Mahn v. Jefferson County et al
Plaintiff: |
Jamie Mahn |
Defendant: |
Jefferson County, 23rd Judicial Circuit, Wes Wagner, Howard Wagner and Jeanette McKee |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv01806 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Nannette A. Baker |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 18, 2018 |
Filing
142
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Howard Wagners motion for summary judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial of this action originally set for January 14, 2018 is RESET to Monday, March 4, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. A fi nal pre-trial conference is set for Thursday, February 28, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties pretrial materials must be filed no later than February 11, 2019 and all motions in limine must be filed no later than February 20, 2 019. All other provisions of the Amended Case Management Order of August 15, 2018 remain in full force and effect. 130 ( Jury Trial set for 3/4/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker., Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/18/18. (CLA)
|
March 3, 2016 |
Filing
110
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Jefferson County and Wes Wagners Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 70.]IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Howard Wagners Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 79.] IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that Defendant Michael Reuters Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 76.] 76 70 79 A separate order of Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/3/16. (CLA)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant 23rd Judicial Circuits Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. [Doc. 32 .] Defendant 23rd Judicial Circuits Motion to Dismiss Count II is DENIED. Defendant 23rd Judicial Circuits Motion to Dismiss Co unt III is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Howard Wagner and Jeanette McKees Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as moot. [Doc. 34 .] Defendant Jeanette McKees Motion to Dismiss claims against her in Count I is GRANTED. Defendant Howard Wagners Motion to Dismiss claims against him in Count III is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Mike Reuters Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. [Doc. 50 .] Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/4/15. (KJS)
|
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. [Doc. 19.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 10(a), Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint that inclu des the names of all parties to the action in the caption of the First Amended Compliant no later than February 5, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall strike Document 20 from the record.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant 23rd Judicial Circuits Motion to Dismissis DENIED as moot. [Doc. 11.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Howard Wagner and Jeannette McKees Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 13.] 19 11 13 ( Response to Court due by 2/5/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 2/3/15. (CLA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?