Levert v. 3M et al
Plaintiff: Levert and William E. Levert
Defendant: 3M, Hardie-Tynes, L.L.C., Crane Co., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CSR, LTD., Uniroyal Holdings, Inc., Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Rexnord Industries, LLC, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Aldrich Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Elliott Company I, Pacific Pump Company, Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Carver Pump Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Oakfabco, Inc., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Ericsson, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Motion Industries, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C., Honeywell International, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, The William Powell Company, Armstrong International, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Trane, US, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Alabama Power Company, John Crane, Inc., General Electric Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Dover Corporation, Blackmer Pump division, The Nash Engineering Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Pnuemo Abex Corporation, ASCO Valves, Inc., J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., SB Decking, Inc., ALFA Laval, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Carrier Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Ford Motor Company, Union Carbide Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Southern Company Electrotechnologies, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Aurora Pump Company, Copes Vulcan, Inc., Cooper Industries, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Crown, Cork and Seal Company, Inc., York International Corporation, Georgia Power Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., CBS Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Graybar Electric Company, Inc., ABB Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Southern Company Services, Inc., Consolidated Sugar and Refining, The Dow Chemical Co., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Texaco Chemical Company, Shell Chemical LP, ITT Corporation, The Falk Corporation, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Taco, Inc., Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Southern Company Gas LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, FMC Corporation, Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Square D Company, Aldrich Boiler Company, Hardie-Tynes Manufacturing Company, Uniroyal, International Paper Company, Eaton Corporation, SEPCO and Jenkins Valves
Case Number: 4:2015cv00290
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2015 ***REMARK Two Certified copies of Order #275 and a copy of the docket sheet were mailed to the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis. (NEB)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 275. Wed May 20 13:29:13 CDT 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion (Doc. No. #103 ) of Plaintiff William E. Levert to remand this case to state court is GRANTED. The case is REMANDED to the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit Court for the State of Missouri, in which it was filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending motions which were filed in this case subsequent to its removal are DENIED without prejudice to refiling in state court, as applicable. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/20/2015. (NEB)
May 15, 2015 Filing 274 ENTRY of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab for Defendant Elliott Company I. (Tayyab, Julia)
May 12, 2015 Filing 273 ENTRY of Appearance by Kirra Nicole Jones for Cross Defendants Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Jones, Kirra)
May 12, 2015 Filing 272 ENTRY of Appearance by Kirra Nicole Jones for Cross Defendants Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Jones, Kirra)
May 12, 2015 Filing 271 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc... (Springfield, Anthony)
May 12, 2015 Filing 270 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony L. Springfield for Cross Defendants Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Springfield, Anthony)
May 12, 2015 Filing 269 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant Honeywell International, Inc... (Springfield, Anthony)
May 12, 2015 Filing 268 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony L. Springfield for Cross Defendants Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Springfield, Anthony)
May 7, 2015 Filing 267 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin for Defendant Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co.. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 7, 2015 Filing 266 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin for Defendant Cooper Industries, LLC. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 7, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE Mootness: by Cross Defendants Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC (Bozarth, Troy)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 264. Sent to non-electronic party this date Thu May 7 13:28:12 CDT 2015 (Porter, Brittany)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Docket Text ORDER Re: #262 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; attorney/firm Laci M. Whitley by Plaintiff William E. Levert; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 6, 2015. (SAA)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 260. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Wed May 6 10:14:43 CDT 2015 (Porter, Brittany)
May 6, 2015 Filing 263 ENTRY of Appearance by Trevor Alan Sondag for Defendants Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation. (Sondag, Trevor)
May 5, 2015 Filing 262 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Laci M. Whitley by Plaintiff William E. Levert. (Menges, Carson)
May 5, 2015 Filing 261 RESPONSE Concerning Pending Motions re #211 Order filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Fanning, David) Modified docket text on 5/6/2015 (BRP).
