Taylor v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: |
Samuel Lewis Taylor |
Defendant: |
Michael Miller, Jason Crawford, Carl Gravett, Dorrain Johnson, Troy Steele, Christopher Lambert, Clive Hedrick, John Schneedle, Eric Dunn and Stanley Pruett |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00285 |
Filed: |
February 12, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Within US but Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
Rodney W. Sippel |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [ECF No. 45] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $2.00 within thirty (30) days of th e date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court,"and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/20/17. (LGK)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Samuel Lewis Taylor's Motion for Reconsideration Under Rule 59(e) # 42 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/22/17. (CAR)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment # 21 is GRANTED. A separate judgment will issue. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/8/17. (ARL)
|
August 10, 2016 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Samuel Lewis Taylors Motion for Sanctions # 29 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Samuel Lewis Taylors Motion to Appoint Counsel # 30 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/10/16. (CAR)
|
September 21, 2015 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 9 Amended Complaint filed by Samuel Lewis Taylor. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this action as Samuel Lewis Taylor v. Michael Miller, Jason Crawford, Dorrain Johnson, Carl Gravett, and Stanley Pruett. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the second of the two second amended complaints [Doc. #9, pages 16-34] is STRICKEN from the record. If plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims set forth therein, he must resubmit the pleading to the Court along with the requisite documents necessary for filing a new and separate civil action, including the filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and certified inmate account statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, with respect to plaintiffs First Amendment retaliation claims, the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue on the second amended complaint [Doc. #9, pages 1-15] as to all five defendants in their individual capacities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remai ning federal and/or state claims against defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. ' 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 42 U.S.C. ' 1997e(g)(2), defendants shall reply to the second amended complaint with in the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/21/15. (CAR)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.98 within thirty (30) days fr om the date of this order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the re mittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff two copies of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, consistent with this Order, plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on the court-provided form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice to him.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/2/15. (LGK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?