June 18, 2020 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action (ECF No. 50 ) is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 6/18/2020. (TMT)
|
January 8, 2020 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action (ECF No. 47 ) is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/8/2020. (TMT)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 45 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/8/2016. (CBL)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 43 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/18/2016. (CBL)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 41 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 6/6/2016. (CBL)
|
May 4, 2016 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 39 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 5/4/2016. (CBL)
|
April 19, 2016 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 37 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/19/16. (EAB)
|
March 21, 2016 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 35 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/21/2016. (CBL)
|
January 22, 2016 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 33 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/22/2016. (CBL)
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 31 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/10/15. (KXS)
|
November 23, 2015 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 29 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/23/2015. (CBL)
|
October 2, 2015 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 27 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/02/2015. (CBL)
|
September 4, 2015 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 25] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on September 4, 2015. (MCB)
|
August 17, 2015 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 23 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/17/2015. (CBL)
|
July 17, 2015 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warrens motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 20 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/17/15. (EAB)
|
June 15, 2015 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 18 PRO SE MOTION leave to file a civil action filed by In Re Calvin Warren. Motion is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on June 15, 2015. (MCB)
|
May 27, 2015 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 16 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/27/2015. (CBL)
|
April 6, 2015 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 12 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/6/15. (EAB)
|
April 3, 2015 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 11 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/3/15. (EAB)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 7] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on January 15, 2015. (MCB)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren's motion for leave to file a civil action [ECF No. 5 ] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/06/2014. (CBL)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
2
ORDER OF COURT EN BANC signed on August 20, 2014. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Calvin Warren is prohibited from filing any new action while proceeding pro se and seeking in forma pauperis status in this Court without first obtaining leave of court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall not accept any petitions or complaints from Calvin Warren for filing in this Court if he is proceeding pro se and seeking in forma pauperis status, unless such pleadings are accompa nied by an order of this Court granting him leave to do so. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Calvin Warren is proceeding pro se and seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis in filing a new action, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed not to a ccept from Mr. Warren in excess of one motion for leave to file a new action, along with his attached pleadings, per calendar month. The Clerk shall return to Mr. Warren, without making copies, any and all petitions or complaints submitted in excess of one per calendar month. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that leave of court will be granted only if Calvin Warren files a non-frivolous action, as determined under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Each prospective complaint or petition must be accampanied by a motion for leave to file a new action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that nothing in this order shall prohibit Calvin Warren from filing a fee-paid complaint or petition or proceeding with the representation of an attorney admitted to practice in this Court. Signed on August 20, 2014 by the United States District Court, Eastern District of Missouri, district court judges. (WAF).
|