U.S. Commodity Futures Trading v. Steele et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading
Defendant: Daniel K. Steele, Champion Management International, LLC and Judy D. Steele
Case Number: 4:2013cv01900
Filed: September 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Phelps
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7 U.S.C. ยง 6
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel filed by Defendants' attorneys indicating that the final Consent Order entered on December 15, 2014 concludes this matter, the Motion to Withdraw [ECF No. 69] is GRANTED, and the case is now CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/5/15. (ALM)
December 31, 2014 Filing 69 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record: by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele (Cosgrove, David) Modified on 1/5/2015 (BRP).
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CONSENT ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, CIVIL MONETARY PENALTY AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF AGAINST DEFENDANTS DANIEL K. STEELE AND CHAMPION MANAGEMENT INTERNATIONAL, LLC AND RELIEF DEFENDANT JUDY D. STEELE...(SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/15/2014. (NEB)
December 11, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE Filing Proposed Consent Order: by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order for Permanent Injunction, Civil Monetary Penalty and Other Equitable Relief Against Defendants Daniel K. Steele and Champion Management International, LLC and Relief Defendant Judy D. Steele)(Devoe, Melanie)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 66. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Tue Dec 2 08:54:28 CST 2014 (Porter, Brittany)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the Parties' Joint Status Report [ECF No. 65], the proceedings in this matter are STAYED for an additional 45 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report no later than January 16, 2015. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/1/14. (ALM)
November 25, 2014 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Smith, Eugene)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay the Proceedings [ECF No. 63] is GRANTED. The proceedings shall be STAYED for 60 days to allow approval of the proposed consent order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report no later than November 25, 2014, indicating the status of the case. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/26/14. (ALM)
September 25, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION to Stay re #62 Rule 16 Order by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Eugene)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/1/2014. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/8/2014 11:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/5/2014. (NEB)
August 15, 2014 Filing 61 ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, by Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele.(Cosgrove, David)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Ronnie L. White, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/7/2014. (MRC)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to reset the Rule 16 conference #58 is denied. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/6/14. (ARL)
August 4, 2014 Filing 58 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Eugene)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 conference currently set for August 18, 2014 is canceled and will be reset by further Order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for extension of time to file answer #56 is granted.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/31/14. (LGK)
July 30, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #53 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (Cosgrove, David)
July 30, 2014 Filing 55 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. . (Smith, Eugene)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference pursuant to Rule 16, Fed.R.Civ.P., is reset to Monday, August 18, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. in my chambers 16-South. Counsel are expected to appear in person for the scheduling conference. The joint proposed scheduling plan is now due on or before August 11, 2014.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/28/14. (LGK)
July 16, 2014 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Amendment to #1 Complaint, , filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Attachment First Amended Complaint)(Smith, Eugene)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to continue Rule 16 conference #49 is granted only as follows: the scheduling conference previously set for July 16, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned is reset to August 12, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned. Counsel are expected to appear in person for the scheduling conference. The parties shall comply with the provisions of the Order Setting Rule 16 Conference #48 and file their joint proposed scheduling plan by no later than August 5, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the memorandum objection to plaintiff's notice of subpoena #50 is overruled, as the Court previously granted the parties leave to engage in written discovery prior to the Rule 16 scheduling conference.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/16/14. (LGK)
June 12, 2014 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM re #50 Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena and Amended Notice of Subpoena by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Third Party Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit Notice of Amended Third Party Subpoena)(Haas, Peter)
June 11, 2014 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena and Amended Notice of Subpoena by Defendants Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (Cosgrove, David)