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Docket Text ORDER Re: #257 Motion for Leave to File its Response to Order of April 20, 2015 by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 5, 2015. (SAA)
May 5, 2015 Filing 259 ENTRY of Appearance by Agota Peterfy for Cross Defendants Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Defendant Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Peterfy, Agota)
May 5, 2015 Filing 258 ENTRY of Appearance by Agota Peterfy for Cross Defendants SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., Defendant SB Decking, Inc.. (Peterfy, Agota)
May 4, 2015 Filing 257 MOTION for Leave to File its Response to Order of April 20, 2015 by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exxon Mobils Response Concerning Pending Motions)(Fanning, David)
May 1, 2015 Filing 256 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Cross Defendants Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Defendant Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Bronsky, Albert)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 252. Fri May 1 09:26:14 CDT 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
April 30, 2015 Filing 255 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, Status Report as to Whether Motions are Moot; by Defendants Hexion Inc. F/K/A Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc. (NEB)
April 30, 2015 Filing 254 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, Status Report as to Whether Motions are Moot; by Defendants International Paper Company, (NEB)
April 30, 2015 Filing 253 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, Status Report as to Whether Motions are Moot; by Defendants SB Decking, Inc.(NEB)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 237. Thu Apr 30 15:56:48 CDT 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Docket Text ORDER Re: #244 Motion for Leave to File Their Reponse to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions out of Time by Cross Defendants Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Defendant Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc.; #239 Motion for Leave to File Their Reponse to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions out of Time by Cross Defendants SB Decking, Inc., Defendant SB Decking, Inc.; #241 Motion for Leave to File Their Reponse to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions out of Time by Cross Defendants International Paper Company, Defendant International Paper Company; and #248 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Status Report as To Moot Motions Out Of Time by Defendant FMC Corporation; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 30, 2015. (SAA)
April 29, 2015 Filing 251 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #250 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition for Lack of Personal Jursidiction and Improper Venue, filed by Defendants Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Bozarth, Troy)
April 29, 2015 Filing 250 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition for Lack of Personal Jursidiction and Improper Venue, by Defendants Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC. (Bozarth, Troy)
April 29, 2015 Filing 249 MEMORANDUM re #167 Status Report , Response as to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Vantine, Marcie)
April 29, 2015 Filing 248 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Status Report as To Moot Motions Out Of Time by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Vantine, Marcie)
April 29, 2015 Filing 247 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Dover Corporation, Blackmer Pump division.. (Dauphin, Michael)
April 29, 2015 Filing 246 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin for Defendant Dover Corporation, Blackmer Pump division. (Dauphin, Michael)
April 29, 2015 Filing 245 REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, Response to Status Report as to whether motions are moot by Cross Defendants Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Defendant Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 244 MOTION for Leave to File Their Reponse to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions out of Time by Cross Defendants Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Defendant Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Response to status report as to moot motions out of time)(Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 243 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Cross Defendants Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Defendant Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc.. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 242 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, #167 Status Report Response to Status Report as to whether motions are moot by Cross Defendants International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, Defendant International Paper Company. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 241 MOTION for Leave to File Their Reponse to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions out of Time by Cross Defendants International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, Defendant International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Response to status report as to moot motions out of time)(Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 240 RESPONSE to Motion re #103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court Response to Status Report as to whether motions are moot filed by Cross Defendants SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., Defendant SB Decking, Inc.. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 239 MOTION for Leave to File Their Reponse to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions out of Time by Cross Defendants SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., Defendant SB Decking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Status report as to whether motions are moot)(Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 238 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Cross Defendants SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., SB Decking, Inc., Defendant SB Decking, Inc.. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Docket Text ORDER Re: #231 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff Status Report As To Moot Motions Out of Time by Defendant General Electric Company; #233 Motion for Leave to File its Response to Plaintiff's Status Report As To Moot Motions Out of Time by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC; and #235 Motion for Leave to File Their Response to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions Out of Time by Defendants Carrier Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Rexnord Industries, LLC, Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 29, 2015. (SAA)
April 28, 2015 Filing 236 STATUS REPORT of Whether Motions are Moot by Carrier Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Rexnord Industries, LLC, Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Dibler, Lindsay)
April 28, 2015 Filing 235 MOTION for Leave to File Their Response to Plaintiff's Status Report as to Moot Motions Out of Time by Defendants Carrier Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Rexnord Industries, LLC, Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Dibler, Lindsay)
April 28, 2015 Filing 234 STATUS REPORT As To Moot Motions by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
April 28, 2015 Filing 233 MOTION for Leave to File its Response to Plaintiff's Status Report As To Moot Motions Out of Time by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
April 28, 2015 Filing 232 STATUS REPORT As To Moot Motions by General Electric Company. (Meyer, Julie)
April 28, 2015 Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff Status Report As To Moot Motions Out of Time by Defendant General Electric Company. (Meyer, Julie)
April 28, 2015 Filing 230 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, regarding Moot Motions by Defendant Pnuemo Abex Corporation. (Titzer, Ross)
April 28, 2015 Filing 229 STATUS REPORT of Whether Motions are Moot by Carrier Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Rexnord Industries, LLC, Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Dibler, Lindsay)
April 27, 2015 Filing 228 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, by Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane, US, Inc., Velan Valve Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Case Detail, #2 Exhibit B: Order dismissing All Remaining Defendants)(Wilson, Benjamin)
April 27, 2015 Filing 227 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, to Advise as to Moot Motions by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Applegate, J.)
