Fields v. Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District et al
Plaintiff: Eric Fields
Defendant: Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District and Eager Road and Associates, LLC
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2014cv01321
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3731 Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Fields motion for an altered or amended judgment, [No. 229 ], is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/23/2019. (NEP)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Bi-State's motion for summary judgment, 207 , is GRANTED. Fields' claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. An appropriate judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/14/18. (KEK)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Eager Roads motion for summary judgment, 137 , is GRANTED. All claims against Eager Road are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/15/18. (KJS)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Bi-State's motion to stay proceedings [no. 157], is GRANTED pending the Supreme Court of the United States' ruling on Bi-State's petition for a writ of certiori in United S tates ex rel. Fields v. Bi-State Development Agency, etc., Appeal No. 16-3783. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Bi-State must immediately notify me and plaintiff Eric Fields when the Supreme Court rules on its petition for a writ of certiorari. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing in this matter set for Tuesday, November 7 is VACATED.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/6/17. (LGK)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing is scheduled in this matter on Wednesday, October 18, at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 16-South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's deposition of Don Musick scheduled for Tuesday, October 17, is VACATED and shall be rescheduled by parties for a date following the Wednesday, October 18 hearing. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/13/2017. (CAR)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Bi-States Motion for Summary Judgment # 115 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Bi-States Motion to Stay Proceedings # 118 is DENIED as moot. An amended Rule 16 scheduling conference will be set in a separate order. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/16/16. (CAR)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Eager Road's motion to stay # 106 and defendant Bi-State's motion to stay # 108 are GRANTED pending the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeal's decision in United States ex rel. Fi elds v. Bi-State Development Agency, etc., Appeal No. 15-3348. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Eager Road's motion for a telephonic hearing # 111 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall administratively close this mat ter. The parties shall notify the Court of the resolution of Bi-State's appeal within ten (10) days of the date it is released. Further Court action in this matter will be determined after such notice.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10-29/15. (LGK)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Eager Road and Associates, LLC's motion to dismiss # 34 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is denied except to the extent that the complaint asserts claims against Eage r Road for a Hatch Act violation or for a violation of the False Claims Act under a conspiracy liability theory. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Bi-State's motion for summary judgment # 44 is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/2/15. (LGK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fields
Represented By: Christopher B. Hunter
Represented By: Ronald A. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District
Represented By: David P. Frenzia
Represented By: Christopher M. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eager Road and Associates, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Anne Milunski
Represented By: Winthrop B. Reed, III
Represented By: Evan Z. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew J. Lay(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?