data file containing the names, last known addresses, e-mail addresses (if available), telephone number, and dates of employment within fourteen days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs may send out their notice and consent (Exhibits 3 and 4), consistent with the revisions stated in this Order, and defendant shall be required to conspicuously post the revised notice and consent in its office break room at 3310 Woodsway Drive, St. Charles, Missouri until the opt-in period expires. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/31/2013. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?