Concord Auto Body, Inc v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Concord Auto Body, Inc
Defendant: Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co., State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Cornerstone National Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Allstate Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri
Case Number: 4:2014cv01857
Filed: November 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear its own attorneys fees, costs, and other expenses. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/3/21. (JAB) (Main Document 74 replaced on 2/4/2021) (CBL).
February 3, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wilke, Daniel)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #69 and #70 MOTIONS for Extension of Time to File brief addressing supplemental jurisdiction by Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Defendant Safe Auto Insurance Company; and Re: #71 MOTION for Joinder regarding Motion for Extension filed by Defendants State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. and State Farm Fire and Casualty Co. by Defendants Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. ORDERED: Motions are GRANTED. ( Response to Court due by 2/3/2021.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/2/2021. (CBL)
February 1, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION for Joinder regarding Motion for Extension filed by Defendants State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. and State Farm Fire and Casualty Co. Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 29) by Defendants Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Baris, Melissa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: brief addressing supplemental jurisdiction ;Proposed extension date Feb. 3, 2021 by Defendant Safe Auto Insurance Company. (Higgins, Angela)
February 1, 2021 Filing 69 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief ;Extension to file the following: brief addressing supplemental jurisdiction ;Proposed extension date February 3, 2021 by Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilke, Daniel)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael E. Mumford. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8409877) by Defendants LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Federal Court Bar Admissions, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mumford, Michael) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/15/2021. (CLO)
January 15, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael E. Mumford. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8409877) by Defendants LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Federal Court Bar Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mumford, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Filing 66 ENTRY of Appearance by Angela M. Higgins for Defendant Safe Auto Insurance Company. (Higgins, Angela)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael L. McCluggage; #64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel D. Birk filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. ORDERED: Both Motions are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/15/2021. (CBL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel D. Birk. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8408112) by Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Birk, Daniel)
January 15, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael L. McCluggage. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8408057) by Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McCluggage, Michael)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah Jenkins by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. ORDERED: GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/14/2021. (CBL)
January 14, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah Jenkins. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8405512) by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jenkins, Sarah)
January 13, 2021 Filing 60 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Parent companies: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Wilke, Daniel)
January 13, 2021 Filing 59 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Wilke, Daniel)
January 13, 2021 Filing 58 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. Parent companies: GEICO Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.,. (Baris, Melissa)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule regarding the issue of supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining tortious inference claim: Any party contending this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction shall file a memorandum in support no later than February 1, 2021. All responses in opposition shall be filed no later than February 16, 2021. All reply briefs shall be filed no later than February 24, 2021. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/11/2021. (CLO)
January 8, 2021 Filing 56 ENTRY of Appearance by Teresa M. Young for Defendant Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri. (Young, Teresa)
January 8, 2021 Filing 55 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co., Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Parent companies: The Allstate Corporation, Subsidiaries: Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC., Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Holdings, Inc.,. (Fenton, Richard)
January 7, 2021 Filing 54 ENTRY of Appearance by Melissa Z. Baris for Defendants Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Baris, Melissa)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard L. Fenton; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/6/2021. (SMM)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacqueline A. Giannini; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/6/2021. (SMM)
January 6, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard L. Fenton. Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8386476) by Defendants Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co., Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fenton, Richard)
January 6, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacqueline A. Giannini. Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8386414) by Defendants Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co., Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Giannini, Jacqueline)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF REMAND FINALIZED by Karen K. CaldwellChair of the Panel (Attachments: #1 SUGGESTION OF REMAND, #2 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND, #3 DOCKET FOR CASE #: 6:14-md-02557-GAP)(DLB)
December 15, 2020 Filing 48 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. CaldwellChair of the Panel. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are remanded to theirrespective transferor courts. (DLB)
