Slack v. Corizon Medical Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert Slack |
Defendant: |
Corizon Medical Services, Inc., Samantha Turntine and Brenda Christian |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv01170 |
Filed: |
June 19, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Washington |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles A. Shaw |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 18, 2015 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is GRANTED. [No. 73] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $36.15 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/18/15. (KXS)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to set aside judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60 is DENIED. [Doc. 62] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to strike defendants' memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion to set aside judgment is DENIED. [Doc. 71]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/11/2015. (MRC)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's motion for compensation of services and reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses is GRANTED in the amount of Four Thousand Five Hundred Fifty-One Dollars and Ninety-Nine Cents ($4, 551.99). [Doc. 54 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall promptly disburse the sum of Four Thousand Five Hundred Fifty-One Dollars and Ninety-Nine Cents ($4,551.99) from the Attorney Admission Fee Non-Appropriated Fund, pay able to: Mr. Bradley R. Hansmann BROWN AND JAMES, P.C. 800 Market Street Suite 1000 St. Louis, MO 63101 The Court wishes to express its appreciation to appointed counsel for his efforts on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/9/15. (KXS)
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing
56
JUDGMENT -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of defendants Samantha Turntine (n/k/a Samantha Pratt) and Brenda Reagan, and against plaintiff Robert Slack on plaintiff's claims brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and the Eighth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/19/2014. (MRC)
|
September 13, 2013 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is GRANTED. [Doc. 4] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Bradley R. Hansmann of Brown and James, P.C., 800 Market Street, Suite 1100, St. Louis, Mi ssouri 63101, telephone number (314) 421-3400, is hereby appointed as counsel for the plaintiff. Counsel shall have thirty (30) days from the date of receipt of the Court file in which to file an amended complaint if deemed appropriate. Appointed cou nsel is advised that all applications for disbursement of funds from the Eastern District's Attorney Admission Fee Non-Appropriated Fund are governed by Local Rules 12.03 and 12.06, the Administrative Order of January 15, 2008 concerning the Att orney Admission Fee Non-Appropriated Fund, and the Regulations Governing the Disbursement of Funds from the Non-Appropriated Fund for Attorney's Fees and Out-of-Pocket Expenses Incurred by Attorneys Appointed to Represent Indigent Parties in Ci vil Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e), dated January 15, 2008. The Order and Regulations, as well as form requests for compensation of services and reimbursement of expenses, may be obtained from the Clerk of the Court or printed from the Court's Internet website, www.moed.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide appointed counsel with a copy of the complete Court file. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/13/2013. (NCL)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. Doc. 7 The Clerk of Court shall detach and docket the amended complaint, which was submitted as an attachment to plaintiffs motio n for leave. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on defendants Samantha Turntine and Brenda Christian, both of whom are alleged to work for Corizon Medical Services, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate Corizon Medical Services, Inc. from this action, as the claims against it have been abandoned. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs official-capacity claims against defendants Turntine and Christian are DISMISSED. An order of partial dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/13/2013. (RAK)
|
July 10, 2013 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [Doc. 2] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $32.88 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remitt ance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 7/10/2013. (NCL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?