Fowler v. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al

Plaintiff: Mimi Fowler
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C. and Kozeny Lenders 1-100
Case Number: 4:2014cv01127
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Bank of America, N.A. 's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 39) and Defendant Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 43) are GRANTED, in part, an d DENIED, in part. Counts I and II are DISMISSED with prejudice. Count III is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order, no later than June 8, 2015. ( Response to Court due by 6/8/2015.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/26/15. (JWJ)
January 6, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Joint Motion for Stay of Remand Order Pending Appeal with Incorporated Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ECF No. 29 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/6/2015. (NEB)
November 19, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF No. 21 ] is GRANTED. An Order of Remand is filed herewith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/19/2014. (NEB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mimi Fowler
Represented By: Jonathan F. Andres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Russell
Represented By: Amy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C.
Represented By: Ira L. Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kozeny Lenders 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?