Missouri State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Ferguson-Florissant School District et al

Plaintiff: Missouri State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Redditt Hudson, F. Willis Johnson and Doris Bailey
Defendant: Ferguson-Florissant School District and St. Louis County Board of Election Commissioners
Case Number: 4:2014cv02077
Filed: December 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to lift the stay in this matter, [No. 269 ], is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing will be held in this matter on Monday, November 26, 2018, at 10:30 am in Courtr oom 16-South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs will file with the Court a tentative voter education plan no later than November 21, 2018. ( Status Conference set for 11/26/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/11/2018. (NEP)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter Judgment # 227 is GRANTED. An amended judgment will issue in a separate document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Ferguson-Florissant SchoolDistrict's motion for a stay of the amended judgment and injunction entered in this case pending appeal # 234 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/21/16. (CAR)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Ferguson Florissant School District's Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment under Rules 54(b) and/or 59(e) # 188 is DENIED and the Court will not certify the School District's proposed questions for interlocutory appeal. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/27/16. (CAR)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Ferguson-Florissant School District's motion to reopen case # 180 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered for Plaintiffs on the issue ofvote dilution in violati on of § 2 of the Voting Rights Act of 1965. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for interim relief # 118 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference to discuss a remedies briefing schedule is set for Friday, August 26, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 16-South. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/22/16. (ARL)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ferguson-Florissant School District; DENYING AS MOOT 88 MOTION for Hearing filed by Plaintiff Doris Bailey, Plaintiff Redditt Hudson, Plaintiff F. Willis Johnson, Plaintiff Missouri State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People; DENYING 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Doris Bailey, Plaintiff Redditt Hudson, Plaintiff F. Willis Johnson, Plaintiff Missouri State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/5/15. (CAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missouri State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Ferguson-Florissant School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: Julie A. Ebenstein
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Andrew J. McNulty
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redditt Hudson
Represented By: Julie A. Ebenstein
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Andrew J. McNulty
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. Willis Johnson
Represented By: Julie A. Ebenstein
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Andrew J. McNulty
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Bailey
Represented By: Julie A. Ebenstein
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Andrew J. McNulty
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson-Florissant School District
Represented By: Cindy Reeds Ormsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Board of Election Commissioners
Represented By: Darold E. Crotzer, Jr.
Represented By: Julie A. Ebenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?