Fant et al v. Ferguson, Missouri, City of Featured Case

Plaintiff: Keilee Fant, Roelif Carter, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr., Alfred Morris, Anthony Kimble, Donyale Thomas, Shameika Morris, Daniel Jenkins, Ronnie Tucker and Tonya DeBerry
Defendant: Ferguson, Missouri, City of
Case Number: 4:2015cv00253
Filed: February 8, 2015
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2017 93 STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Report by Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
January 5, 2017 92 TRANSCRIPT of 83 (MOTION HEARING) held on 12/02/2016 before Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patti Dunn Wecke, Patti_Dunn_Wecke@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7984. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2017. (KCB)
December 19, 2016 91 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Re: 89 Consent MOTION for Protective Order Modification, filed by Defendant City of Ferguson, Missouri; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on December 19, 2016. (AGF)
December 16, 2016 90 STATUS REPORT by Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Search Terms, # 2 Exhibit List of Custodians)(Murphy, Sonia)
December 16, 2016 89 Consent MOTION for Protective Order Modification by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 14, 2016 88 ENTRY of Appearance by Aarnarian (Apollo) D. Carey for Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Carey, Aarnarian (Apollo))
December 9, 2016 87 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Re: 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew E. Tomback, filed by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, et al.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on December 9, 2016. (AGF)
December 8, 2016 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew E. Tomback. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5711659) by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tomback, Andrew)
December 7, 2016 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for 83 (MOTION HEARING) by Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker court reporter P. Dunn Wecke before Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (Forwarded to Court Reporter by email)(BRP)
December 2, 2016 84 Featured Case ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, following oral argument on this day on Plaintiffs motion (Doc. No. 73 ) to compel production of documents, that the motion is GRANTEDin part and DENIED in part as follows and as more fully discussed at oral argument: Within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer on the following topics: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.]...IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within 14 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing these topics. ( Status Report due by 12/16/2016.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/2/2016. (NEB)
December 2, 2016 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2016 re 73 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant City of Ferguson filed by Roelif Carter, Ronnie Tucker, Daniel Jenkins, Alfred Morris, Donyale Thomas, Keilee Fant, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr., Tonya DeBerry, Anthony Kimble. Counsel for parties present their arguments. The Court directs counsel to discuss the emails and have Plaintiffs provide additional search terms to Defendant. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:P. Dunn Wecke) (FTR Gold: No) (NEB)
November 18, 2016 82 ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald A. Norwood for Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Norwood, Ronald)
November 18, 2016 81 Featured Case ORDER UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d): 1. The production of privileged or work-product protected documents, electronically stored information ("ESI"), or information, whether inadvertent or otherwise, is not a waiver of the privilege or protection from discovery in this case or in any other federal or state proceeding. This Order shall be interpreted to provide the maximum protection allowed by Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). 2. Nothing contained herein is intended to or shall serve to limit a party's right to conduct a review of documents, ESI or information (including metadata) for relevance, responsiveness and/or segregation of privileged and/or protected information before production. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on November 18, 2016. (BRP)
November 18, 2016 80 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion for an order pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) is GRANTED in part, to the extent that the Court will separately enter a Rule 502(d) order. (Doc. No. 75.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to compel (Doc. No. 73 ) on Friday, December 2, 2016 at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 12S. (Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on November 18, 2016. (BRP)
November 15, 2016 79 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' first amended complaint is DENIED. (Doc. No. 57 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on November 15, 2016. (BRP)
October 28, 2016 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 MOTION for Ruling on 502(d) Order filed by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
October 24, 2016 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re 73 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant City of Ferguson filed by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Murphy, Sonia)
October 24, 2016 76 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 75 MOTION for Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Order Pursuant to FRE 502(d) filed by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Murphy, Sonia)
