Blue Buffalo Co., Ltd. v. Nestle Purina PetCare Company
Plaintiff: |
Blue Buffalo Company, Ltd. |
Defendant: |
Nestle Purina PetCare Company |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00384 |
Filed: |
March 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Within US but Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
Rodney W. Sippel |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 13, 2016 |
Filing
193
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Blue Buffalos Amended Motion to Dismiss 129 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part in accordance with the terms of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Purina shall file an amended counterclaim in accordance with the terms of this Memorandum and Order no later than July 11, 2016. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/13/16. (CAR)
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
160
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Non-Party Subpoena Respondent Leo Burnett Company, Inc.'s motion to quash Plaintiff Blue Buffalo's subpoena for documents # 137 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. To the extent the mo tion is granted, the subpoena is quashed without prejudice. To the extent the motion is denied, Leo Burnett shall produce the marketing analytics documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Blue Buffalo and Leo Burnett shall meet and confer in an effort to reach agreement on the details of a cost-shifting arrangement.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/23/16. (LGK)
|
June 10, 2015 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Purinas Motion to Dismiss #[ 39 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Blue Buffalo shall file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of this Order to bring it into conformity with the terms of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Purinas Motion to Stay Discovery pending the Courts ruling on its motion to dismiss #[ 72 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/10/15. (KJS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?