April 27, 2015 Filing 226 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, by Defendant York International Corporation. (Maschhoff, James)
April 27, 2015 Filing 225 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, by Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc.. (Maschhoff, James)
April 27, 2015 Filing 224 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, by Defendant ABB Inc.. (Maschhoff, James)
April 27, 2015 Filing 223 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, to Advise as to Moot Motions by Defendant The Gorman-Rupp Company. (Offergeld, Leslie)
April 27, 2015 Filing 222 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, Regarding Pending Motions by Defendant Dana Companies, LLC. (Giokaris, Virginia)
April 27, 2015 Filing 221 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, to Advise as to Moot Motions by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cross Claimants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 27, 2015 Filing 220 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, to Advise as to Moot Motions by Cross Defendants Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Cross Claimants Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Defendant Certain-Teed Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 27, 2015 Filing 219 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, to Advise as to Moot Motions by Cross Defendants ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Defendant ConocoPhillips Company, Cross Claimants ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 27, 2015 Filing 218 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, to Advise as to Moot Motions by Cross Defendants Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Cross Claimants Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Defendant Viking Pumps, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 27, 2015 Filing 217 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, to Advise as to Moot Motions by Cross Defendants Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Cross Claimants Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Defendant Riley Power, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 27, 2015 Filing 216 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #211 Order, to Advise as to Moot Motions by Cross Claimants Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Cross Defendants Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Defendant Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 27, 2015 Filing 215 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER as to the Status of Motions by Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Justin)
April 27, 2015 Filing 214 STATUS REPORT by William E. Levert. (Menges, Carson)
April 27, 2015 Filing 213 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Cross Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (McGinley, Michael)
April 24, 2015 Filing 212 REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court filed by Plaintiff William E. Levert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Menges, Carson)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 211. Mon Apr 20 16:03:06 CDT 2015 (Jones, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before April 27, 2015, Plaintiff and themoving Defendants shall advise the Court which motions, if any, listed in the Status Report are moot. Response to Court due by 4/27/2015. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/20/15. (JWJ)
April 17, 2015 Filing 210 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc.. Parent companies: Electrolux Holdings, Inc., Publicly held company: AB Electrolux,. (Maschhoff, James)
April 17, 2015 Filing 209 ENTRY of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff for Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc.. (Maschhoff, James)
April 16, 2015 Filing 208 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #207 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition filed by Defendant Rexnord Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit CBS' Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit Order, #8 Exhibit Map, #9 Exhibit Map)(Valentino, Jennifer)
April 16, 2015 Filing 207 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition by Cross Defendant Rexnord Industries, LLC. (Valentino, Jennifer)
April 15, 2015 Filing 206 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #205 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit First Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit Second Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing a Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #5 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Levert, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit Memorandum and Order, #8 Exhibit Google Map, #9 Exhibit Google Map)(Valentino, Jennifer)
April 15, 2015 Filing 205 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Valentino, Jennifer)
April 15, 2015 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #198 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Valentino, Jennifer)
April 15, 2015 Filing 203 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc., Defendant Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc.. Parent companies: no, Publicly held company: no,. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 15, 2015 Filing 202 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended by International Paper Company.(Bronsky, Albert)
April 15, 2015 Filing 201 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, Defendant International Paper Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: yes, Publicly held company: None,. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 15, 2015 Filing 200 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant General Gasket Corporation, Cross Defendants General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation. Parent companies: no, Publicly held company: No,. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 15, 2015 Filing 199 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Defendant John Crane, Inc.. Parent companies: Smith Groups Inter. Holdings Ltd., et c., Subsidiaries: Holdings, Ltd., Publicly held company: yes,. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 15, 2015 Filing 198 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Valentino, Jennifer)
April 14, 2015 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #196 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit I)(Valentino, Jennifer)
April 14, 2015 Filing 196 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Valentino, Jennifer)
April 14, 2015 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #194 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Valentino, Jennifer)
April 14, 2015 Filing 194 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Valentino, Jennifer)
April 14, 2015 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #192 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Valentino, Jennifer)
April 14, 2015 Filing 192 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Valentino, Jennifer)
April 14, 2015 Filing 191 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer M. Valentino for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Valentino, Jennifer)
April 14, 2015 Filing 190 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay A. Dibler for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Dibler, Lindsay)
April 14, 2015 Filing 189 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Defendant Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co.. Parent companies: Weir Group, PLC,. (Newport, Michael)
April 14, 2015 Filing 188 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W. Newport for Cross Defendants Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Defendant Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co.. (Newport, Michael)
April 8, 2015 Filing 187 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant ABB Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Upon information and belief, there are no subsidiaries of the named Defendant that are not wholly owned by Defendant. Defendant reserves its right to amend this response if additional information comes to light., Publicly held company: None,. (Maschhoff, James)
April 8, 2015 Filing 186 ENTRY of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff for Defendant ABB Inc.. (Maschhoff, James)
April 8, 2015 Filing 185 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant York International Corporation. Parent companies: Johnson Controls, Inc., Publicly held company: None,. (Maschhoff, James)
April 8, 2015 Filing 184 ENTRY of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff for Defendant York International Corporation. (Maschhoff, James)
April 3, 2015 Filing 183 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Affidavit of Pantaleoni, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1: Affidavit of Sargent, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2: Affidavit of Sargent, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 3: Affidavit of Sargent, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 4: Affidavit of Sargent, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 5: Affidavit of Sargent, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1: Affidavit of Forman, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2: Affidavit of Forman, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 3: Affidavit of Forman, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 4: Affidavit of Forman)(Wilson, Benjamin)
April 3, 2015 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #181 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Dana Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Giokaris, Virginia)
April 3, 2015 Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Dana Companies, LLC. (Giokaris, Virginia)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 180. Fri Apr 3 10:47:02 CDT 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Docket Text ORDER Re: #178 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to CBS Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Plaintiff William E. Levert; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 2, 2015. (SAA)
April 1, 2015 Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Motion to Dismiss Instanter by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exxon Mobil Corporation's First Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition)(Fanning, David)
April 1, 2015 Filing 178 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to CBS Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Plaintiff William E. Levert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Menges, Carson)
April 1, 2015 Filing 177 ENTRY of Appearance by David F. Fanning for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Fanning, David)
April 1, 2015 Filing 176 ENTRY of Appearance by H. Patrick Morris for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Morris, H.)
