Speed v. Jennings City Jail
Plaintiff: |
Antonio Nathaniel Speed |
Defendant: |
Jennings City Jail, Lt. Neil, C/O Williams, C/O Crimb and C/O Goad |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv01749 |
Filed: |
September 3, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles A. Shaw |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 18, 2013 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [Doc. 2] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) as both legally frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. An Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/18/2013. (NCL)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Courtprovided form within thirty (3 0) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that his amended complaint will completely take the place of his original complaint and will be the only pleading that this Court will review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply timely and fully with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for noncompliance with this Order, the dismissal will not constitute a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Response to Court due by 10/6/2013. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/6/13. (JWJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?