Proby v. Bullock et al
Plaintiff: George Proby, Jr.
Defendant: D. R. Bullock, Christy Ramsey, Unknown Jones, Andrew Rieger, Zerick Hahn, St. Francois County Jail Administrator, Kevin Chase, Yolandis Patterson, Wanda Laramore, Unknown Khengor, Jay Cassady, Paul Gore, Unknown Dittman, Alan Earls and Lloyd Hodges
Case Number: 4:2014cv01355
Filed: August 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motions for appointment of counsel [Doc. #71] are DENIEDWITHOUT PREJUDICE. 71 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/16/15. (CLA) (Main Document 83 replaced on 11/16/2015) (CLA).
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. # 54 ] is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/26/15. (KJS)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before March 14, 2015, plaintiff shall provide the Court with the full name and address of defendant Christy Ramsey so that service may be effected. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action as to Christy Ramsey, without prejudice andwithout further notice. Response to Court due by 3/14/2015. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/17/15. (CLA)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. # 35 ] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/09/2015. (CLK)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 4 ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/8/14. (CEL)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $37.60 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Or der. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an origi nal proceeding. FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's official-capaci ty claims and claims against"St. Francois County Jail Administrator" are DISMISSED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall otherwise issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed contemporaneously.( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 11/2/2014.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/02/2014. (CLK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proby v. Bullock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Proby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. R. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Rieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zerick Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Francois County Jail Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolandis Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Laramore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Khengor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?