Garco Wine Company, Inc. v. Constellation Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Garco Wine Company, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Constellation Brands, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00661 |
Filed: |
April 9, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Richard Webber |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Franchise |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
44
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (Amendment to 43 ) This Court's prior Order, issued September 25, 2013 [ECF No. 43 ], properly included pages 31 and 32 as part of the material to be redacted from the "Exhibits to Missouri State Distributio n Agreement" before production of the exhibits to Garco, but inadvertently failed to identify these pages as "Exhibit H Local Marketing Fund." Consequently, the Court is issuing this Amended Memorandum and Order to correctly identify E xhibit H as a section to be redacted before production of "Exhibits to Missouri State Distribution Agreement." The last full sentence beginning on page 4 and continuing through page 5 of the September 25, 2013, Order [ECF No. 43 ] has been modified to reference Exhibit H. In all other respects, the Order remains unchanged. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 09/27/2013. (CBL)
|
September 25, 2013 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Garcos' Motion to Compel Discovery [ECF No. 35 ] is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Constellation shall produce to Garco the "Constellation Brands, Inc. Distri bution Agreement" and its attached "Exhibits to Missouri State Distribution Agreement," redacted in accordance with the limitations set forth in this Order, and disseminated in accordance with the Protective Order governing confidential information in this matter. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 09/25/2013. (CBL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?