Oliver v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
William Oliver |
Defendant: |
Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv01478 |
Filed: |
July 31, 2013 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Randolph |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Richard Webber |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Inj. Prod. Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2015 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) Given Plaintiff's position as a pro se litigant, and the formal language used by the Court in its Order setting the August 21st hearing, the Court will provide Plaintiff with another opportunity to appea r and make argument in support of his Motion to Appoint Counsel. Therefore, the Court's previous ruling from the August 21st hearing, denying the Motion to Appoint Counsel and ordering Plaintiff to file a Response showing cause as to "why [D]efendants' motion to dismiss should not be granted," is vacated [See ECF No. 43 ]. The new hearing for argument on Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel will be held on Thursday, September 17, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., at the Thomas F. Eagle ton Courthouse, 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis, MO 63102, in Courtroom 17 South. Plaintiff is ordered to appear at that time and place to argue in support of his Motion to Appoint Counsel. To avoid any additional travel costs, counsel for Defendants may appear by telephone. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 8/28/2015. (CBL)
|
May 20, 2015 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time [ECF No. 31 ] is GRANTED, for the purpose of preparing an Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, no later than June 30, 20 15, an Amended Complaint, using the Court-provided form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff a copy of the form entitled MOED-0032 Civil Complaint, with further instructions regarding how to access the form onlin e. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement [ECF No. 18 ] is DENIED, as moot. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 5/20/15. (EAB) (Form MOED-0032 and instructions mailed to plaintiff on 5/20/15). (EAB).
|
April 28, 2015 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel [ECF No. 28] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, no later than May 20, 2015, a Response to the pending Motion for a More Definite Statement. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on April 28, 2015. (MCB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?