Moon v. Pratte et al
Plaintiff: |
Darnell Wesly Moon |
Defendant: |
Barron E. Pratte, Amy Walp, Karen Auners, Walter Spitzmiller, Jason W. Gilliam, Jeffrey A. Burgert, Timothy O. Dell, Victor Vega, Steve Thomas, Kathy Huesler, Paul Laird and Bradley Lott |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv02570 |
Filed: |
December 24, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Francois |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Ross |
Nature of Suit: |
Conditions of Confinement |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 21, 2015 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall cause service to be effected upon defendants Bradley Lott, Heather Garner, Karen Auners, Jerry Creamer, Jeffrey Burgert, Amy Walp and Walter Spitzmiller no later than August 21, 2015. In the absence of good cause shown, failure to timely serve said defendants shall result in the dismissal of the present action, without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/21/15. (LGK)
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendants Vega, Huesler, Laird, Thomas, Smith, Pratte or Gilliam are subject to dismissal because, as to these defendants, the amended complaint is legally frivolous or fai ls to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendants in their official capacity are subject to dismissal because these claims are legally frivolous or fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendants for access to courts, pursuant to the First Amendment, are subject to dismissal because these claims are legally frivolous or fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendants for purported unlawful conditions of confinement under the Eighth Amendment are subject to dismissal because these claims are legally frivolous or fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/26/14. (LGK)
|
June 18, 2014 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the Court's March 25, 2014 Order of Dismissal [Doc. #17] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amende d complaint [Doc. #17] is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall detach the document attached to Docket No. 17 and file it as an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief [Doc. #18] is DENIED AS MOOT. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for the Court to take judicial notice/to supplement his amended complaint [Doc. #19] is DENIED. The Clerk shall strike plaintiff's notice from the Docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for status [Doc. #22 and #23] are DENIED AS MOOT given the Court's detailed explanation herein. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/18/14. (JWD)
|
April 9, 2014 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's post-dismissal motion for preliminary injunction [Doc 8 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for copies is GRANTED IN PART. The Clerk shall provide plaintiff a copy of the Court's March 25, 2014 Memorandum and Order and Order of Dismissal and a copy of the most recent docket sheet. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/9/14. (JWD)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, his motion to appoint counsel, and his motion requesting service of process [Doc. # 2 , # 4 and # 5 ] are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint because the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b). An appropriate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/25/14. (ARL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?