Henschke et al v. Republic Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
John Henschke and Carol Henschke |
Defendant: |
Republic Services, Inc., Allied Services, LLC and Bridgeton Landfill, LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv01570 |
Filed: |
September 12, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Richard Webber |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 1, 2016 |
Filing
209
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CASE : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for approval of settlement in Bradke v. Republic Services, Inc., No. 4:14CV01781, is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 135 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Notice of this Memorandum and Order shall be filed in Bradke v. Republic Services, Inc., No. 4:14CV01781. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs in Bradke v. Republic Services, Inc., No. 4:14CV01781, shall, within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, file dismissal papers in that case. Failure to do so may result in the Court dismissing that case. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/01/2016. Associated Cases: 4:14-cv-01570-AGF, 4:14-cv-01781-AGF(KCB)
|
October 28, 2016 |
Filing
197
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of non-parties for an award of attorneys fees incurred in preparing a motion to quash subpoenas is DENIED. (Doc. No. 140 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/28/2016. (KCB)
|
June 29, 2016 |
Filing
99
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to notify the Court whether they intend to dismiss the negligence claim and Allied as a Defendant with or without preju dice. If Plaintiffs intend to dismiss the negligence claim and Allied as a Defendant with prejudice, the Court will grant the motion to amend. If Plaintiffs intend to dismiss the negligence claim and Allied as a Defendant without prejudice, the C ourt will deny the motion to amend. If Plaintiffs do not respond within the prescribed time, the Court will grant the motion to amend, specifying that the negligence claim and Allied as a Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 29, 2016. (BRP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?