February 9, 2015 ***REMARK ; Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:15-cv-06002, filed 02/09/2015. (DJO)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Middle District of Florida; Case Transferred via CM/ECF Extraction; (DJO)
February 6, 2015 Filing 46 TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; (DJO)
December 12, 2014 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri waiver signed on 12/8/2014, answer due 2/6/2015. (Farrar, Tonna)
December 11, 2014 Filing 44 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine Baber Fezzi for Defendant Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri. (Fezzi, Katherine)
December 9, 2014 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri. (Schwartz, Steven)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. The above-captioned action is STAYED pending a transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Allstate Defendants Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Doc. #40 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/2/14. (ARL)
December 1, 2014 Filing 41 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel E. Wilke for Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilke, Daniel)
November 28, 2014 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Druley, Deborah)
November 24, 2014 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Safe Auto Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Preferred Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Direct Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Progressive Advanced Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Lm General Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Government Employees Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Geico Indemnity Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Geico General Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 24, 2014 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Geico Casualty Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. United Services Automobile Association served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. USAA General Indemnity Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. American Family Mutual Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Farmers Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Nationwide Insurance Company of America served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Allstate Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2014, answer due 12/3/2014. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 20, 2014 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay (Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) filed by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Druley, Deborah)
November 20, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay (Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) by Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Druley, Deborah)
November 20, 2014 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Deborah C. Druley for Defendants Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Druley, Deborah)
November 19, 2014 Filing 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Concord Auto Body, Inc as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (LGK)
November 19, 2014 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Concord Auto Body, Inc as to Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri. (LGK)
November 19, 2014 Filing 22 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Concord Auto Body, Inc as to Cornerstone National Insurance Company. (LGK)
November 19, 2014 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Concord Auto Body, Inc as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (LGK)
November 6, 2014 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Concord Auto Body, Inc. Parent companies: NA, Subsidiaries: NA, Publicly held company: NA,. (Farrar, Tonna)
November 4, 2014 Case Opening Notification: 33 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Tonna K. Farrar. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
November 4, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Concord Auto Body, Inc Process Server: HPS Process & Investigations (BAK)
November 3, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-4568950, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Concord Auto Body, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Market Share Report, #2 Exhibit 2-State Farm Dashboard, #3 Exhibit 3-Unpaid Procedures, #4 Exhibit 4-Consent Decree, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Allied Prop & Cas., #7 Summons Allstate Fire & Cas, #8 Summons Allstate Ins Co, #9 Summons Allstate Prop & Cas., #10 Summons American Standard, #11 Summons AmFam Mutual, #12 Summons Automobile Club, #13 Summons Cornerstone National, #14 Summons Esurance, #15 Summons Farm Bureau, #16 Summons Farmers Ins Co, #17 Summons GEICO Casualty, #18 Summons GEICO Gen Ins Co, #19 Summons GEICO Indemnity, #20 Summons Government Employees, #21 Summons Liberty Mutual Fire, #22 Summons Lm General, #23 Summons Nationwide Affinity, #24 Summons Nationwide Insurance, #25 Summons Progressive Advanced, #26 Summons Progressive Casualty, #27 Summons Progressive Direct, #28 Summons Progressive Northwestern, #29 Summons Progressive Preferred, #30 Summons Safe Auto, #31 Summons SAFECO, #32 Summons Shelter Mutual, #33 Summons State Farm Fire & Cas., #34 Summons State Farm Mutual, #35 Summons Travelers Home & Marine, #36 Summons United Svcs Auto, #37 Summons USAA Casualty, #38 Summons USAA Gen Indemnity)(Farrar, Tonna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2014: #39 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concord Auto Body, Inc v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael McCluggage, I
Represented By: Daniel E. Wilke
Represented By: Daniel D. Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Deborah J. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Melissa Z. Baris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Deborah J. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael McCluggage, I
Represented By: Daniel E. Wilke
Represented By: Daniel D. Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Deborah J. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Z. Baris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Deborah J. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Melissa Z. Baris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri
Represented By: Teresa M. Young
Represented By: Katherine Baber Fezzi
Represented By: Steven H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Auto Body, Inc
Represented By: Tonna K. Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?