Henderson v. Listenberger et al
Plaintiff: Larry L. Henderson
Defendant: Paul Listenberger and St. Louis County, Missouri
Case Number: 4:2015cv00480
Filed: March 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Noelle C. Collins
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant St. Louis County, Missouris Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 41 ) and Defendant Paul Listenbergers Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 44 ) are GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED with prej udice. A separate judgment will accompany this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of the Courts decision to grant Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment, the remaining pending Motions (Docs. 37 , 38 ) are DENIED, as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 06/27/2016. (KCB)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time to pay his initial partial filing fee is [Doc. # 14 ] is GRANTED. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff is instruc ted to pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.95. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, this case will be dismissed without prejud ice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants second motion for extension of time to file an answer or other responsive pleading [Doc. # 16 ] is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading within fourteen (14) days of this Memorandum and Order. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 6/18/2015., Response to Court due by 6/2/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 5/19/2015. (NEB)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's ex parte motion for TRO [ECF No. 7 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on May 8, 2015. (BRP)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDERIT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $6.95 within thirty (30) days of the dat e of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an origi nal proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants St. Louis County and Paul Listenberger. - 5 -IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants St. Louis County and Paul Listenberger shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defe ndants Herbert Bernsen and Milton Mitchell because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. 2 ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 5/8/2015.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/8/15. (CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Listenberger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry L. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Listenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?