March 17, 2014 |
Filing
63
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 33 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 53 ] is DISMISSED with prejudice, in its entirety. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 03/17/2014. (CBL)
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 54 MOTION to Lift Stay , Amend Case Management Order and Continue Trial Setting filed by Plaintiff Stevon Anzaldua. motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on February 19, 2014. (MCB)
|
February 5, 2014 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion, Affidavit, and Supporting Legal Memorandum to Defer Defendants' Premature Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Grant Additional Time for Plaintiff to C onduct Discovery and to Lift Stay on Discovery/Amend Case Management Order for Such Purpose [ECF No. 36 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 33 ] within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on February 5, 2014. (BRP)
|
December 31, 2013 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Motion for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, to Lift Discovery Stay and Amend Case Management Order [ECF No. 40 ] is GRANTED. Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than January 6, 2014.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motio n to Extend Time to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First-Amended Complaint [ECF No. 41 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First-Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than January 8, 2014. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on December 31, 2013. (BRP)
|
November 27, 2013 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 15 Memorandum & Order Dated October 21, 2013 [doc 15], or Alternatively, Motion for leave to Amend Complaint is HELD IN ABEYANCE, pending Plaintiff's submission of a proposed ame nded complaint. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed amended complaint, for the Court's considerataion, within fifteen (15) days of the entry of this Order. (Response to Court due by 12/12/2013.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on November 27, 2013. (MCB)
|
October 21, 2013 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 9 ] is DENIED in part, and GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts II, III, and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No . 1 ] are DISMISSED with prejudice, in their entirety, for failure to state a claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims brought against individual defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that Plaintiff's cause of action for municipal liability against Fire District, contained in Count I of his Complaint, is DISMISSED with prejudice, for failure to state a claim. As no claims against Fire District remain, it shall be dismi ssed from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any due process claims asserted by Plaintiff in his Complaint, are DISMISSED as abandoned. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against Defendants Clarence Young, Bridget Quinlisk-Dailey, and Quinten Randolph are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/21/2013. (CBL)
|