October 17, 2016 75 MOTION FOR ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d) by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
October 17, 2016 74 RESPONSE to Motion re 73 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant City of Ferguson filed by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex C, # 3 Exhibit Ex D, # 4 Exhibit Ex E, # 5 Exhibit Ex F, # 6 Exhibit Ex G, # 7 Exhibit Ex H, # 8 Exhibit Ex I)(Dunne, Peter)
October 11, 2016 73 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant City of Ferguson by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Murphy, Sonia)
October 11, 2016 72 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER Re: 71 Joint Motion to Stay by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 11, 2016. (SAA)
October 10, 2016 71 Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Strode, Blake)
July 15, 2016 70 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathaniel Richard Carroll for Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Carroll, Nathaniel)
July 5, 2016 69 Featured Case AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs unopposed motion to amend the Case Management Order is GRANTED as follows (Doc. No. 66 ): (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) ( Discovery Completion due by 1/23/2017., Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2017., Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/5/2016. (NEB)
June 30, 2016 68 SURREPLY to Motion re 57 MOTION to Dismiss :Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (BRP)
June 30, 2016 67 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Re: 65 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY regarding 57 MOTION to Dismiss: Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, et al.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 30, 2016. (AGF)
June 30, 2016 66 MOTION for Extension of: Time by Plaintiff Keilee Fant. (Murphy, Sonia)
June 1, 2016 65 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY to Motion re 57 MOTION to Dismiss :Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sur-Reply)(Karakatsanis, Alexander) Modified docket text on 6/2/2016 (NEB).
May 25, 2016 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION to Dismiss :Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dunne, Peter)
May 18, 2016 63 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward James Hall for Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Hall, Edward)
May 18, 2016 62 RESPONSE to Motion re 57 MOTION to Dismiss :Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Hall, Edward)
May 16, 2016 61 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Re: 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extension to file the Opposition to Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation, filed by Plaintiffs; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 16, 2016. (AGF)
May 10, 2016 60 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Sher, Richard P.. Date of Conference: April 21, 2016. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(Sher, Richard)
May 3, 2016 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Opposition to Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ;Proposed extension date May 18, 2016, MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Murphy, Sonia)
April 27, 2016 58 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 57 MOTION to Dismiss :Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
April 27, 2016 57 MOTION to Dismiss :Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
April 27, 2016 56 ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint,, by Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Red-lined Answer)(Dunne, Peter)
April 22, 2016 55 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER Re: 54 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 22, 2016. (SAA)
April 21, 2016 54 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
April 13, 2016 53 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of Amendment to 1 Complaint, no Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued none, Consents issued none, Jury Demand,, filed by Anthony Kimble, Tonya DeBerry, Allison Nelson, Donyale Thomas, Daniel Jenkins, Roelif Carter, Shameika Morris, Keilee Fant, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Ronnie Tucker, Alfred Morris. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Roelif Carter, Ronnie Tucker, Daniel Jenkins, Alfred Morris, Donyale Thomas, Keilee Fant, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr., Tonya DeBerry, Anthony Kimble.(NEB)
April 13, 2016 52 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER Re: 51 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Keilee Fant, et al.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 13, 2016. (SAA)
April 12, 2016 51 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint - Redlined, # 2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint - Clean)(Murphy, Sonia)
April 12, 2016 50 Featured Case AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to amend the Case Management Order is GRANTED as follows (Doc. No. 49): Discovery Completion due by 10/24/2016., Jury Trial set for 4/10/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 12, 2016. (BRP)
April 8, 2016 49 First MOTION for Extension of: Case Management Schedule by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Murphy, Sonia)
March 4, 2016 48 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Sher, Richard P. Neutral selected by parties.(MCB)
March 3, 2016 47 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Keilee Fant Neutral: Sher, Richard P. Date of Conference: April 21, 2016 time: 9:00 a.m. Location: 190 Carondelet Plaza, Ste. 1100, St. Louis, MO 63105(Roediger, Brendan)
February 20, 2016 46 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER: Re: 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation, filed by Plaintiff Keilee Fant; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 20, 2016. (AGF)
