October 14, 2016 |
Filing
219
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion and Application for Fees and Expenses (ECF No. 195 ) is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part. The Court awards Plaintiff $185,969.91 in fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defen dants John Moton and Nicholas Martorano's Motion for a New Trial (ECF No. 201 ), Motion of Defendant John Moton for Judgment in His Favor as a Matter of Law (ECF No. 203 ), and Defendants John Moton and Nicholas Martorano's Motions to Alter or Amend the Judgments (ECF No. 205 ) are DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike (ECF No. 207 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/14/2016. (KCB)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing
218
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion of Officers Moton nd Martorano for Stay of Execution [ECF No. 215 ] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/03/2016. (KCB)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing
125
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 124 ), in part and the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified on ly upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: [SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS] (Jury Trial set for 6/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White., Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2016., Motion in Limine due by 6/10/2016., Pretrial Compliance due by 5/31/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 8, 2016. (BRP)
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Memorandum of Law in Support (ECF No. 121 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 7, 2016. (BRP)
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing
113
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Case Management Order (ECF No. 112 ) is GRANTED, in part and the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of excepti onal circumstances: See Order for Complete Details. (Discovery Completion due by 1/11/2016. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2016. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2016. Motion in Limine due by 6/10/2016. Pretrial Compliance due by 5/31/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/24/2015. (NEB)
|
September 8, 2015 |
Filing
100
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Consent Motion to Amend the Case Management Order (ECF No. 98 ). (Jury Trial set for 6/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Motion in Limine due by 8/29/2016. Pretrial Compliance due by 8/19/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on September 8, 2015. (BRP)
|
August 28, 2015 |
Filing
96
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Against the City of St. Louis (ECF No. 89 ) and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Memorandum of Law Against Defendants Martorano, Moton, Carroll, & Tomlinson (E CF No. 91 ) are DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part, in accordance with the discussion outlined above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall provide an amended protective order, which includes an "attorneys ' eyes only" prov ision within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants shall supplement their discovery responses within fourteen (14) days of this Order. ( Response to Court due by 9/4/2015.). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/28/2015. (NEB)
|
June 29, 2015 |
Filing
85
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Proposed Modification of Scheduling Order (ECF No. 84 ) is GRANTED, in part, and the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances : [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE LIST OF DETAILS] (ADR Future Reference 8/14/2015., Discovery Completion due by 11/27/2015., Jury Trial set for 6/6/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White., Motion in Limine due by 5/27/2016., Pretrial Compliance due by 5/17/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on June 29, 2015. (BRP)
|
June 12, 2015 |
Filing
80
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Consent Motion for Leave to Extend Deadlines (ECF No. 79 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the ADR deadline is temporarily STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit an amended joint proposed scheduling plan no later than June 26, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Dr. Paul Geiger with the Second Amended Complaint no later than June 26, 2015. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/26/2015.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on June 12, 2015. (BRP)
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
65
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order (ECF No. 64 ) is GRANTED, in part, and the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional cir cumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS)( ADR Future Reference 5/15/2015., Discovery Completion due by 7/20/2015., Jury Trial set for 11/16/2015 09:00 AM before District Judge Ronnie L. White., Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2015., Motion in Limine due by 11/6/2015., Pretrial Compliance due by 10/27/2015.). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/3/2015. (NEB)
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Board of Police Commissioners and St. Louis City Metropolitan Police Department [ECF No. 32 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Richard Gray, Erwin O. Switzer, Thomas Irwin, and Francis Slay [ECF No 43 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on October 22, 2014. (BRP)
|