April 1, 2015 Filing 175 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C.. Parent companies: n/a, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2015 Filing 174 ANSWER to Complaint and Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by The Gorman-Rupp Company.(Offergeld, Leslie)
April 1, 2015 Filing 173 ENTRY of Appearance by Leslie G. Offergeld for Defendant The Gorman-Rupp Company. (Offergeld, Leslie)
April 1, 2015 Filing 172 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Gorman-Rupp Company.. (Offergeld, Leslie)
March 30, 2015 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit William E. Levert Deposition, #3 Exhibit CBS Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Petition)(Dauphin, Michael)
March 30, 2015 Filing 170 RESPONSE to Motion re #103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
March 27, 2015 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #168 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2015 Filing 168 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bash, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2015 Filing 167 STATUS REPORT by William E. Levert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1)(Menges, Carson)
March 25, 2015 Filing 166 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman for Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Justin)
March 25, 2015 Filing 165 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims by CBS Corporation.(Dauphin, Michael)
March 24, 2015 Filing 164 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman for Defendant ITT Corporation. (Bauman, Mark)
March 24, 2015 Filing 163 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cooper Industries, LLC.. (Foote, William)
March 24, 2015 Filing 162 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims by Cooper Industries, LLC.(Foote, William)
March 24, 2015 Filing 161 ENTRY of Appearance by William C. Foote for Defendant Cooper Industries, LLC. (Foote, William)
March 23, 2015 Filing 160 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint, Answer to Crossclaims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Kidd, Anita)
March 23, 2015 Filing 159 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint, Answer to Crossclaims, Jury Trial Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 139, 140, 141, 142. Mon Mar 23 09:00:06 CDT 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
March 20, 2015 Filing 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, In the Alternative, to Dismiss or Transfer Based on Improper Venue by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(King, Melanie)
March 20, 2015 Filing 157 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. Parent companies: Pentair, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Pentair,. (McGinley, Michael)
March 20, 2015 Filing 156 ANSWER to Complaint PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED PETITION, CROSSCLAIM AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS against defendant Aurora Pump Company by Aurora Pump Company.(McGinley, Michael)
March 20, 2015 Filing 155 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael P. McGinley for Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (McGinley, Michael)
March 20, 2015 Filing 154 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant ITT Corporation. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: no,. (Bauman, Mark)
March 20, 2015 Filing 153 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended by ITT Corporation.(Bauman, Mark)
March 20, 2015 Filing 152 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman for Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Bauman, Mark)
March 20, 2015 Filing 151 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. Parent companies: ITT Corporation, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Bauman, Mark)
March 20, 2015 Filing 150 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Bauman, Mark)
March 20, 2015 Filing 149 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman for Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Bauman, Mark)
March 20, 2015 Filing 148 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against defendant All Defendants by Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc..(Flatt, Gregory)
March 20, 2015 Filing 147 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against defendant All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Flatt, Gregory)
March 20, 2015 Filing 146 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against defendant All Defendants by Certain-Teed Corporation.(Flatt, Gregory)
March 20, 2015 Filing 145 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to CrossClaims against defendant All Defendants by Viking Pumps, Inc..(Flatt, Gregory)
March 20, 2015 Filing 144 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against defendant All Defendants by ConocoPhillips Company.(Flatt, Gregory)
March 20, 2015 Filing 143 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Riley Power, Inc..(Flatt, Gregory)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Docket Text ORDER Re: #138 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #103 Motion to Remand Case to State Court by Cross Defendants CBS Corporation; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 20, 2015. (SAA)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Docket Text ORDER Re: #137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp to Motion to Remand by Defendant General Electric Company; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 20, 2015. (SAA)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Docket Text ORDER Re: #136 Motion to Vacate and Set Aside the Court's Order of March 18, 2015, and Reinstate All Deadlines Against General Electric Company by Defendant General Electric Company; ORDERED GRANTED. This Court's Order of March 18, 2015, staying deadlines with respect to the claims against Defendant General Electric Company is hereby VACATED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 20, 2015. (SAA)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Docket Text ORDER Re: #135 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #103 Motion to Remand Case to State Court by Defendant Crane Co.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 20, 2015. (SAA)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 129. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Fri Mar 20 09:51:09 CDT 2015 (Porter, Brittany)
March 19, 2015 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court by Cross Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
March 19, 2015 Filing 137 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Resp to Motion to Remand by Defendant General Electric Company. (King, Melanie)
March 19, 2015 Filing 136 MOTION to Vacate and Set Aside the Court's Order of March 18, 2015, and Reinstate All Deadlines Against General Electric Company by Defendant General Electric Company. (King, Melanie)
March 19, 2015 Filing 135 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court by Defendant Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 134 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Cross Defendants International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, International Paper Company, Defendant International Paper Company. (Bronsky, Albert)
March 19, 2015 Filing 133 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Cross Defendants John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Defendant John Crane, Inc.. (Bronsky, Albert)
March 19, 2015 Filing 132 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Cross Defendants General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, Defendant General Gasket Corporation. (Bronsky, Albert)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 108, 109. Sent to non-electronic parties this date. Thu Mar 19 13:11:30 CDT 2015 (Porter, Brittany)
March 19, 2015 Filing 131 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Defendant Texaco Chemical Company. Parent companies: Chevron Corporation, Publicly held company: Chevron Corporation,. (Goldberg, Gregory)