June 9, 2014 Filing 49 Consent MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Peter)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: PTRACK 2 - STANDARD Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/11/2014. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/16/2014 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/5/14. (LGK)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: As discussed during todays status conference,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by no later than July 16, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there will be a Rule 16 conference in this matter on July 16, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned. Counsel are expected to appear in person for the scheduling conference. The parties shall comply with the provisions of the Order Setting Rule 16 Conference, sent out this same date, and file their joint proposed scheduling plan by no later than July 11, 2014. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/4/14. (ARL)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED there will be a telephone status conference in this matter on June 4, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. to discuss prosecution or resolution of this matter. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for placing the conference call and shall have all parties on the line before contacting my chambers at 314-244-7430. Defense counsel shall provide plaintiff'scounsel with a number where he can be reached in advance of the conference. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/14/14. (ARL)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' motion to continue #44 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the status conference in this matter is reset to Wednesday, May 14, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. in my chambers to discuss scheduling issues. Plaintiff's counsel may participate in the conference by telephone as previously arranged with my chambers.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/5/14. (LGK)
May 4, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION to Continue May 7, 2014 Status Conference by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (Cosgrove, David)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #42 MOTION to Withdraw #37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Cosgrove Law Group, LLC by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/23/14. (JWD)
April 22, 2014 Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw #37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Cosgrove Law Group, LLC by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (Cosgrove, David)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are granted leave to propound written discovery only prior to the Rule 16 scheduling conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defense counsel will submit any additional documentation supporting his motion for leave to withdraw #37 to my chambers for in camera inspection by 2:00 p.m. Friday, March 28, 2014. Defense counsel shall also provide a courtesy copy of his submission to Daniel Steele, who may submit an in camera (this means it does not have to be filed or sent to plaintiff) written response to my chambers by 2:00 p.m. on Friday, April 11, 2014. Mr. Steele shall provide a courtesy copy of his response to defense counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there will be a status conference in this matter on May 7, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16-South to discuss resolution of the pending motion to withdraw and scheduling issues. Plaintiffs counsel may participate in the hearing by telephone if they so notify my chambers by noon on May 5, 2014. If defendants have not yet retained new counsel to represent them in this matter, defendants are required to attend the hearing in person. Mr. Steele may appear as an authorized representative for the corporate defendant. Defense counsel is responsible for notifying defendants of this Order as well as the May 7, 2014 hearing.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/26/14. (LGK)
March 26, 2014 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Hearing held on 3/26/2014 on defense counsel's motion to withdraw. Discussion held between Court and counsel. Ruling deferred until further information provided to Court in camera. Status conference set for 5/7/14 at 10:00 a.m. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:Shannon White.) (FTR Gold: No.) (LGK)
March 14, 2014 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT and Memorandum of the Parties by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Smith, Eugene)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that there will be a hearing on defense counsels motion for leave to withdraw [#37] on March 26, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 16-South. Defendants are required to appear in person for the hearing, and defendant Champion Management International, LLC, shall appear by and through an authorized corporate representative. Defense counsel is responsible for notifying his clients of this hearing and securing their attendance. Plaintiffs counsel may participate in the hearing by telephone if they so notifymy chambers no later than noon on March 24, 2014. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/14/14. (JWD)
March 13, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Cosgrove Law Group, LLC by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (Cosgrove, David)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than March 14, 2014, the parties shall file a joint memorandum with the Court indicating the status of this case and what, if any, they believe the next appropriate steps to be. The Court will not set a scheduling conference before reviewing the next status memorandum. I encourage the parties to continue working together to resolve this matter without additional litigation or Court involvement. Status Report due by 3/14/2014. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/15/14. (ARL)
January 14, 2014 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT of Parties by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Smith, Eugene)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than January 14, 2014, the parties shall file a joint status memorandum with the Court indicating whether this case has been settled, or whether the parties intend to proceed with this matter. If the parties intend for this case to go forward, then they shall advise the Court of what they believe the next appropriate steps to be, ie., whether a Rule 16 scheduling conference and any other orders may be necessary.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/7/14. (LGK)
January 3, 2014 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele.(Cosgrove, David)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (Cosgrove, David) filed by Judy D. Steele, Daniel K. Steele, Champion Management International, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/12/13. (ARL)
December 11, 2013 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (Cosgrove, David)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - attorney/firm Brian F. McEvoy by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele. (LAH) filed by Daniel K. Steele, Champion Management International, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/18/13. (ARL)
