Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Ehret, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund and Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund |
Defendant: |
Ehret, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv01678 |
Filed: |
August 26, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Adair |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1132 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 26, 2014 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for default judgment is GRANTED. Doc. # 14 An appropriate Judgment showing Defendants full liability of $30,469.05 for the periods set forth above shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/26/2014. (RAK)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall submit all outstanding remittance reports to Plaintiffs within 21 days of the date of this Order. Defendant is cautioned that failure to comply with this Order may result in the impositio n of sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have leave for 21 additional days to amend their motion for default judgment to reflect additional amounts shown to be due by said remittance reports, along with late fees, interest, and add itional attorney's fees and expenses. Final judgment shall be entered after Plaintiffs have had the chance to amend their motion for default judgment within the time frame set forth above. If Plaintiffs fail to amend their motion for default jud gment in the time allocated, the Court shall enter judgment for Plaintiffs in the amounts set forth in support of the motion now filed with the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerks Office is directed to serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on Defendant Ehret, Inc., at the address of service employed by the process server. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/23/2014. (NCL)
|
October 3, 2013 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to reconsider is DENIED. Doc. No. 6 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/3/2013. (RAK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?