White et al v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: |
Tracey White, Dwayne Anton Matthews, Jr., Damon Coleman, Theophilus Green, Kerry White and W. D. |
Defendant: |
Thomas Jackson, Jon Belmar, Justin Cosmo, John Does, St. Louis County, Missouri and Ferguson, Missouri, City of |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv01490 |
Filed: |
August 28, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry Edward Autrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 31, 2019 |
Filing
335
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 292], is DENIED. 292 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/31/19. (CLA)
|
November 13, 2018 |
Filing
313
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to exclude or limit the testimony of Mr. Robert Pusins [Doc. No. 295 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that Mr. Pusins will not be permitted to testify regarding: (1) whether there was probable cause to arrest Plaintiff Matthews or (2) opinions based solely on the conduct of police agencies other than St. Louis County Police Department. The motion is DENIED in all other re spects. Specifically, Mr. Pusins will be permitted to testify regarding his opinions specific to the conduct of St. Louis County Police Department, including the documentation and review of arrests and the use of force. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/13/18. (KJS)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
272
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that St. Louis County and the Individual St. Louis County Defendants Bill of Costs, [Doc. No. 261 ] is approved in the amount of $10,169.30. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the City of Ferguson , Thomas Jackson and Officer Justin Cosmas Bill of Costs, [Doc. 262 ], is approved in the amount of $6,782.27. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall tax costs in favor of Defendants St. Louis County and the Individual Count y Defendants and against Plaintiffs in the amount of $10,169.30. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall tax costs in favor of the City of Ferguson, Thomas Jackson and Officer Justin Cosma and against Plaintiffs in the amount of $6,782.27. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/28/17. (KJS)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
70
OPINION, MEMORANDUM, AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the St. Louis County Defendants Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [Doc. Nos. 42 , 43 , 44 , 45 , 46 , 47 ] are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat the Ferguson Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [Doc. No. 50 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the St. Louis County Defendants Motion to Sever [Doc. No. 35 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims f or intentional infliction of emotional distress are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims for negligent supervision are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff William Daviss claim for assault and battery is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the St. Louis County Defendants Motions to Dismiss the Complaint [Doc. Nos. 23 , 25 , 27 , 29 , 31 , 33 ] are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Ferguson Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint [Doc. No. 13 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/16/15. (KJS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?