McAllister v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: |
Eugene McAllister |
Defendant: |
Ferguson Police Department, St. Louis County Police Department, St. Louis Police Dept. K-9 Unit, Robert Dean, Percich, Jackson, Scanning Program - South Central Corr Center and Eddie Boyd |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv02492 |
Filed: |
December 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carol E. Jackson |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 5, 2015 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Eddie Boyd for summary judgment [Doc. #41] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant Robert Dean for summary judgment [Doc. #45] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/2015. (KMS)
|
April 9, 2014 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint [Doc. # 14 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's official capacity claims against defendants Eddie Boyd and Robert Dean are dismissed without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant Dean for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading [Doc. # 17 ] is granted. The defendant shall have until May 9, 2014 to file an answer or other responsive pleading.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/9/14. (KKS)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $45.82 within thirty (30) days of the date of this O rder. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proc eeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue proc ess or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to the individual capacity claims of excessive force against defendants Eddie Boyd and Robert Dean. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants Boyd and Dean sh all reply to plaintiffs claims of excessive force, brought against them in their individual capacities, within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Cler k shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Ferguson Police Department, St. Louis County Police Department, St. Louis Police Department K-9 Unit, Officer Percich, Officer Jackson or the Scanning Program at South Central Correctional Center because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs request for production of documents and motion for discovery [Doc. #7 and Doc. #8] are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. An order of partial dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/14/2014. (KMS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?