Stufflebean v. Faith et al
Plaintiff: |
Jason Stufflebean |
Defendant: |
Unknown Falzone, Randall D. McKinley, Sally Faith, Unknown Tetemble and City of Saint Charles, Missouri |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv01156 |
Filed: |
June 17, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Pike |
Presiding Judge: |
Catherine D. Perry |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $32.65 within thirty (3 0) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued upon the complaint as to defendants Unknown Falzone and Unknown Tetemble in their individual capacities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 09/16/2013. (CBL)
|
August 14, 2013 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a written supplement to his complaint within thirty (30) da ys from the date of this Order, stating whether he is suing each of the named defendants their official capacity, individual capacity, or both official and individual capacities, in accordance with the specific instructions set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to him. Response to Court due by 9/14/2013. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on August 14, 2013. (MCB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?