Bray v. Bank of America

Plaintiff: Patrick Ryan Bray
Defendant: Bank of America
Case Number: 4:2014cv01336
Filed: July 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1972
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants motion to dismiss Count I of the complaint is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other motions are denied as moot. An order of dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/19/2016. (KMS)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to reconsider [Doc. #52] is denied. re: 52 MOTION for Reconsideration re 50 Memorandum & Order, 51 . Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/19/14. (KKS)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint to dismiss Count IV [Doc. # 41 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amen ded complaint to add defendants [Doc. # 17 ] is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to amend his original complaint to include certain exhibits [Doc. # 44 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to dismis s plaintiff's complaint [Doc. # 12 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for leave to file a sur- reply, for leave to file electronically, and for a Rule 16 conference [Doc. ## 26 , 36 37 , and 49 ] are moot.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/6/14. (KKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ryan Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Mahlon H. Barlow
Represented By: Lauren Fuiman Cell
Represented By: Scott J. Dickenson
Represented By: Janelle E. Fulton
Represented By: Christopher S. Koller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?