March 29, 2017 |
Filing
158
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 82 , 150 ) are GRANTED. An appropriate Judgment is filed herewith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/29/2017. (NEB)
|
January 31, 2017 |
Filing
153
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Reconsideration (ECF No. 135 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/31/2017. (NEB)
|
December 20, 2016 |
Filing
149
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, for Sanctions, and in the Alternative to Extend Discovery for the Purpose of Taking Noticed Deposition (ECF No. 146 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/20/2016. (KCB)
|
November 1, 2016 |
Filing
140
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is ordered to provide the complete Designation of Neutral, including the date of the mediation, no later than Monday, November 7, 2016. Failure to do so may result in sanction, up to and including dismissal of Plaintiffs lawsuit for failure to prosecute. (Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 11/7/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on November 1, 2016. (BRP)
|
October 21, 2016 |
Filing
134
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 123 ) is GRANTED, in part. Wal-Mart shall provide Defendants with the information requested in Interrogatory numbers 4 and 5 within seven (7) days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. 's Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 132 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/21/2016. (KCB)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
115
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Compel, for Sanctions, and to Disqualify (ECF No. 90 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Protective Order and/or to Quash Plaintiffs Request to P roduce Documents Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) and 34 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (ECF No. 105 ) is DENIED, in part. The Court will extend the deadline for this deposition to take place to allow Defendant thirty (30) days to provide the r elevant documents. The parties shall provide an amended joint proposed scheduling plan no later than September 9, 2016. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 107 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, a s outlined above. The parties should come to an agreeable date for the 30(b) (6) deposition as part of their amended joint proposed scheduling plan they will submit to the Court. ( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/9/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/2/2016. (NEB) (Main Document 115 replaced on 9/2/2016 to correct typographical error) (KXS).
|
April 25, 2016 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is ordered to provide the designation of neutral no later than Friday, April 29, 2016. Failure to do so may result in sanction, up to and including dismissal of Plaintiffs lawsuit for failure to prosecute. (Response to Court due by 4/29/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 4/25/2016. (KCB)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Strike and Objection to the Use of Prior Depositions (ECF No. 57 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (ECF No. [6 1]) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as discussed herein. Plaintiff shall provide any amended responses no later than March 11, 2016. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Expert Witnesses (ECF No. [6 3]) and Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to Disclose and Produce Expert Witness (ECF No. 73 ) are GRANTED. The parties should refer to the Amended Case Management Order, filed herewith, for the new expert disclosure and deposition deadlines. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/2/2016. (NEB)
|
December 21, 2015 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Case Management Order (ECF No. 52 ) is GRANTED, in part, and the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of excepti onal circumstances: SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. ( ADR Future Reference 1/4/2016., Discovery Completion due by 4/1/2016., Jury Trial set for 8/1/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White., Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2016., Non-Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2016., Motion in Limine due by 7/22/2016., Pretrial Compliance due by 7/26/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/21/2015. (NEB)
|
July 7, 2015 |
Filing
41
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (ECF No. 32 ) and Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Local Rule 2.09, Disclosure of O rganizational Interest (ECF No. 34 ) are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion of Defendants for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Disclosures (ECF No. 36 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall make all disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(l) no later than August 5, 2015. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/7/2015. (NEB)
|
April 3, 2015 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (ECF No. 19 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on April 3, 2015. (BRP)
|