Walker v. Kane et al
Plaintiff: |
Maurice Walker |
Defendant: |
Thomas R. Kane, Missouri Department of Corrections, George Lombardi, Tom Villmer, Amy Roderick, Doug Barker, Dale White and Jerome Nash |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv02498 |
Filed: |
December 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Pike |
Presiding Judge: |
Catherine D. Perry |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2017 |
Filing
103
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $11.00 within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/20/17. (EAB)
|
February 16, 2017 |
Filing
100
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $505 appellate filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Cler k shall mail plaintiff a copy of the Court's form "Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will deny in forma pauperis status. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/16/2017. (Form and Order mailed to plaintiff at Moberly Correctional Center this date.) (CBL)
|
August 30, 2016 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment 46 is GRANTED as to the claim brought against defendant Doug Baker. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment 46 is DENIED as to the claims brought against defendants Dale White and Catherine Amonds.This case will be set for trial by separate order. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on August 30, 2016. (MCB)
|
June 3, 2014 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's ex parte motion for the U.S. Marshal's Office to effectuate service in this matter [ECF No. 17 ] is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Cler k shall remove the ex parte restrictions from the motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motions to appoint counsel [ECF Nos. 4 , 18 ] are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must provide the name, employer, and location of named defendant Doug Barker within thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. If plaintiff fails to timely file this information, I will dismiss Barker without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 06/03/2014. (CBL)
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue as to defendants Doug Barker, Doug White, and Unknown Amonds, all of whom are alleged to be or have been employees of the Missouri Department of Corrections. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Missouri Department of Corrections, Thomas Kane, George Lombardi, Tom Villmer, Amy Roderick, Lisa White, Unknown Worelly, Dwayne Kempker, and Jerome Nash are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. A separate Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed forthwith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on March 4, 2014. (MCB)
|
January 29, 2014 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Maurice Walker. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $7.37 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint no later than twenty-eight (28) days from th e date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. ( Response to Court due by 2/28/2014.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on January 29, 2014. (blank "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Under 42 U.S.C. Section 1983" sent to plaintiff along with this Memorandum and Order.)(MCB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?