March 19, 2015 Filing 130 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory T. Goldberg for Cross Defendants Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Defendant Texaco Chemical Company. (Goldberg, Gregory)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Docket Text ORDER Re: #128 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #103 Motion to Remand Case to State Court by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 19, 2015. (SAA)
March 18, 2015 ***REMARK: The Answers and Crossclaims filed by Defendants Riley Stoker Corporation, ConoccoPhillips Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Certain Teed Corpration, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, and Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. were deleted from the record; therefore, the record will not contain document numbers 117, 118, 119, 120, 121, and 122. The entries contained technical filing errors in CM/ECF causing each filing defendant to submit a crossclaim against itself. Each document shall be refiled and counsel shall select the appropriate parties which the counterclaim is against. (BRP)
March 18, 2015 Filing 128 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (King, Melanie)
March 18, 2015 Filing 127 Wm. Powell ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by The William Powell Company.(Stephenson, Scott)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 126. Wed Mar 18 15:48:52 CDT 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before March 27, 2015, Plaintiff shall file a status report that identifies the status (by date and party filing) of all motions filed in state court that are still outstanding, the names of any Defendants who have not yet been served, and the names of any Defendants who have been served but failed to respond to the complaint, by answer or otherwise. Any Defendant who disagrees with the status report or wishes to supplement it may do so within seven days of the date the status report is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that with regard to any motions filed in state court that have not yet been responded to, the opposing parties shall respond within 14 days of the date of the filing of Plaintiffs status report. (Status Report due by 3/27/2015.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/18/2015. (NEB)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 125. Wed Mar 18 15:42:31 CDT 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unopposed motion filed by Defendant Pnuemo Abex Corporation to institute Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(c)(1) (B) is GRANTED. Pursuant to that Rule, any cross-claims, counterclaims, avoidances, or affirmative defenses in those pleadings, and replies to them shall be treated as denied or avoided by all other parties. (Doc. No. #77 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/18/2015. (NEB)
March 18, 2015 Filing 124 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. Parent companies: Cleaver Holdings, Inc.,. (McGuire, Timothy)
March 18, 2015 Filing 123 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy A. McGuire for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (McGuire, Timothy)
March 18, 2015 Filing 116 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc., Defendant Viking Pumps, Inc.. Publicly held company: IDEX Corporation,. (Flatt, Gregory)
March 18, 2015 Filing 115 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Defendant Riley Power, Inc... (Flatt, Gregory)
March 18, 2015 Filing 114 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Defendant Certain-Teed Corporation. Parent companies: Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France, Subsidiaries: CertainTeed Corporation,. (Flatt, Gregory)
March 18, 2015 Filing 113 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Subsidiaries: Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Publicly held company: Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation,. (Flatt, Gregory)
March 18, 2015 Filing 112 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Defendant Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. Parent companies: Saint-Gobain Delaware Corporation,. (Flatt, Gregory)
March 18, 2015 Filing 111 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant ConocoPhillips Company, Cross Defendants ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Company. Parent companies: ConocoPhillips,. (Flatt, Gregory)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Docket Text ORDER Re: #105 Motion to Stay All Deadlines by Defendant General Electric Company; ORDERED GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. All deadlines against Defendant General Electric Company shall be stayed for a period of one hundred and twenty (120) days to permit the parties to finalize their settlement and file dismissal documents. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 18, 2015. (SAA)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Docket Text ORDER Re: #102 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory T. Goldberg by Cross Defendants Texaco Chemical and #98 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leslie G. Offergeld by Defendant The Gorman-Rupp Company; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 18, 2015. (SAA)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Docket Text ORDER Re: #82 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC.; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendant shall have until April 29, 2015 to file a response to the Petition. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 18, 2015. (SAA)
March 18, 2015 Filing 107 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (JWJ)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall randomly reassign this case to a United States District Judge for all further proceedings.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 3/17/15. (JWJ)
March 17, 2015 Filing 105 MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Defendant General Electric Company. (Kidd, Anita)
March 16, 2015 Filing 104 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel G. Donahue for Cross Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, Defendant CBS Corporation. (Donahue, Daniel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 103 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Back to State Court by Plaintiff William E. Levert. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Menges, Carson)
March 13, 2015 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory T. Goldberg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4772845) by Cross Defendants Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Texaco Chemical Company, Defendant Texaco Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldberg, Gregory)
March 11, 2015 Filing 101 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer M. Valentino for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Valentino, Jennifer)
March 11, 2015 Filing 100 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Parent companies: No, Subsidiaries: No, Publicly held company: No,. (Dibler, Lindsay)
March 11, 2015 Filing 99 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay A. Dibler for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Dibler, Lindsay)
March 6, 2015 Filing 97 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The William Powell Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. (Stephenson, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 96 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Velan Valve Corp..(Geraci, Carl)
March 6, 2015 Filing 95 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Velan Valve Corp.. Parent companies: Velan Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Velan Inc.,. (Geraci, Carl)
March 6, 2015 Filing 94 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Defendants Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 3/6/2015 (BRP).
