Jacobson et al v. Metropolitan St. Louis Sewer District et al
Plaintiff: |
Arnold S. Jacobson and Joan G. Jacobson |
Defendant: |
Metropolitan St. Louis Sewer District and James Buford |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv01333 |
Filed: |
July 29, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 24, 2018 |
Filing
104
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' pro se Petition to Modify Stipulated Protective Order is DENIED. ECF No. 90 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 24, 2018. (BRP)
|
February 17, 2016 |
Filing
89
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is DENIED. (Doc. No. 87 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 02/17/2016. (KCB)
|
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery is GRANTED as follows: (a) Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Defendants shall produce to Plaintiffs a privilege log in compliance with Federal Rul e of Civil Procedure 26(b)(5); and (b) Defendants shall produce the requested discovery relating to the Seabaugh property, subject to a protective order to be agreed upon by the parties. The parties shall also agree upon a reasonable timeframe within which Defendants shall produce this discovery. Except as set forth above, Plaintiffs' motion to compel is DENIED. (Doc. No. 53 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/14/2015. (NEB)
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs' assault, slander, and negligence claims in Counts IV, VI, and VII. The se claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. (Doc. No. 7 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until December 30, 2014 to file an amended complaint properly stating any appropriate assault, slander, and negligence claims that are not barred by sovereign or official immunity. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on December 11, 2014. (BRP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?