Margulis v. Generation Life Insurance, Company et al.
Plaintiff: Marilyn Margulis
Defendant: Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,, John 1-10 Does, Open Market Quotes, LLC and Open Market Quotes, LLC doing business as Generation Life Insurance
Case Number: 4:2014cv01462
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF DISMISSAL..granting Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/10/15. (MRS)
December 10, 2015 Filing 59 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #57 Joint MOTION to Stay by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon) filed by Spring Venture Group, LLC,, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Generation Life Insurance, Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/20/2015. (JMC)
November 19, 2015 Filing 57 Joint MOTION to Stay by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #55 Joint MOTION to Stay by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Knepper, Matthew) filed by Spring Venture Group, LLC,, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Generation Life Insurance, Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/21/15. (MRS)
October 20, 2015 Filing 55 Joint MOTION to Stay by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Knepper, Matthew)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #52 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #51 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Replies due by 10/19/2015. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/5/15. (MRS)
October 3, 2015 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #52 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #51 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dashtaki, Cyrus)
September 24, 2015 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Open Market Quotes, LLC filed by Defendant Open Market Quotes, LLC. (Fogarty, Glennon)
September 24, 2015 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Generation Life Insurance Company filed by Defendant Generation Life Insurance, Company. (Fogarty, Glennon)
September 24, 2015 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Spring Venture Group, LLC filed by Defendant Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Open Market Quotes, LLC, #42 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Generation Life Insurance Company, #46 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Spring Venture Group, LLC by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon) filed by Spring Venture Group, LLC,, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Generation Life Insurance, Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. RESPONSE DUE 9/24/15. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/3/15. (MRS)
September 2, 2015 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Open Market Quotes, LLC, #42 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Generation Life Insurance Company, #46 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Spring Venture Group, LLC by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
August 24, 2015 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #46 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Spring Venture Group, LLC filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
August 24, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Spring Venture Group, LLC by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
August 24, 2015 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #44 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Open Market Quotes, LLC filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
August 24, 2015 Filing 44 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Open Market Quotes, LLC by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
August 24, 2015 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #42 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Generation Life Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
August 24, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Generation Life Insurance Company by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to certify class (#23) and motion to delay ruling on that motion (#24) are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to deny plaintiff's motion for class certification without prejudice (#26) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/18/15. (MRS)
August 3, 2015 Filing 40 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Spring Venture Group, LLC,.(Knepper, Matthew)
August 3, 2015 Filing 39 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Open Market Quotes, LLC.(Knepper, Matthew)
August 3, 2015 Filing 38 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Generation Life Insurance, Company.(Knepper, Matthew)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed by Plaintiff) by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon) filed by Spring Venture Group, LLC,, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Generation Life Insurance, Company ; ORDERED GRANTED, ( Response to Court due by 8/3/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/1/2015. (JMC)
July 1, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed by Plaintiff) by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon) filed by Spring Venture Group, LLC,, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Generation Life Insurance, Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/29/15. Answer due on or before 7/2/15.(MRS)
May 28, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Open Market Quotes, LLC, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon) filed by Spring Venture Group, LLC,, Generation Life Insurance, Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/12/15. Answer due 6/2/15(MRS)
May 11, 2015 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION for Ruling on to Delay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
May 11, 2015 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION for Relief / Motion to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
May 11, 2015 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Marilyn Margulis. Open Market Quotes, LLC served on 5/7/2015, answer due 5/28/2015. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
May 8, 2015 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
May 4, 2015 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Ruling on to Delay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
May 4, 2015 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #26 MOTION for Relief / Motion to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice filed by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fogarty, Glennon)
May 4, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification doc #23 Without Prejudice by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon) Modified on 5/5/2015 (MRS).
May 4, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations, Inc. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
April 24, 2015 Summons Issued as to defendant Open Market Quotes, LLC. The summons was emailed to cyrus@dashtaki.com. (MRS)
April 23, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION for Ruling on to Delay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
April 23, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
April 23, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis Process Server: Department of Civil Service (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
April 23, 2015 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants,Terminating John 1-10 Does , filed by Marilyn Margulis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Summons)(Dashtaki, Cyrus)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Spring Venture Group, LLC,, Defendant Generation Life Insurance, Company motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall be granted leave to file her amended complaint no later than April 23, 2015.( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 4/23/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/19/15. (MRS)
January 14, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Additional Authority Regarding Defendants' Pending Motion to Dismiss: by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fogarty, Glennon)
October 27, 2014 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
October 15, 2014 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) filed by Marilyn Margulis ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/30/14. RESPONSE DUE 10/15/14.(MRS)
September 29, 2014 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (Dashtaki, Cyrus)
September 23, 2014 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
September 23, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion for Class Certification ( doc #6) is denied without prejudice to refiling following the issuance of a CMO in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that Motion for extension to file answer (doc #7) is granted ( ANSWER DUE 9/23/14).,,FURTHER ORDERED that Motion #11 is denied as moot in light of the court's ruling denying motion for class certification. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/2/14. (MRS) Modified on 9/3/2014 (MRS).
August 29, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Certify Class by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fogarty, Glennon)
August 27, 2014 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Generation Life Insurance, Company. Parent companies: Tennesse Farmers Life Insurance Company and Tennessee Farmers Assurance Company, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
August 27, 2014 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Spring Venture Group, LLC,. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
August 26, 2014 Case Opening Notification: All corporate parties must file Disclosure of Corporate Interest form. The form can be found on the # court website. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MRS)
August 25, 2014 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew D. Knepper for Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Knepper, Matthew)
August 25, 2014 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC,. (Fogarty, Glennon)
August 25, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION (STATE UN-RULED MOTION), to Certify Class by Plaintiff Marilyn Margulis. (DLT)
August 25, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Generation Life Insurance, Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC, Sent To: State Court - Executed (Fogarty, Glennon)
August 25, 2014 Filing 4 Amended Petition (Removal)AMENDED STATE PETITION. Received From: The Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of Missouri, filed by Marilyn Margulis.(DLT)
August 25, 2014 Filing 3 Petition (Removal) STATE PETITION. Received From: The Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of Missouri, filed by Marilyn Margulis.(DLT)
August 22, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Generation Life Insurance Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Fogarty, Glennon)
August 22, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 14SL-CC02263, with receipt number 0865-4463214, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Generation Life Insurance Company, Spring Venture Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Fogarty, Glennon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margulis v. Generation Life Insurance, Company et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Margulis
Represented By: Cyrus C. Dashtaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generation Life Insurance, Company
Represented By: Matthew D. Knepper
Represented By: Glennon P. Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Venture Group, LLC,
Represented By: Matthew D. Knepper
Represented By: Glennon P. Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Market Quotes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Market Quotes, LLC doing business as Generation Life Insurance
Represented By: Glennon P. Fogarty
Represented By: Matthew D. Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?