March 6, 2015 Filing 93 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition filed by Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C. CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Defendants Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C. (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 3/6/2015 (BRP).
March 6, 2015 Filing 92 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition filed by Crane Co. CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 3/6/2015 (BRP). Modified on 3/9/2015 (BRP).
March 6, 2015 Filing 91 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition filed by Caterpillar, Inc. CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 3/6/2015 (BRP).
March 6, 2015 Filing 90 ANSWER to Second Amended Petition amended form filer filed by Trane, US, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. (Geraci, Carl) Modified on 3/6/2015 (BRP).
March 6, 2015 Filing 89 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Crane Co.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Crane (Ningbo) Yongxiang Valve Company Ltd., Crane Fengqiu Zhejiang Pump Co. Ltd., Kessel (Thailand) Pte. Ltd., P.T. Crane Indonesia, Xomox Sanmar Ltd., Publicly held company: None,. (Geraci, Carl)
March 6, 2015 Filing 88 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Geraci, Carl)
March 6, 2015 Filing 87 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. Parent companies: Ingersoll Rand PLC, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Ingersoll Rand PLC,. (Geraci, Carl)
March 6, 2015 Filing 86 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Trane, US, Inc.. Parent companies: Ingersoll Rand PLC, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Ingersoll Rand PLC,. (Geraci, Carl)
March 6, 2015 Filing 85 Disclosure Statement by Defendant Shell Chemical LP. (Pack, Jordan) Modified docket text on 3/18/2015 (NEB).
March 6, 2015 Filing 84 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan K. Pack for Defendant Shell Chemical LP. (Pack, Jordan)
March 6, 2015 Filing 83 NOTICE by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. re #73 Disclosure of Corporation Interests Certificate (Valentino, Jennifer)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 71. Fri Mar 6 08:56:51 CST 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
March 5, 2015 Filing 82 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bozarth, Troy)
March 5, 2015 Filing 81 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC. Parent companies: Spectra Energy Transmission II, LLC, Publicly held company: Spectra Energy Partners, LP,. (Bozarth, Troy)
March 5, 2015 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Pnuemo Abex Corporation.(Titzer, Ross)
March 5, 2015 Filing 79 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. Parent companies: Spectral Energy Transmission, LLC; Spectra Energy Capital, LLC, Publicly held company: Spectra Energy Corp,. (Bozarth, Troy)
March 5, 2015 Filing 78 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Pnuemo Abex Corporation.. (Titzer, Ross)
March 5, 2015 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Institute Denials Under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) by Defendant Pnuemo Abex Corporation. (Titzer, Ross)
March 5, 2015 Filing 76 ENTRY of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer for Defendant Pnuemo Abex Corporation. (Titzer, Ross)
March 5, 2015 Filing 75 ENTRY of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth for Defendants Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC. (Bozarth, Troy)
March 5, 2015 Filing 74 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay A. Dibler for Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Dibler, Lindsay)
March 5, 2015 Filing 73 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. Subsidiaries: GT Global Holdings, LLC,. (Valentino, Jennifer)
March 5, 2015 Filing 72 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer M. Valentino for Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Valentino, Jennifer)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel and Entry of Appearance (Doc. #65 ) is GRANTED; that Andrew J. Baker no longer is the counsel of record for Plaintiff; and that the record should reflect that Carson C. Menges is the attorney of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 03/05/2015. (AMM)
March 4, 2015 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leslie G. Offergeld. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100) by Defendant The Gorman-Rupp Company, Cross Defendants The Gorman-Rupp Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Correspondence)(NEB)
March 4, 2015 Receipt 4644048514 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of LESLIE G. OFFERGELD (CCAM)
March 3, 2015 Filing 70 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Rexnord Industries, LLC. Parent companies: Rexnord Industries LLC, Publicly held company: No,. (Valentino, Jennifer)
March 3, 2015 Filing 69 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer M. Valentino for Defendant Rexnord Industries, LLC. (Valentino, Jennifer)
March 3, 2015 Filing 68 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay A. Dibler for Defendant Rexnord Industries, LLC. (Dibler, Lindsay)
March 3, 2015 Filing 67 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant FMC Corporation.. (Vantine, Marcie)
March 3, 2015 Filing 66 ENTRY of Appearance by Marcie J. Vantine for Defendant FMC Corporation. (Vantine, Marcie)
March 2, 2015 Filing 65 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Andrew J. Balcer by Plaintiff William E. Levert. (Menges, Carson)
March 2, 2015 Filing 64 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. Parent companies: Rexnord-Zurn Holdings, Inc.,. (Irwin, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 63 ENTRY of Appearance by William R. Irwin for Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (Irwin, William)
February 27, 2015 Filing 62 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer M. Valentino for Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Valentino, Jennifer)
February 27, 2015 Filing 61 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay A. Dibler for Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Dibler, Lindsay)
February 26, 2015 Filing 60 ENTRY of Appearance by Carson C. Menges for Plaintiff William E. Levert. (Menges, Carson)
February 26, 2015 Filing 59 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott Darren Stephenson for Defendant The William Powell Company. (Stephenson, Scott)
February 26, 2015 Filing 58 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Carrier Corporation. Publicly held company: United Technologies Corporation,. (Valentino, Jennifer)
February 26, 2015 Filing 57 THIS DOCUMENT WAS DELETED AS IT WAS FILED INCORRECTLY. THE ATTY WAS CONTACTED AND INSTRUCTED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT NOTICE Appearance: by Defendant Carrier Corporation (Valentino, Jennifer) Modified on 2/27/2015 (JWJ).
