Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. et al v. 3L Communications Missouri. LLC
Plaintiff: |
Wiltel Communications, L.L.C. and Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. |
Defendant: |
3L Communications Missouri. LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
3L Communications Missouri. LLC |
Counter_defendant: |
Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. and Wiltel Communications, L.L.C. |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00885 |
Filed: |
May 9, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Charles |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Richard Webber |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
47 U.S.C. ยง 0151 Cable Communication Policy Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 21, 2014 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's previous stay is lifted, and 3L Communications' Motion for Confirmation of Award [ECF No. 29 ] is GRANTED. The Final Award of the Arbitrator, dated May 21, 2014, [ECF No. 29-1 ], incorporated herein by reference, is CONFIRMED. 3L Communications is awarded the amount of the Award, $1,600,637.87 plus interest, costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment shall be entered in accordance with the Final Award of the Arbitrator, dated May 21, 2014, and with this Memorandum and Order. So Ordered this 21st day of July, 2014. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on July 21, 2014. (BRP)
|
July 26, 2013 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant 3L Communications Missouri, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 10 ] is hereby GRANTED. The parties shall proceed to arbitration, and this matter is STAY ED pending resolution of the arbitration proceedings initiated before the AAA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Referral to Federal Communications Commission [ECF No. 16 ] is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 07/26/2013. (CBL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. et al v. 3L Communications Missouri. LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Wiltel Communications, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Thomas W. Hayde, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Eric A. Linden |
Represented By: |
Megan D. Meadows |
Represented By: |
Michael J. Shortley, III |
Represented By: |
Erik O. Solverud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Eric A. Linden |
Represented By: |
Thomas W. Hayde, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Megan D. Meadows |
Represented By: |
Michael J. Shortley, III |
Represented By: |
Erik O. Solverud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: 3L Communications Missouri. LLC |
Represented By: |
Carl J. Lumley |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: 3L Communications Missouri. LLC |
Represented By: |
Carl J. Lumley |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Thomas W. Hayde, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Eric A. Linden |
Represented By: |
Megan D. Meadows |
Represented By: |
Michael J. Shortley, III |
Represented By: |
Erik O. Solverud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Wiltel Communications, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Thomas W. Hayde, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Eric A. Linden |
Represented By: |
Megan D. Meadows |
Represented By: |
Michael J. Shortley, III |
Represented By: |
Erik O. Solverud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?