February 18, 2016 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff Keilee Fant. (Roediger, Brendan)
February 4, 2016 44 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER Re: 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; attorney/firm Stephen M. Ryals by Plaintiff Keilee Fant; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 4, 2016. (SAA)
February 3, 2016 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Stephen M. Ryals by Plaintiff Keilee Fant. (Ryals, Stephen)
January 29, 2016 42 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Brendan D. Roediger ADR Completion Deadline due by 3/31/2016. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 4/14/2016. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 2/18/2016. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/29/2016. (NEB)
January 12, 2016 41 Featured Case AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to amend the Case Management Order is GRANTED as follows (Doc. No. 38 ). (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) ( Discovery Completion due by 7/22/2016., Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2016., Jury Trial set for 1/9/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/12/2016. (NEB)
January 12, 2016 40 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER Re: 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sonia W. Murphy by Plaintiffs Keilee Fant, et al.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 12, 2016. (SAA)
January 11, 2016 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sonia W. Murphy. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5209212) by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Murphy Certificate of Good Standing)(Murphy, Sonia)
January 11, 2016 38 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Strode, Blake)
January 6, 2016 ***REMARK regarding Notice 37 : Pursuant to Rule 26 - 3.02; In civil actions, discovery and disclosure materials pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26, 30, 31, 33, 34, 35, and 36, and the certificates of their service, shall not be filed with the Court except as exhibits to a motion or memorandum. (See Local Rule 26-3.02 located on the court website.) (NEB)
January 5, 2016 37 NOTICE Deposition: by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker (Strode, Blake)
December 15, 2015 36 Featured Case ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time is GRANTED (Doc. No. 35 ), and the Case Management Order is hereby amended as follows: (a) Plaintiffs shall disclose all expert witnesses and shall provide the summaries and reports required by Rule 26(a)(2), Fed.R.Civ.P., no later than January 11, 2016, and shall make expert witnesses available for depositions, and have depositions completed, no later than February 8, 2016. (b) Defendant shall disclose all expert witnesses and shall provide the summaries and reports required by Rule 26(a)(2), Fed. R. Civ. P., no later than March 21, 2016, and shall make expert witnesses available for depositions, and have depositions completed, no later than April 18, 2016. (c) The parties shall complete all discovery in this case no later than April 22, 2016. Except as amended herein, the Case Management Order previously entered by the Court shall remain unchanged. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' previously filed motion for extension of time is DENIED as moot. (Doc. No. 34 .) ( Discovery Completion due by 4/22/2016.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/15/2015. (NEB)
December 11, 2015 35 Amended MOTION for Extension of: Time for Expert Witness Certification by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Strode, Blake)
December 11, 2015 34 MOTION for Extension of: Time for Expert Witness Certification by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Strode, Blake)
December 11, 2015 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Blake Alexander Strode for Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Strode, Blake)
October 20, 2015 32 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER Re: 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Extension to file the following: Motion for Class Certification; Proposed extension date January 18, 2016 by Plaintiff Keilee Fant; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 20, 2015. (SAA)
October 19, 2015 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Class Certification ;Proposed extension date January 18, 2016 by Plaintiff Keilee Fant. (Ryals, Stephen)
October 2, 2015 30 Featured Case CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 2, 2015. (BRP)
September 30, 2015 29 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Protective Order)(Dunne, Peter)
September 22, 2015 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen M. Ryals for Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant. (Ryals, Stephen)
July 13, 2015 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 20 .) The Memorandum and Order dated May 26, 2015 (Doc. No. 19 ) is hereby amended as set forth above. Counts Five and Six of Plaintiffs' complaint are hereby reinstated, and the parties shall move forward on all claims in the complaint. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/13/15. (KXS)
June 15, 2015 26 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 3 Motion to Join Parties due by 9/24/2015. Discovery Completion due by 4/15/2016. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 4/26/2016. ADR Future Reference 1/29/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 5/19/2016. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Pretrial Compliance due by 9/21/2016. Motion in Limine due by 9/27/2016. (See Order for Complete Details). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/15/2015. (NEB)
June 12, 2015 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig: Rule 16 Conference held on 6/12/2015. Conference held in person and via telepone as to attorney Alex Karakatsanis. CMO to issue. (FTR Gold: No.) (NEB)