February 26, 2015 Filing 56 THIS DOCUMENT WAS DELETED AS IT WAS FILED INCORRECTLY. THE ATTY WAS CONTACTED AND INSTRUCTED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT NOTICE Appearance: by Defendant Carrier Corporation (Dibler, Lindsay) Modified on 2/27/2015 (JWJ).
February 26, 2015 Filing 55 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Thomas Walsh for Defendant Asbestos Corporation Limited. (Walsh, Steven)
February 26, 2015 Filing 54 ENTRY of Appearance by Reed W. Sugg for Defendant Asbestos Corporation Limited. (Sugg, Reed)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 46. Wed Feb 25 16:24:07 CST 2015 (Spurgeon, Katherine)
February 24, 2015 Filing 53 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay A. Dibler for Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Dibler, Lindsay)
February 24, 2015 Filing 52 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. Parent companies: Flowserve Corporation, Subsidiaries: BW/IP, Inc., Publicly held company: Flowserve Corporation,. (Valentino, Jennifer)
February 24, 2015 Filing 51 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer M. Valentino for Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Valentino, Jennifer)
February 23, 2015 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci for Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Trane, US, Inc., Velan Valve Corp.. (Geraci, Carl)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time (Doc. #39 ) is GRANTED, and that Defendants Caterpillar Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Spectra Energy Operating Co., LLC, Spectra Engergy Transmission Services, LLC, Trane U.S., Inc., and Velan Valve Corp. have up to and including March 6, 2015, to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 02/23/2015. (AMM)
February 20, 2015 Filing 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Defendant Certain-Teed Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
February 20, 2015 Filing 44 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Defendant Riley Power, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
February 20, 2015 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Defendant Viking Pumps, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
February 20, 2015 Filing 42 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Defendant Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
February 20, 2015 Filing 41 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Defendant ConocoPhillips Company. (Flatt, Gregory)
February 20, 2015 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
February 20, 2015 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Trane, US, Inc., Velan Valve Corp.. (Geraci, Carl)
February 20, 2015 Filing 38 ENTRY of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci for Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Trane, US, Inc., Velan Valve Corp.. (Geraci, Carl)
February 20, 2015 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin John Wilson for Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Trane, US, Inc., Velan Valve Corp.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
February 20, 2015 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci for Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Trane, US, Inc., Velan Valve Corp.. (Geraci, Carl)
February 20, 2015 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc... (Bash, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2015 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash for Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2015 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew J. Morris for Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Morris, Matthew)
February 20, 2015 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
February 20, 2015 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Melanie R. King for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (King, Melanie)
February 20, 2015 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Fournie, Raymond)
February 19, 2015 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
February 19, 2015 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC.. (Kidd, Anita)
February 19, 2015 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM s, Answers to Cross-Claims and Jury Trial Demand against defendant Warren Pumps, LLC by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Kidd, Anita)
February 19, 2015 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss or Transfer Based on Improper Venue by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kidd, Anita)
February 19, 2015 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Anita Maria Kidd for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Kidd, Anita)
February 19, 2015 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant General Electric Company. (Meyer, Julie)
February 19, 2015 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Melanie R. King for Defendant General Electric Company. (King, Melanie)
February 19, 2015 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie for Defendant General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
February 19, 2015 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM s, Answers to Cross-Claims and Jury Trial Demand against defendant General Electric Company by General Electric Company.(Kidd, Anita)
February 19, 2015 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant General Electric Company. Publicly held company: Yes,. (Kidd, Anita)
February 19, 2015 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Anita Maria Kidd for Defendant General Electric Company. (Kidd, Anita)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 19. Thu Feb 19 14:17:03 CST 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
February 19, 2015 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CBS Corporation.. (Dauphin, Michael)
February 19, 2015 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Georgiann Oliver for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Oliver, Georgiann)
February 19, 2015 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Second Supplemental Removal Exhibits by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses of ASCO Valve, Inc. to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Defendant Blackmer Pump Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Petition of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, #4 Exhibit Defendant Cooper Industries, LLC's Answer, Motions to Dismiss and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Eaton Corporation to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #7 Exhibit Answer of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #8 Exhibit Defendant The Nash Engineering Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #9 Exhibit Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #10 Exhibit Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #11 Exhibit The William Powell Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #12 Exhibit Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition)(Dauphin, Michael)
February 18, 2015 Filing 50 Letter to attorney Laci M. Whitley from United States District Court Re:Admissions (DLT)
February 18, 2015 Filing 49 Letter to attorney Erin Burton from United States District Court Re:Admissions (DLT)
February 18, 2015 Filing 48 Letter to attorney Andrew J. Belcer from United States District Court Re:Admissions (DLT)