November 15, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - attorney/firm Brian F. McEvoy by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele. (LAH)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian F. McEvoy. The Certificate of Good Standing was not attached.(Filing fee $100) by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (LAH) filed by Judy D. Steele, Daniel K. Steele, Champion Management International, LLC - GRANTED Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/14/13. (LAH)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 28. DTO mailed to non-registered atty Thu Nov 14 08:49:59 CST 2013 (Holwitt, Lisa)
November 12, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian F. McEvoy. The Certificate of Good Standing was not attached.(Filing fee $100) by Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (LAH)
November 12, 2013 Receipt 4644039250 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Brian F. McEvoy (CCAM)
November 12, 2013 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by David B. Cosgrove for Defendants Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele. (Cosgrove, David)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Eugene) filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/1/13. (LGK)
October 31, 2013 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Eugene)
October 31, 2013 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Unredacted Copy of Exhibit B to Declaration of George H. Malas by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Part 3 of Exhibit B)(Devoe, Melanie)
October 31, 2013 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Unredacted Copy of Exhibits D through F by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Devoe, Melanie)
October 31, 2013 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Unredacted Copy of Exhibit C to Declaration of George H. Malas by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Devoe, Melanie)
October 31, 2013 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Unredacted Exhibit A to Declaration of George H. Malas by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Devoe, Melanie)
October 29, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE Appearance: by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Haas, Peter)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF. See Order for details. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for October 31, 2013 is VACATED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/29/13. (ARL)
October 29, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading of Filing Proposed Consent Order of Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order of Preliminary Injunction)(Smith, Eugene)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Lift Stay Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/21/13. (LAH)
October 21, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION to Lift Stay by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Smith, Eugene)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay hearing dates and deadlines. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon reinstatement of the employment status of the undersigned counsel, the CFTC shall seek to lift the stay and, with consultation with counsel for defts', request that the Court set a new date for the order to show cause hearing not to exceed 10 business days from the date that the Federal Government reopens for business. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/1/13. (LGK)
September 30, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #7 Order, by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Eugene)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: re #11 Motion to Unseal Case. MOTION TO LIFT SEAL OF ALL PLEADINGS IN THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/26/13. (ARL)
September 26, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION to Unseal Case by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (BAK)
September 26, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. Judy D. Steele served on 9/25/2013, answer due 10/16/2013. (BAK)
September 26, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. Daniel K. Steele served on 9/25/2013, answer due 10/16/2013. (BAK)
September 26, 2013 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. Champion Management International, LLC served on 9/25/2013, answer due 10/16/2013. (BAK)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STATUTORY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF ( Show Cause Hearing set for 10/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/25/13. (ARL)
September 25, 2013 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAK)
September 25, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Case by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (BAK)
September 25, 2013 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 EX PARTE MOTION for Statutory Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2013: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Attachment A, #4 Attachment B, #5 Attachment C, #6 Attachment D, #7 Attachment E, #8 Attachment F, #9 Text of Proposed Order) (BAK).
September 25, 2013 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Statutory Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction and Other Equitable Relief by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (BAK)
September 25, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF against defendant Champion Management International, LLC, Daniel K. Steele, Judy D. Steele 3 Summons(es) issued, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Champion Management, #4 Summons Daniel Steele, #5 Summons Judy Steele)(BAK)
September 25, 2013 Case Opening Notification - 3 Summons(es) issued, Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. The summons were hand delivered to attorney Eugene Smith. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading v. Steele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading
Represented By: Eugene Smith
Represented By: Melanie Theobald Devoe
Represented By: Peter M. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel K. Steele
Represented By: David B. Cosgrove
Represented By: Brian F. McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Management International, LLC
Represented By: David B. Cosgrove
Represented By: Brian F. McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy D. Steele
Represented By: David B. Cosgrove
Represented By: Brian F. McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?