Gierer v. Rehab Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gierer
Defendant: Rehab Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv01382
Filed: August 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for bill of costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth above. [Doc. 139] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall tax costs in favor of defendant Rehab Medical, Inc. and against plaintiff in the total amount of Three Thousand Nine Hundred Eight Dollars and Seventy-Three Cents ($3,908.73). [Doc. 139] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 3/20/2018. (MRC)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint to conform to the evidence is GRANTED. [Doc. 87] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have to and including October 24, 2016 to file a corrected third amended complaint in compliance with this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's cross motion for sanctions is DENIED. [Doc. 88] Response to Court due by 10/24/2016. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/20/2016. (MRC)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 [VACATED - see Order Doc. 99 ] MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint to conform to the evidence is GRANTED. [Doc. 87] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall detach and docket plaintiff's third amended complaint, which was attached as an exhibit to plaintiff's motion for leave. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's cross motion for sanctions is DENIED. [Doc. 88] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/18/2016. (MRC) Modified on 10/18/2016 (MRC).
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Medical Records (Doc. 67) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall provide full and complete answers to Defendant's Interrogatory Nos. 22 and 23, and provide a full and complete response to Defendant's Request for Production No. 33 and all requested information and documents, including authorizations for medical record collection regarding medical treatment Plaintiff received f rom January 1, 2005 to the present. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide such answers, responses, documents and authorizations by June 30, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion To Conduct Rule 35 Men tal Examination of Plaintiff (Doc. 70) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall undergo a mental examination in accordance with Defendant's Notice of Rule 35 Mental Examination, on a date and at a time mutually agreeable t o the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by June 30, 2016, defendant shall submit a verified statement of its reasonable expenses, including attorneys' fees, incurred in connection with the Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Medical Records. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within seven (7) days of the filing of Defendant's verified statement, plaintiff may file a written response showing justification under Rule 37(a)(5)(A) why the Court should not order her to pay defendant's reasonable expenses, including attorneys' fees, incurred in connection with the Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Medical Records. ( Response to Court due by 6/30/2016.) Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/16/2016. (MRC)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. [Doc. 35 ] The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiff's claim for punitive damages under the Fal se Claims Act (Count I), and GRANTED as to plaintiff's claim against defendant Jenna Domeck for wrongful termination in violation of public policy (Count IV). The motion is DENIED in all other respects. An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/21/15. (JWD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gierer v. Rehab Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gierer
Represented By: Robert W. Cockerham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehab Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Berry, Jr.
Represented By: Narcisa P. Symank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?