February 18, 2015 Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Ronnie L. White no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins for all further proceedings. (NEB)
February 18, 2015 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Melanie E. Riley for Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Riley, Melanie)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 14. Wed Feb 18 15:09:05 CST 2015 (Blasko, Nicole)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned United States District Judge is disqualified from handling any matters in this case, and the Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign the case to another judge. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/18/2015. (NEB)
February 18, 2015 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: MetLife, Inc.,. (Joley, Charles)
February 18, 2015 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles L. Joley for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Joley, Charles)
February 18, 2015 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian J. Connolly for Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Connolly, Brian)
February 18, 2015 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Todd Applegate for Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Applegate, J.)
February 17, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CBS Corporation Sent To: PLAINTIFF. (DLT)
February 16, 2015 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Dana Companies, LLC. Parent companies: Dana Holding Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Dana Holding Corporation,. (Giokaris, Virginia)
February 16, 2015 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Virginia M. Giokaris for Defendant Dana Companies, LLC. (Giokaris, Virginia)
February 13, 2015 Filing 6 Amended Petition (Removal) STATE 2ND AMENDED PETITION. Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, State of Missouri, filed by William E. Levert.(DLT)
February 13, 2015 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin for Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
February 13, 2015 Filing 4 Amended Petition (Removal) STATE 1ST AMENDED PETITION. Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, State of Missouri, filed by William E. Levert.(DLT)
February 13, 2015 Filing 3 Petition (Removal) STATE ORIGINAL PETITION. Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, State of Missouri, filed by William E. Levert.(DLT)
February 12, 2015 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Petition, #2 Exhibit First Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit Second Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit Levert Depo 151:23-152:6, #5 Exhibit Gate Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Horne Affidavit, #7 Exhibit MilSpecs Exhibit 7 Part A, #8 Exhibit MilSpecs Exhibit 7 Part B, #9 Exhibit MilSpecs Exhibit 8 Part A, #10 Exhibit MilSpecs Exhibit 8 Part B, #11 Exhibit MilSpecs Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Forman Affidavit, #13 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Exhibit Original Filing Form, #15 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #16 Exhibit Notice of Filing a Notice of Removal of Civil Action)(Dauphin, Michael)
February 12, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit City of St. Louis, case number 1322-CC01088, with receipt number 0865-4727426, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MilSpecs Part 1, #2 Exhibit MilSpecs Part 2)(Dauphin, Michael) (DLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levert v. 3M et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Levert
Represented By: Laci M. Whitley
Represented By: Erin Rafferty Hergenrother
Represented By: Andrew J. Belcer
Represented By: Carson C. Menges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardie-Tynes, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexnord Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Springfield
Represented By: Kirra Nicole Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealing Equipment Products Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company I
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Pump Company
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Leslie G. Offergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Gasket Corporation
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, L.L.C.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Springfield
Represented By: Kirra Nicole Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Scott Darren Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane, US, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Anita Maria Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Anita Maria Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Corporation, Blackmer Pump division
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: H. Patrick Morris
Represented By: David F. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Represented By: Virginia M. Giokaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pnuemo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCO Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc.
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Represented By: Agota Peterfy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA Laval, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Company Electrotechnologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Limited
Represented By: Steven Thomas Walsh
Represented By: Reed W. Sugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes Vulcan, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, LLC
Represented By: William C. Foote
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork and Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Trevor Alan Sondag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Georgiann Oliver
Represented By: Charles L. Joley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Inc.
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Company Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Sugar and Refining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentive Specialty Chemicals, Inc.
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Represented By: Agota Peterfy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Chemical Company
Represented By: Gregory T. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical LP
Represented By: Jordan K. Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: Trevor Alan Sondag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Falk Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Company Gas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Eastern Transmission
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Marcie J. Vantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir-Valves & Controls USA, Inc. d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co.
Represented By: Michael W. Newport
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Represented By: Anthony L. Springfield
Represented By: Kirra Nicole Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Boiler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardie-Tynes Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Brian J. Connolly
Represented By: J. Todd Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Valves
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?