February 27, 2017 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt 36 is GRANTED and Defendant Miller Building Group, LLC, is found in CONTEMPT of this Court. As sanctioned, Defendant is liable for a fine of $200.00 per da y for every day after this date that Defendant fails to submit its records for inspection or otherwise comply with this Court's Orders and Plaintiffs' discovery requests. Plaintiffs' attorney shall contact the Court if and when Defendant produces its records for inspection. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/27/2017. (CLO)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing is scheduled for Thursday, February 23, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in the Thomas F. Eagleton United States Courthouse, 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri 63102 at which Defendant Miller Bui lding Group, LLC and its officer Jimmie Miller shall appear and show cause why civil contempt sanctions should not be imposed against it for failure to comply with this Court's Order of December 15, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall effect service of this Order on Defendant's officer, Jimmie Miller, by whatever means they believe to be most effective, and shall promptly file a certificate of such service. Failure to show adequate evidence of prompt service may result in the continuation or cancellation of the contempt hearing. Contempt Hearing set for 2/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/24/2017. (CLO)
|
December 15, 2016 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Compel Discovery [ 34 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a representative of Defendant Miller Building Group, LLC shall appear for a post-judgment deposition and produce the records requested in the notice of deposition dated August 16, 2016, at the offices of Plaintiffs' counsel on January 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery [ 33 ] is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Defendant Miller Building Group, LLC at 2233 Olive Street, St. Louis, MO 63103. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/15/16. (JAB)(copy mailed to defendant Miller Building Group, LLC)
|
December 17, 2015 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Compel Discovery 31 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a representative of Defendant Miller Building Group, LLC shall appear for a post-judgment deposition and produce the records requested in the notice of deposition dated October 13, 2015, at the offices of Plaintiffs' counsel on January 18, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery 30 is DENIED as moot . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Defendant Miller Building Group, LLC at 2233 Olive Street, St. Louis, MO 63103. (copy mailed to Miller Building Group, LLC) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/17/2015. (KMS)
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
14
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM, ORDER, AND JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Post-Judgment Attorney's Fees 13 is GRANTED. Judgment for attorneys fees and costs in the amoun t of $575.00 is entered in favor of Pla intiffs and against Defendant.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall effect service of this Order and the Court's Orders of January 12, 2015 (Doc. No. 7 ) and March 27, 2015 (Doc. No. 12 ) on Defendant by whatever means they believe to be most effective, and shall promptly file a certificate of such service. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/30/15. (JWD)
|
March 27, 2015 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt 8 is GRANTED and Defendant Miller Building Group, LLC, is found in CONTEMPT of this Court. As sanctioned, Defendant is liable for a fine of $200.00 per day f or every day after this date that Defendant fails to submit its records for inspection or otherwise comply with this Court's Orders and Plaintiffs' discovery requests. Plaintiffs' attorney shall contact the Court if and when Defendant produces its records for inspection. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for an award of attorneys' fees and costs incurred in bringing their motion for contempt is GRANTED. Counsel for Plaintiffs is granted until Friday, April 3 , 2015 to file an affidavit of fees and costs for the Courts consideration.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request that a writ of body attachment be issued for Defendant's principal officer, Jimmie Miller, is denied without prejudice to refiling should Plaintiffs obtain personal service on Mr. Miller.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall effect service of this Order on Defendant by whatever means they believe to be most effective, and shall promptly file a certificate of such service. Failure to show adequate evidence of prompt service may result in the continuation or cancellation of the compliance fine ordered herein. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/27/15. (ARL)
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Compel 6 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a representative of defendant Miller Building Group, LLC, shall appear for a post-judgment deposition and produce the records requested in the notice of deposition dated October 1, 2014, at the offices of Plaintiffs' counsel on Monday, January 26, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery 5 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to defendant Miller Building Group, LLC at 2233 Olive Street, St. Louis, Missouri 63103.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/12/15. (LGK)
|