Flynn v. Ascension Health Long Term Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Debra Flynn
Defendant: Ascension Health Long Term Disability Plan and Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv02449
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs, [Doc. No. 72 ], is Denied. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/22/2016. (CLK)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 58] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 61] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to Defendant Sedgwick to reopen the administrative record for the limited purpose discussed herein. 58 61 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/20/15. (CLA)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, [Doc. No. 39 ] is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for a hearing is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/23/2014. (CLK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn v. Ascension Health Long Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Flynn
Represented By: Troy W. Haney
Represented By: Talia Ravis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Health Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?