June 9, 2015 24 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Ferguson, Missouri, City of.(Dunne, Peter)
June 8, 2015 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re 19 Memorandum & Order,, filed by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Karakatsanis, Alexander)
June 5, 2015 22 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. . (Dunne, Peter)
June 5, 2015 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re 19 Memorandum & Order,, filed by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
June 1, 2015 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re 19 Memorandum & Order,, by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Karakatsanis, Alexander)
May 26, 2015 19 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of Fergusons motion to dismiss, or alternatively to strike or for a more definite statement, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Doc. No. 8 .) The motion is GRANTED as follows: the words "First" and "Eighth" in Paragraph 16 of the complaint are STRICKEN; Count Five is DISMISSED; and Plaintiffs Fourth Amendment claim in Count Six is DISMISSED. Except as set forth above, the motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/26/2015. (NEB)
May 22, 2015 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig: Telephone Conference regarding status of case and potential for settlement held on 5/22/2015. (FTR Gold: No.) (NEB)
May 22, 2015 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael-John archVoss for Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (archVoss, Michael-John)
May 6, 2015 16 Featured Case RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/5/2015. Rule 16 Conference set for 6/12/2015 01:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (See Order for Complete Details). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2015. (NEB)
March 16, 2015 15 REPLY to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter) Modified on 3/17/2015 to change docket text (JWJ).
March 10, 2015 14 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER Re: 12 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Keilee Fant, et al.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 10, 2015. (SAA)
March 9, 2015 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Karakatsanis, Alexander)
March 9, 2015 12 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Karakatsanis, Alexander)
March 3, 2015 11 Featured Case Docket Text ORDER Re: 7 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 3, 2015. (SAA)
March 2, 2015 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T. Plunkert for Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Plunkert, Robert)
March 2, 2015 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
March 2, 2015 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
March 2, 2015 7 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
March 2, 2015 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter J. Dunne for Defendant Ferguson, Missouri, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
March 2, 2015 5 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Judge Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah termed. Case reassigned to Judge District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings (JWD)
February 18, 2015 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Anthony Kimble, Tonya DeBerry, Allison Nelson, Donyale Thomas, Daniel Jenkins, Roelif Carter, Shameika Morris, Keilee Fant, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Ronnie Tucker, Alfred Morris. Ferguson, Missouri, City of served on 2/9/2015, answer due 3/2/2015. (Ammann, John)
February 18, 2015 3 ENTRY of Appearance by John J. Ammann for Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker. (Ammann, John)
February 9, 2015 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
February 9, 2015 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to ammannjj@slu.edu. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form (moed-0041.pdf) consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (JMC)
February 8, 2015 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Roelif Carter, Tonya DeBerry, Keilee Fant, Daniel Jenkins, Anthony Kimble, Alfred Morris, Shameika Morris, Allison Nelson, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Donyale Thomas, Ronnie Tucker Process Server: Elizabeth Washam (JMC) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/9/2015) (JMC).
February 8, 2015 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-4717478, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Anthony Kimble, Tonya DeBerry, Allison Nelson, Donyale Thomas, Daniel Jenkins, Roelif Carter, Shameika Morris, Keilee Fant, Herbert Nelson, Jr, Ronnie Tucker, Alfred Morris. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Original Filing Form, # 3 Summons, # 4 Notice of Process Server)(Karakatsanis, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fant et al v. Ferguson, Missouri, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keilee Fant
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roelif Carter
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Nelson
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Nelson, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Morris
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kimble
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donyale Thomas
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameika Morris
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jenkins
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Tucker
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya DeBerry
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Alexander G. Karakatsanis
Represented By: Brendan D. Roediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson, Missouri, City of
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?